Scarborough v. Federated Mutual Insurance Company
Minnesota District Court | |
Judge: | Donovan W Frank |
Referred: | Katherine M Menendez |
Case #: | 0:15-cv-01633 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition For Removal--Other Contract |
Case Filed: | Mar 30, 2015 |
Re-opened: | Aug 06, 2018 |
Terminated: | Mar 29, 2019 |
Last checked: Tuesday Oct 06, 2015 8:15 AM CDT |
Counter Claimant
Federated Mutual Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
Jonathan Scarborough
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Federated Mutual Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jonathan Scarborough
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Thursday, May 20, 2021 | ||
140 | 140
appeal
USCA Mandate
Thu 05/20 2:30 PM
MANDATE of USCA (electronic copy) as to131 Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit filed by Jonathan Scarborough. (CLK) |