303 Dean Realty Inc.
New York Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Elizabeth S Stong |
Case #: | 1:18-bk-42786 |
Case Filed: | May 14, 2018 |
Terminated: | Jan 31, 2020 |
Plan Confirmed: | Dec 28, 2018 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Nature of Business | Single Asset Real Estate |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
303 Dean Realty Inc.
303 Dean St Apt 5
Brooklyn, NY 11217-1800 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee
Eastern District of NY (Brooklyn Office) U.S. Federal Office Building 201 Varick Street, Suite 1006
New York, NY 10014 |
Docket last updated: 09/13/2024 6:06 PM EDT |
Thursday, June 18, 2020 | ||
court
Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic
Fri 06/19 2:38 PM
Receipt of Fee for Certification of Document - $22.00. Receipt Number 264208 (mnc) |