Rogers v. Sood et al
Illinois Central District Court | |
Judge: | Sara Darrow |
Referred: | Eric I Long |
Case #: | 4:17-cv-04320 |
Nature of Suit | 550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Dec 06, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jun 27, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Tuesday, July 16, 2024 | ||
72 | 72
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 07/16 11:29 AM
Circuit Rule 3(b) Fee NOTICE re68 Notice of Appeal. (JS) |
|
71 | 71
appeal
USCA Notice of Docketing ROA
Tue 07/16 11:28 AM
NOTICE of Docketing Record on Appeal from USCA re68 Notice of Appeal filed by Udell Rogers. USCA Case Number 24-2208 (JS) |
|
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis
Tue 07/16 10:30 AM
TEXT ORDER entered by Chief Judge Sara Darrow on 7/16/2024. Plaintiff has filed a motion asking for leave to appeal in forma pauperis. Title 28 U.S.C. Section 1915(a)(3) provides that "an appeal may not be taken in forma pauperis if the trial court certifies in writing that it is not taken in good faith." Id. An appeal taken in "good faith" is not about the movant's sincerity or motivation. A good faith appeal is an appeal that "a reasonable person could suppose... has some merit." Walker v. O'Brien, 216 F.3d 626, 632 (7th Cir. 2000). The Court has reviewed Plaintiff's motion, his notice of appeal, and the Court's Order, and the Court does not see an arguable good faith basis for his appeal. Accordingly, the Court certifies pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1915(a)(3) that Plaintiff's petition to appeal in forma pauperis is not in good faith, and his motion69 is DENIED. If Plaintiff wishes to contest this Court's finding, he must renew his petition to proceed in forma pauperis with the Court of Appeals within thirty (30) days after service of this Order. Fed. R. App. Pro. 24(a). The Clerk of the Court is directed to send a copy of this Order to the United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit. (KE) |
||
Monday, July 15, 2024 | ||
70 | 70
appeal
Short Record of Appeal Sent to USCA
Mon 07/15 2:26 PM
Short Record of Appeal Sent to US Court of Appeals re68 Notice of Appeal. (JS) |
|
69 | 69
motion
Appeal In Forma Pauperis
Mon 07/15 2:24 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Udell Rogers. Responses due by 7/29/2024 (JS) |
|
68 | 68
appeal
Notice of Appeal
Mon 07/15 2:23 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to66 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment by Udell Rogers. (JS) |