Washington Western District Court
Judge:Benjamin H Settle
Case #: 3:17-cv-05683
Nature of Suit790 Labor - Other Labor Litigation
Cause28:1332 Diversity
Case Filed:Aug 29, 2017
Terminated:Dec 08, 2021
Last checked: Sunday Feb 25, 2018 1:21 AM PST
Defendant
BNSF Railway Company
Represented By
W Chris Harrison
Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak & Stewart Pc (memphis)
contact info
Sonja Diane Fritts
Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak & Stewart (sea)
contact info
Plaintiff
James T Norvell
Represented By
Jeff R Dingwall
Eight & Sand
contact info
Elizabeth M Quick
Quick Law Group, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/28/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, June 29, 2023
242 242 appeal Mandate of USCA Thu 06/29 9:51 AM
MANDATE OF USCA 22-35373 as to231 Notice of Appeal, filed by James T Norvell. The240 judgment of this Court, entered May 08, 2023, takes effect this date. This constitutes the formal mandate of this Court issued pursuant to Rule 41(a) of the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure. AFFIRMED (AMD)
Related: [-]