21st Century Oncology Holdings, Inc.
New York Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Robert D Drain |
Case #: | 7:17-bk-22770 |
Case Filed: | May 25, 2017 |
Terminated: | Feb 22, 2021 |
Plan Confirmed: | Jan 11, 2018 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $1,000,000,001 to $10 billion |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,000,001 to $10 billion |
Nature of Business | Health Care Business |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
21st Century Oncology Holdings, Inc.
2270 Colonial Blvd.
Fort Myers, FL 33907 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: Friday Jun 09, 2017 4:53 PM EDT |
Attorney
Charles Lee Stambaugh
stambaugh & associates 841 prudential dr. 12th floor
jacksonville, FL 32207 |
Represented By
|
Attorney
Allen A. Etish PMA Insurance Group
20 Brace Road - 4th Floor
Cherry Hill, NJ 08034 |
Represented By
|
Claims and Noticing Agent
Kurtzman Carson Consultants LLC, Claims Agent
2335 Alaska Avenue
El Segundo, CA 90245 |
|
Creditor
First Lien Ad Hoc Committee and DIP Lenders
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Wilmington Trust, National Association
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Spirit Realty Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Cardinal Health
Chiesa Shahinian & Giantomasi PC One Boland Drive
West Orange, NJ 07052 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Ad Hoc Group of Crossover Holders
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
ASD Specialty Healthcare, Inc. d/b/a Besse Medical Supply
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
HCP-RTS, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Canada Pension Plan Investment Board
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Michigan Healthcare Professionals, P.C.
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
American Oncologic Associates of Michigan, P.C.
|
Represented By
|
Trustee
Wilmington Trust, N.A., as Indenture Trustee
|
Represented By
|
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee U.S. Federal Office Building 201 Varick Street, Room 1006
New York, NY 10014 |
|
Unknown
Elekta, Inc.
400 GARDEN CITY PLAZA Att: Theresa A. Driscoll 400 GARDEN CITY PLAZA, Att: Leslie A. Be
GARDEN CITY, NY 11530 |
Represented By
|
Unknown
Morgan Stanley Senior Funding, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Claims and Noticing Agent
Kurtzman Carson Consultants LLC
Terminated: 05/31/2017
2335 Alaska Avenue
El Segundo, CA 90245 |