Central Coast Medical Oncology Corp. v. U.S. CANCER CARE, INC. et al
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 7:17-bk-22770
Lead BK case is: 7:17-bk-22770
New York Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Robert D Drain |
Case #: | 7:17-ap-08280 |
Nature of Suit | 72 Bankruptcy - Injunctive relief - other 91 Bankruptcy - Declaratory judgment |
Case Filed: | Sep 01, 2017 |
Terminated: | Aug 29, 2018 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
U.S. Cancer Care, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
OnCure Medical Corp.
2270 Colonial Blvd.
Fort Myers, FL 33907 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Central Coast Medical Oncology Corp.
1325 E. Church Street Ste. 301
Santa Maria, CA 93454 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/18/2024 1:09 PM EDT |
Wednesday, August 29, 2018 | ||
misc
Close Adversary Proceeding
Wed 08/29 8:27 AM
Adversary Case 7:17-ap-8280 Closed. This Adversary Proceeding is Closed Subject to the Filing of a Notice of Appeal Within Fourteen (14) Days of the Entry of the Order Terminating this Adversary Proceeding. (Correa, Mimi) |
||
Wednesday, August 22, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Notice, Dismissal
Wed 08/22 3:19 PM
Notice of Dismissal filed by Jeffrey R. Gleit on behalf of OnCure Medical Corp., U.S. Cancer Care, Inc.. (Gleit, Jeffrey) |
|
Friday, January 26, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Affidavit
Fri 01/26 1:45 PM
Affidavit Statement of Corporate Ownership Filed by Marilyn Macron on behalf of Central Coast Medical Oncology Corp.. (Macron, Marilyn) |
|
Thursday, December 28, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Transcript
Fri 01/12 11:07 AM
Transcript regarding Hearing Held on 10/16/2017 10:17 AM RE: Pre-trial Conference; Debtors' Motion for Entry of an Order (I) Approving the Adequacy of the Disclosure Statement, (II) Approving the Solicitation and Notice Procedures with Respect to Confirmation of the Debtors Proposed Joint Plan of Reorganization, (III) Approving the Forms of Ballots and Notices in Connection Therewith, (IV) Approving the Rights Offering Procedures and Related Materials, (V) Scheduling Certain Dates with Respect Thereto, and (VI) Granting Related Relief..et al... Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 3/28/2018. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerks Office. [Transcription Service Agency: Veritext Legal Solutions.]. (See the Courts Website for contact information for the Transcription Service Agency.). Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 1/4/2018. Statement of Redaction Request Due By 1/18/2018. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 1/29/2018. Transcript access will be restricted through 3/28/2018. (Ortiz, Carmen) |
|
Monday, December 04, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
order
Application, Pro Hac Vice
Mon 12/04 2:02 PM
Order signed on 12/4/2017 Granting Application of Allen B. Grodsky for Admission to Practice Pro Hac Vice . (Li, Dorothy) |
|
10 | 10
order
Application, Pro Hac Vice
Mon 12/04 2:01 PM
Order Signed on 12/4/2017 Granting Application of Tim B. Henderson for Admission to Practice Pro Hac Vice . (Li, Dorothy) |
|
Wednesday, November 22, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Application, Pro Hac Vice Admission
Wed 11/22 9:18 AM
Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission Of Allen B. Grodsky filed by Marilyn Macron on behalf of Central Coast Medical Oncology Corp.. (Macron, Marilyn) |
|
8 | 8
motion
Application, Pro Hac Vice Admission
Wed 11/22 9:15 AM
Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Tim B. Henderson filed by Marilyn Macron on behalf of Central Coast Medical Oncology Corp.. (Macron, Marilyn) |
|
crditcrd
Auto - docket of credit card
Wed 11/22 9:16 AM
Receipt of Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission 17-08280 rdd) [motion,122] ( 200.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 12303997. Fee amount 200.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
crditcrd
Auto - docket of credit card
Wed 11/22 9:20 AM
Receipt of Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission 17-08280 rdd) [motion,122] ( 200.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 12304029. Fee amount 200.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
Wednesday, October 18, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
answer
None
Wed 10/18 12:05 PM
Answer to Counterclaim filed by Marilyn Macron on behalf of Central Coast Medical Oncology Corp.. (Macron, Marilyn) |
|
Friday, October 13, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
answer
Statement
Fri 10/13 12:40 AM
Statement Joint Rule 26(f) Report filed by John Thomas Weber on behalf of U.S. Cancer Care, Inc.. (Weber, John) |
|
Monday, October 02, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
answer|cmp
Answer, Amended Complaint|Counterclaim
Mon 10/02 9:30 AM
Answer to Complaint , Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim against all defendants filed by Christopher Marcus on behalf of U.S. Cancer Care, Inc.. (Marcus, Christopher) |
|
Monday, September 18, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Affidavit of Service
Mon 09/18 9:18 AM
Affidavit of Service Filed by Marilyn Macron on behalf of Central Coast Medical Oncology Corp.. (Macron, Marilyn) |
|
Tuesday, September 05, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
cmp
Amended Complaint
Tue 09/05 5:38 PM
Amended Complaint against all defendants Filed by Marilyn Macron on behalf of Central Coast Medical Oncology Corp.. (Macron, Marilyn) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 | ||
Friday, September 01, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
cmp
Auto Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference
Fri 09/01 2:49 PM
Summons with Notice of Pre-Trial Conference issued by Clerk's Office with Pre-Trial Conference set for 10/16/2017 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 118, White Plains Courthouse, Answer due by 10/2/2017. (Correa, Mimi) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (fee)
Fri 09/01 11:40 AM
Adversary case 17-08280 Complaint against U.S. CANCER CARE, INC., OnCure Medical Corp. (Fee Amount $ 350.). Nature(s) of Suit: (91 (Declaratory judgment)), (72 (Injunctive relief - other)) Filed by Marilyn Macron on behalf of Central Coast Medical Oncology Corp.. (Macron, Marilyn) |
|
Att: 1 Pleading Adverary Complaint | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 To Complaint | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to complaint | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit 3 to complaint | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit 4 to complaint |