Udell Rogers v. Kul Sood, et al
Original Case: 4:17-cv-04320
Seventh Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:24-cv-02208 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Jul 15, 2024 |
Last checked: Wednesday Jul 17, 2024 3:43 AM CDT |
Defendant - Appellee
KUL B. SOOD, Doctor
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
WEXFORD HEALTH SOURCES, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
UDELL ROGERS
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 07/17/2024 3:16 AM CDT |
Monday, July 15, 2024 | ||
1 | 1 Private civil case docketed. IFP pending in the District Court. Docketing Statement due for Appellant Udell Rogers by 07/22/2024. Transcript information sheet due by 07/29/2024. [1] [7393737] 24-2208 (AP) [Entered: 07/16/2024 10:02 AM] | |
Att: 1 24 pgs Civil Case | ||
Att: 2 2 pgs Attorney / Party Notice of Docketing | ||
Att: 3 1 pgs Notice to District Court |