Original Case: 3:17-cv-05683

Ninth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:22-cv-35373
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit790 Labor - Other Labor Litigation
Case Filed:May 12, 2022
Terminated:May 08, 2023
Last checked: Wednesday May 10, 2023 1:31 AM PDT
Defendant - Appellee
BNSF RAILWAY COMPANY, a Delaware corporation
Represented By
Denise Ashbaugh
Arete Law Group PLLC
contact info
Weston Mumme
Holland & Knight, LLP
contact info
Bryan P. Neal
Holland & Knight, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
JAMES T. NORVELL
Represented By
Jeff R. Dingwall
Eight & Sand
contact info
Elizabeth Quick
Law Office of Elizabeth Quick
contact info
Beth Bloom
Bloom Law PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/10/2023 1:30 AM PDT
Thursday, May 12, 2022
1 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant James T. Norvell Mediation Questionnaire due on 05/19/2022. Transcript ordered by 06/13/2022. Transcript due 07/11/2022. Appellant James T. Norvell opening brief due 08/22/2022. Appellee BNSF Railway Company answering brief due 09/19/2022. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12445593] (JMR) [Entered: 05/12/2022 02:17 PM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 3 pgs Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule
Att: 2 2 pgs Notice to all Parties and Counsel
Att: 3 1 pgs Mediation Letter
Att: 4 22 pgs Case Opening Packet