Member Case
Lead case is: 4:18-bk-30155

Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Marvin Isgur
Case #: 4:18-bk-30168
Case Filed:Jan 15, 2018
Terminated:Aug 13, 2019

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors10,001-25,000
Est. Assets$500,000,001 to $1 billion
Est. Liabilities $1,000,000,001 to $10 billion
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Raider Marketing GP, LLC, Debtor
12377 Merit Dr Ste 1700
Dallas, TX 75251-2256
Represented By
Marcus Alan Helt
Gardere Wynne Sewell LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee
Office of the US Trustee 515 Rusk Ave Ste 3516
Houston, TX 77002


Docket last updated: 14 minutes ago
Tuesday, August 13, 2019
court Close Bankruptcy Case Tue 08/13 4:07 PM
Bankruptcy Case Closed (LinhthuDo)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 18, 2018
8 8 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 01/18 11:56 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 01/18/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 3 Order on Emergency Motion
7 7 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 01/18 11:56 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 01/18/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 4 Order Regarding the Exchange of Exhibits and Witness lists in all contested matters and adversary proceedings
6 6 misc Declaration Thu 01/18 3:42 PM
Declaration re: for Electronic Filing of Bankruptcy Petition and Master Mailing List (Matrix) (Filed By Raider Marketing GP, LLC ). (gkel)
Related: [-]
5 5 court No Creditor Mailing List Thu 01/18 1:08 PM
No Creditor Mailing List (LaurenWebsteradi)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 16, 2018
4 4 order Judge Jones Order Regarding Exhibit and Witness Lists Tue 01/16 4:55 PM
Related: [-]
3 3 order Emergency Tue 01/16 10:12 AM
Order Granting Emergency Motion for Joint Administration Related [+] Signed on 1/16/2018. (than)
Related: [-] 2
2 2 motion Emergency Motion Tue 01/16 12:49 AM
Emergency Motion Debtors' Emergency Motion for Joint Administration, Hearing Set for January 18, 2018 at 2:30 PM, Courtroom 404 Filed by Debtor Raider Marketing GP, LLC (Helt, Marcus)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
court Case Reassigned Tue 01/16 10:13 AM
Judge Marvin Isgur added to case. Involvement of Judge David R Jones Terminated (than)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 15, 2018
1 1 33 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) [system event] Mon 01/15 11:22 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual Fee Amount $1717 Filed by Raider Marketing GP, LLC. (Helt, Marcus)
Related: [-]
crditcrd none Mon 01/15 11:24 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 18-30168 [misc,volp11] (1717.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 19681214. Fee amount $1717.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]