21st Century Oncology Holdings, Inc. et al. v. Steven Brehio et al
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 7:17-bk-22770
Lead BK case is: 7:17-bk-22770
New York Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Robert D Drain |
Case #: | 7:17-ap-08244 |
Nature of Suit | 91 Bankruptcy - Declaratory judgment |
Case Filed: | Jun 30, 2017 |
Terminated: | May 19, 2020 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Steven Brehio
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
James Corbel
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Roxanne Haatvedt
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Veneta Delucchi
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Carl Schmitt
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Matthew Benzion
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
21st Century Oncology Holdings, Inc. et al.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/18/2024 1:09 PM EDT |
Tuesday, May 19, 2020 | ||
misc
Close Adversary Proceeding
Tue 05/19 3:49 PM
Adversary Case 7:17-ap-8244 Closed. This Adversary Proceeding is Closed Subject to the Filing of a Notice of Appeal Within Fourteen (14) Days of the Entry of the Order Terminating this Adversary Proceeding. (Correa, Mimi) |
||
Thursday, May 14, 2020 | ||
13 | 13
claims
Certificate of Mailing of Claims Agent
Thu 05/14 3:30 PM
Certificate of Mailing of Claims Agent re: Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants LLC.(Kass, Albert) |
|
Friday, May 08, 2020 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice, Dismissal
Fri 05/08 12:50 PM
Notice of Dismissal / Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding filed by Jeffrey R. Gleit on behalf of 21st Century Oncology Holdings, Inc. et al.. (Gleit, Jeffrey) |
|
Monday, November 06, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice, Adjournment of Hearing
Mon 11/06 4:26 PM
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing Notice of Adjournment of Hearing on Debtors' Motion for Entry of an Order Extending the Automatic Stay or, in the Alternative, Granting Preliminary and Permanent Injunctive Relief Halting the Prosecution of the Data Breach Litigation filed by Christopher Marcus on behalf of 21st Century Oncology Holdings, Inc. et al.. with hearing to be held on 12/19/2017 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 118, White Plains Courthouse (Marcus, Christopher) |
|
Friday, October 06, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice, Adjournment of Hearing
Fri 10/06 10:59 AM
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing Notice of Adjournment of Hearing on Debtors' Motion for Entry of an Order Extending the Automatic Stay or, in the Alternative, Granting Preliminary and Permanent Injunctive Relief Halting the Prosecution of the Data Breach Litigation filed by Christopher Marcus on behalf of 21st Century Oncology Holdings, Inc. et al.. with hearing to be held on 11/9/2017 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Objections due by 10/2/2017, (Marcus, Christopher) |
|
Thursday, September 21, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Affidavit of Service
Thu 09/21 8:15 PM
Affidavit of Service re Notice of Adjournment of Hearing on Debtors' Motion for Entry of an Order Extending the Automatic Stay or, in the Alternative, Granting Preliminary and Permanent Injunctive Relief Halting the Prosecution of the Data Breach Litigation filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants LLC.(Kass, Albert) |
|
Thursday, September 14, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice, Adjournment of Hearing
Thu 09/14 4:55 PM
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing on Debtors' Motion for Entry of an Order Extending the Automatic Stay or, in the Alternative, Granting Preliminary and Permanent Injunctive Relief Halting the Prosecution of the Data Breach Litigation filed by Christopher Marcus on behalf of 21st Century Oncology Holdings, Inc. et al.. with hearing to be held on 10/16/2017 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom TBA, White Plains Courthouse (RDD) Objections due by 10/9/2017, (Marcus, Christopher) |
|
Wednesday, August 09, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Affidavit of Service
Wed 08/09 9:55 PM
Affidavit of Service re Notice of Adjournment of Hearing on Debtors' Motion for Entry of an Order Extending the Automatic Stay or, in the Alternative, Granting Preliminary and Permanent Injunctive Relief Halting the Prosecution of the Data Breach Litigation filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants LLC.(Kass, Albert) |
|
Friday, August 04, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice, Adjournment of Hearing
Fri 08/04 4:40 PM
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing on Debtors' Motion for Entry of an Order Extending the Automatic Stay or, in the Alternative, Granting Preliminary and Permanent Injunctive Relief Halting the Prosecution of the Data Breach Litigation filed by Christopher Marcus on behalf of 21st Century Oncology Holdings, Inc. et al.. with hearing to be held on 9/19/2017 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom TBA, White Plains Courthouse (RDD) (Marcus, Christopher) |
|
Friday, July 14, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Affidavit of Service
Fri 07/14 7:24 PM
Affidavit of Service re Notice of Debtors Motion for Entry of an Order Extending the Automatic Stay or, in The Alternative, Granting Preliminary and Permanent Injunctive Relief Halting the Prosecution of the Data Breach Litigation filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants LLC.(Kass, Albert) |
|
Thursday, July 06, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice, Hearing
Thu 07/06 9:34 PM
Notice of Hearing /Notice of Debtors' Motion for Entry of an Order Extending the Automatic Stay or, in the Alternative, Granting Preliminary and Permanent Injunctive Relief Halting the Prosecution of the Data Breach Litigation filed by Christopher Marcus on behalf of 21st Century Oncology Holdings, Inc. et al.. with hearing to be held on 8/14/2017 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom TBA, White Plains Courthouse (RDD) Objections due by 8/7/2017, (Marcus, Christopher) |
|
Wednesday, July 05, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
cmp
Auto Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference
Wed 07/05 3:32 PM
Summons with Notice of Pre-Trial Conference issued by Clerk's Office with Pre-Trial Conference set for 8/14/2017 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 118, White Plains Courthouse, Answer due by 8/4/2017. (Correa, Mimi) |
|
crditcrd
Auto - docket of credit card
Wed 07/05 9:04 AM
Receipt of Complaint 17-08244 rdd) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 11943852. Fee amount 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
Friday, June 30, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
motion
Motion, Extend Automatic Stay
Fri 06/30 3:47 PM
Motion to Extend Automatic Stay Debtors' Motion for Entry of an Order Extending the Automatic Stay or, in the Alternative Granting Preliminary and Permanent Injunctive Relief Halting the Prosecution of the Data Breach Litigation filed by Christopher Marcus on behalf of 21st Century Oncology Holdings, Inc. et al.. (Marcus, Christopher) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (fee)
Fri 06/30 3:38 PM
Adversary case 17-08244 Complaint against Steven Brehio, James Corbel, Roxanne Haatvedt, Veneta Delucchi, Carl Schmitt, Matthew Benzion Complaint against Steven Brehio, Robert Russell, James Corbel, Roxanne Haatvedt, Veneta Delucchi, Carl Schmitt, Matthew Benzion, Kathleen La Barge, Stacey Schwartz, Timothy Meulenberg, Stephen Wilbur, Jackie Griffith, Judith Cabrera and Sharon Mac Dermid (Fee Amount $ 350.). Nature(s) of Suit: (91 (Declaratory judgment)) Filed by Christopher Marcus on behalf of 21st Century Oncology Holdings, Inc. et al.. (Marcus, Christopher) |