Member Case
Lead case is: 4:17-bk-33695

Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:David R Jones
Case #: 4:17-bk-33733
Case Filed:Jun 14, 2017
Terminated:May 28, 2019

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1,000-5,000
Est. Assets$100,000,001 to $500 million
Est. Liabilities $50,000,001 to $100 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
NRG Power Midwest LP
804 Carnegie Ctr
Princeton, NJ 08540-6023
Represented By
Zack A Clement
Zack A. Clement PLLC
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee
Office of the US Trustee 515 Rusk Ave Ste 3516
Houston, TX 77002


Docket last updated: 22 minutes ago
Tuesday, May 28, 2019
court Close Bankruptcy Case Fri 07/17 10:17 AM
Bankruptcy Case Closed per #2125 Final Decree in 17-33695 (ltie)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 21, 2017
7 7 court Declaration for Electronic Filing and Statement of SSN Submitted Thu 06/22 10:51 AM
Declaration for Electronic Filing of Petition and Master Mailing List Filed. (sgue)
Related: [-]
Saturday, June 17, 2017
6 6 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 06/17 11:51 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 06/17/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 4 Order Regarding the Exchange of Exhibits and Witness lists in all contested matters and adversary proceedings
Friday, June 16, 2017
5 5 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 06/17 12:04 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 06/16/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 2 Generic Order
Thursday, June 15, 2017
4 4 order Judge Jones Order Regarding Exhibit and Witness Lists Thu 06/15 6:30 AM
Related: [-]
crditcrd none Thu 06/15 9:53 AM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 17-33733 [misc,volp11] (1717.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 19106716. Fee amount $1717.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 14, 2017
3 3 court Document Wed 06/14 4:17 PM
An order has been entered in accordance with Rule 1015(b) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure and Rule 1015-1 of the Local Rules of Bankruptcy Practice and Procedure of the United States Bankruptcy Court for the Southern District of Texas directing joint administration of the chapter 11 cases of: GenOn Energy, Inc., Case No. 17-33695 GenOn Americas Generation, LLC, Case No. 17-33696 GenOn Americas Procurement, Inc., Case No. 17-33694 GenOn Asset Management, LLC, Case No. 17-33697 GenOn Capital Inc. Case No. 17-33698 GenOn Energy Holdings, Inc., Case No. 17-33699 GenOn Energy Management, LLC, Case No. 17-33700 GenOn Energy Services, LLC, Case No. 17-33701 GenOn Fund 2001 LLC, Case No. 17-33702 GenOn Mid-Atlantic Development, LLC, Case No. 17-33703 GenOn Power Operating Services MidWest, Inc., Case No. 17-33704 GenOn Special Procurement, Inc., Case No. 17-33705 Hudson Valley Gas Corporation, Case No. 17-33706 Mirant Asia-Pacific Ventures, LLC, Case No. 17-33707 Mirant Intellectual Asset Management and Marketing, LLC, Case No. 17-33708 Mirant International Investments, Inc., Case No. 17-33709 Mirant New York Services, LLC, Case No. 17-33710 Mirant Power Purchase, LLC, Case No. 17-33711 Mirant Wrightsville Investments, Inc., Case No. 17-33712 Mirant Wrightsville Management, Inc., Case No. 17-33713 MNA Finance Corp., Case No. 17-33714 NRG Americas, Inc., Case No. 17-33715 NRG Bowline LLC, Case No. 17-33716 NRG California North LLC, Case No. 17-33717 NRG California South GP LLC, Case No. 17-33718 NRG California South LP, Case No. 17-33719 NRG Canal LLC, Case No. 17-33720 NRG Delta LLC, Case No. 17-33721 NRG Florida GP, LLC, Case No. 17-33722 NRG Florida LP, Case No. 17-33723 NRG Lovett Development I LLC, Case No. 17-33724 NRG Lovett LLC, Case No. 17-33725 NRG New York LLC, Case No. 17-33726 NRG North America LLC, Case No. 17-33727 NRG Northeast Generation, Inc., Case No. 17-33728 NRG Northeast Holdings, Inc., Case No. 17-33759 NRG Potrero LLC, Case No. 17-33729 NRG Power Generation Assets LLC, Case No. 17-33730 NRG Power Generation LLC, Case No. 17-33731 NRG Power Midwest GP LLC, Case No. 17-33732 NRG Power Midwest LP, Case No. 17-33733 NRG Sabine (Delaware), Inc., Case No. 17-33734 NRG Sabine (Texas), Inc., Case No. 17-33735 NRG San Gabriel Power Generation LLC, Case No. 17-33736 NRG Tank Farm LLC, Case No. 17-33737 NRG Wholesale Generation GP LLC, Case No. 17-33738 NRG Wholesale Generation LP, Case No. 17-33739 NRG Willow Pass LLC, Case No. 17-33740 Orion Power New York GP, Inc., Case No. 17-33741 Orion Power New York LP, LLC, Case No. 17-33742 Orion Power New York, L.P., Case No. 17-33743 RRI Energy Broadband, Inc., Case No. 17-33744 RRI Energy Channelview (Delaware) LLC, Case No. 17-33745 RRI Energy Channelview (Texas) LLC, Case No. 17-33746 RRI Energy Channelview LP, Case No. 17-33747 RRI Energy Communications, Inc., Case No. 17-33693 RRI Energy Services Channelview LLC, Case No. 17-33748 RRI Energy Services Desert Basin, LLC, Case No. 17-33749 RRI Energy Services, LLC, Case No. 17-33750 RRI Energy Solutions East, LLC, Case No. 17-33751 RRI Energy Trading Exchange, Inc., Case No. 17-33752 RRI Energy Ventures, Inc., Case No. 17-33753 All further pleadings and other papers shall be filed in and all further docket entries shall be made in Case No. 17-33695 (DRJ). (aalo)
Related: [-]
2 2 order Generic Order Wed 06/14 2:56 PM
Order (I) Directing Joint Administration of Related Chapter 11 Cases and (II) Granting Related Relief Signed on 6/14/2017 (aalo)
Related: [-]
1 1 44 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) [system event] Wed 06/14 7:24 AM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual Fee Amount $1717 Filed by NRG Power Midwest LP. (Clement, Zack)
Related: [-]
court Case Reassigned Wed 06/14 2:36 PM
Judge David R Jones added to case. Involvement of Judge Marvin Isgur Terminated (aalo)
Related: [-]