EXCO Resources (XA), LLC Jointly Administered under 18-30155
Member Case
Lead case is: 4:18-bk-30155
Lead case is: 4:18-bk-30155
Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Marvin Isgur |
Case #: | 4:18-bk-30166 |
Case Filed: | Jan 15, 2018 |
Terminated: | Oct 20, 2021 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 10,001-25,000 |
Est. Assets | $500,000,001 to $1 billion |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,000,001 to $10 billion |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
EXCO Resources (XA), LLC, Debtor
12377 Merit Dr Ste 1700
Dallas, TX 75251-2256 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee
Office of the US Trustee 515 Rusk Ave Ste 3516
Houston, TX 77002 |
Docket last updated: 14 minutes ago |
Wednesday, October 20, 2021 | ||
court
Close Bankruptcy Case
Wed 10/20 2:36 PM
Bankruptcy Case Closed (TylerLaws) |
||
Thursday, January 18, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
![]() BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 01/18/2018. (Admin.) |
|
6 | 6
![]() BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 01/18/2018. (Admin.) |
|
5 | 5
![]() Declaration re: for Electronic Filing of Bankruptcy Petition and Master Mailing List (Matrix) (Filed By EXCO Resources (XA), LLC ). (gkel) |
|
Tuesday, January 16, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
![]() |
|
3 | 3
![]() Order Granting Emergency Motion for Joint Administration Signed on 1/16/2018. (than) |
|
2 | 2
![]() Emergency Motion Debtors' Emergency Motion for Joint Administration, Hearing Set for January 18, 2018 at 2:30 PM, Courtroom 404 Filed by Debtor EXCO Resources (XA), LLC (Helt, Marcus) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
court
Case Reassigned
Tue 01/16 10:09 AM
Judge Marvin Isgur added to case. Involvement of Judge David R Jones Terminated (than) |
||
Monday, January 15, 2018 | ||
1 | 1
![]() Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual Fee Amount $1717 Filed by EXCO Resources (XA), LLC. (Helt, Marcus) |
|
crditcrd
none
Mon 01/15 11:12 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 18-30166 [misc,volp11] (1717.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 19681208. Fee amount $1717.00. (U.S. Treasury) |