Jonathan Scarborough v. Federated Mutual Insurance Co.
Original Case: 0:15-cv-01633
Eighth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:17-cv-02409 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Case Filed: | Jun 27, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jul 16, 2018 |
Last checked: Tuesday Jul 17, 2018 3:30 AM CDT |
Defendant - Appellee
Federated Mutual Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Jonathan Scarborough
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Jul 16 2018
PER CURIAM OPINION FILED - THE COURT: Roger L. Wollman, Morris S. Arnold and Jane Kelly (PUBLISHED) [4682498] [17-2409] |
Docket last updated: 07/17/2018 3:30 AM CDT |
Tuesday, June 27, 2017 | ||
Civil case docketed. [4551146] 17-2409 (JMM) | ||
Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, orders filed 02/01/17, 05/22/17 and 05/30/17, judgment filed 05/31/17 and docket entries. [4551151] 17-2409 (JMM) | ||
BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Transcript due on or before 08/07/2017. Appendix due 08/16/2017. BRIEF APPELLANT, Jonathan Scarborough due 08/16/2017 Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. Appellant reply brief is due 14 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the appellee brief. [4551191] 17-2409 (JMM) |