Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Marvin Isgur
Case #: 4:18-bk-30155
Case Filed:Jan 15, 2018
Terminated:Aug 13, 2019
Plan Confirmed:Jun 18, 2019

Debtor
EXCO Resources, Inc., Debtor
12377 Merit Dr Ste 1700
Dallas, TX 75251-2256
Represented By
Marcus Alan Helt
Gardere Wynne Sewell LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee
Office of the US Trustee 515 Rusk Ave Ste 3516
Houston, TX 77002
Represented By
Stephen Douglas Statham
Office Of Us Trustee
contact info
Hector Duran
U.S. Trustee
contact info


1. Exco Resources Wins Judge?s Blessing for Bankruptcy Exit (wsj.com)
Submitted Wed 06/19/2019
2. EXCO Resources Files For Chapter 11 Reorganization (nasdaq.com)
Submitted Tue 01/16/2018
Docket last updated: 2 minutes ago
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
2384 2384 motion Emergency Motion Tue 03/18 5:23 PM
Emergency Motion Requesting Clarification of Case Management Order and Matters Referred to Miscellaneous Proceeding Filed by Interested Party Jackson Walker (Boland, Jason)
Related: [-]