Edith and Partners L.L.C. v. 303 Dean Realty Inc. et al
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:18-bk-42786
Lead BK case is: 1:18-bk-42786
New York Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Elizabeth S Stong |
Case #: | 1:18-ap-01061 |
Nature of Suit | 1 null |
Case Filed: | May 21, 2018 |
Terminated: | Jan 30, 2020 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
303 Dean Realty Inc.
303 Dean Street Apt 5
Brooklyn, NY 11217 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Amerasia Bank
19-02 Whitestone Exp. Suite 202
Whitestone, NY 11357 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Dawn Foster
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Bruce Fallon
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Environmental Control Board of the City of New York
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
The City of New York
Corporation Counsel of the City of the City of New York 60 John Street
New York, NY 10007 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
New York State Department of Taxation & Finance
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
People of the State of New York
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
New York City Department of Finance
60 John Street 15th Floor
New York, NY 10038 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
John Does 1-10
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
ABC LLC 1-10
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
XYZ Corp. 1-10
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Edith and Partners L.L.C.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Thursday, January 30, 2020 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Thu 01/30 10:25 AM
Adversary Case 1:18-ap-1061 Closed (fmr) |
||
Monday, January 13, 2020 | ||
18 | 18
order
Dismissing Adversary Proceeding
Tue 01/14 10:16 AM
Order, 303 Dean Realty Inc., the Debtor and Debtor-in-Possession (Debtor), by and through its attorneys, Rosen & Kantrow PLLC, submits this as and for its Notice of Dismissal as to all other parties to this action that did not appear in the action, without prejudice, pursuant to Bankruptcy Rule of Federal Procedure 7041. All parties that appeared have previously been dismissed from the action by prior order of this Court. . Signed on 1/13/2020 (fmr) |
|
Tuesday, November 19, 2019 | ||
17 | 17
notice
Notice of Dismissal of an Adversary Proceeding
Tue 11/19 1:30 PM
Notice of Dismissal of an Adversary Proceeding Filed by 303 Dean Realty Inc.. (Rosen, Avrum) |
|
Wednesday, May 01, 2019 | ||
16 | 16
order
Dismissing Adversary Proceeding
Wed 05/01 4:20 PM
Stipulation and Order by and between Wayne Greenwald, Attorneys for Plaintiff, Avrum J Rosen, Attorneys for Debtor - Defendant, Dawn Foster, Bruce Fallon and Stuart Kossar, Attorney for 303 Dean Street Lender - This action is discontinued without prejudic Signed on 5/1/2019 (sej) |
|
Tuesday, March 05, 2019 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Notice of Proposed Stipulation
Tue 03/05 4:09 PM
Notice of Proposed Stipulation By and Between Plaintiff and Defendants to Voluntary Dismissal Filed by 303 Dean Realty Inc.. (Rosen, Avrum). Related document(s)1 Notice of Removal filed by Plaintiff Edith and Partners L.L.C.. Modified on 3/6/2019 to create a relationship to document 1(fmr) |
|
Tuesday, December 18, 2018 | ||
court
zMinute Entry - Hearing Held (Case Owned AP)
Wed 12/19 1:37 PM
Hearing Held; - Appearance by Plaintiff and Defendant - Settled - Submit stipulation - MARKED OFF, IT IS SO ORDERED BY s/Elizabeth S. Stong. Endorsed on Calendar dated 12/18/18 (This is a text Order, no document is attached) (sjackson) |
||
court
zMinute Entry - Hearing Held - Text Orders (Document BK & AP)
Wed 12/19 1:38 PM
Hearing Held; - Appearance by Plaintiff and Defendant - Settled - MARKED OFF, IT IS SO ORDERED BY s/Elizabeth S. Stong. Endorsed on Calendar dated 12/18/18 (This is a text Order, no document is attached) (sjackson) |
||
Monday, December 10, 2018 | ||
court
zMinute Entry - Hearing Adjourned Without Hearing (Case Owned AP)
Tue 12/11 8:36 AM
Adjourned Without Hearing Pre-Trial Conference set for 12/18/2018 at 03:00 PM at Courtroom 3585 ( Judge Stong), Brooklyn, NY. (sjackson) |
||
court
zMinute Entry - Hearing Adjourned Without Hearing (Document BK & AP)
Tue 12/11 8:36 AM
Adjourned Without Hearing Hearing scheduled for 12/18/2018 at 03:00 PM at Courtroom 3585 ( Judge Stong), Brooklyn, NY. (sjackson) |
||
Thursday, November 29, 2018 | ||
court
zMinute Entry - Hearing Adjourned Without Hearing (Case Owned AP)
Fri 12/07 5:53 PM
Adjourned Without Hearing Pre-Trial Conference set for 12/10/2018 at 10:00 AM at 3585. (sjackson) |
||
court
zMinute Entry - Hearing Adjourned Without Hearing (Document BK & AP)
Fri 12/07 5:53 PM
Adjourned Without Hearing Hearing scheduled for 12/10/2018 at 10:00 AM at 3585. (sjackson) Modified on 12/7/2018 (sej) |
||
Wednesday, November 28, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Letter of Adjournment - (Do not use to adjourn 341 meetings)
Wed 11/28 6:11 PM
Letter of Adjournment: Hearing rescheduled from November 29, 2018 9:30 a.m. to December 10, 2018 at 10:00 a.m. Filed by Avrum J Rosen on behalf of 303 Dean Realty Inc. (Rosen, Avrum) |
|
Tuesday, October 23, 2018 | ||
court
zMinute Entry - Hearing Adjourned Without Hearing (Case Owned AP)
Wed 10/24 1:53 PM
Adjourned Without Hearing Pre-Trial Conference set for 11/29/2018 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 3585 ( Judge Stong), Brooklyn, NY. (sjackson) |
||
court
zMinute Entry - Hearing Adjourned Without Hearing (Document BK & AP)
Wed 10/24 2:02 PM
Adjourned Without Hearing Hearing scheduled for 11/29/2018 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 3585 ( Judge Stong), Brooklyn, NY. (sjackson) |
||
Friday, September 21, 2018 | ||
court
zMinute Entry - Hearing Adjourned Without Hearing (Case Owned AP)
Mon 09/24 11:51 AM
Adjourned Without Hearing Pre-Trial Conference set for 10/23/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 3585 ( Judge Stong), Brooklyn, NY. (sjackson) |
||
court
zMinute Entry - Hearing Adjourned Without Hearing (Document BK & AP)
Mon 09/24 11:51 AM
Adjourned Without Hearing Hearing scheduled for 10/23/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 3585 ( Judge Stong), Brooklyn, NY. (sjackson) |
||
Thursday, September 20, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Letter of Adjournment - (Do not use to adjourn 341 meetings)
Thu 09/20 5:02 PM
Letter of Adjournment: Hearing rescheduled from September 21, 2018 at 10:30 a.m. to October 23, 2018 at 10:00 a.m. Filed by Avrum J Rosen on behalf of 303 Dean Realty Inc. (Rosen, Avrum) |
|
Tuesday, July 24, 2018 | ||
court
zMinute Entry - Hearing Held and Adjourned (Case Owned AP)
Wed 07/25 12:17 PM
Hearing Held and Adjourned; Appearance by Plaintiff and Defendant - Pre-Trial Conference set for 09/21/2018 at 10:30 AM at 3585. (sjackson) |
||
court
zMinute Entry - Hearing Held and Adjourned (Document BK & AP)
Wed 07/25 12:18 PM
Hearing Held and Adjourned; Appearance by Plaintiff and Defendant - Hearing scheduled for 09/21/2018 at 10:30 AM at 3585. (sjackson) |
||
Monday, July 23, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
answer
Reply
Mon 07/23 10:38 AM
Reply in support of motion to remand or abstain Filed by Wayne M Greenwald on behalf of Edith and Partners L.L.C. (Greenwald, Wayne) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit "A" EDNY Statistics 2018 | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit "B" EDNY 2017 Statistcs | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit "C" NY Courts Report 2015 | ||
Monday, July 16, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Affidavit/Certificate of Service
Mon 07/16 5:55 PM
Affidavit/Certificate of Service Filed by Avrum J Rosen on behalf of 303 Dean Realty Inc. (Rosen, Avrum) |
|
10 | 10
answer
Affirmation in Opposition
Mon 07/16 4:09 PM
Affirmation in Opposition Filed by Avrum J Rosen on behalf of 303 Dean Realty Inc. (Rosen, Avrum) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E | ||
Friday, June 22, 2018 | ||
court
zMinute Entry - Hearing Held and Adjourned (Case Owned AP)
Fri 06/22 9:39 PM
Hearing Held and Adjourned; Appearance by Plaintiff and Defendant - Pre-Trial Conference set for 07/24/2018 at 10:30 AM at Courtroom 3585 ( Judge Stong), Brooklyn, NY. (sjackson) |
||
Tuesday, June 19, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Remand
Tue 06/19 10:07 PM
Motion for Remand and Abstention Filed by Wayne M Greenwald on behalf of Edith and Partners L.L.C.. Hearing scheduled for 7/24/2018 at 10:30 AM at Courtroom 3585 ( Judge Stong), Brooklyn, NY. (Greenwald, Wayne) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A Complaint | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B Amended Answer | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C Answer | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D Docket Sheet | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E Removal Petition | ||
Att: 6 Notice of Motion | ||
Saturday, May 26, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Application/Notice/Order
Sun 05/27 12:16 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Application/Notice/Order Notice Date 05/26/2018. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, May 25, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Affidavit
Fri 05/25 7:59 AM
Affidavit Re: Rule 9027 Filed by Avrum J Rosen on behalf of 303 Dean Realty Inc. (Rosen, Avrum) |
|
6 | 6
misc
Affidavit/Certificate of Service
Fri 05/25 7:57 AM
Affidavit/Certificate of Service Filed by Avrum J Rosen on behalf of 303 Dean Realty Inc. (Rosen, Avrum) |
|
Thursday, May 24, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Exhibit
Thu 05/24 5:48 PM
Exhibit Defendant Answer with Counterclaims filed in State Court Action Filed by Avrum J Rosen on behalf of 303 Dean Realty Inc. (Rosen, Avrum) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Exhibit
Thu 05/24 5:47 PM
Exhibit Debtor's Amended Answer in State Court Action Filed by Avrum J Rosen on behalf of 303 Dean Realty Inc. (Rosen, Avrum) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Exhibit
Thu 05/24 5:46 PM
Exhibit Summons and Complaint in State Court Action Filed by Avrum J Rosen on behalf of 303 Dean Realty Inc. (Rosen, Avrum) |
|
2 | 2
court
Notice of Pre-Trial Conference Re: Notice of Removal
Thu 05/24 3:09 PM
Notice of Pre-Trial Conference Pre-Trial Conference set for 6/22/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 3585 ( Judge Stong), Brooklyn, NY. (sld) |
|
Monday, May 21, 2018 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal
Mon 05/21 8:16 AM
Adversary case 1 18-01061 Notice of Removal by Edith and Partners L.L.C.. Fee Amount $350. Nature(s) of Suit: (01 (Determination of removed claim or cause)). (Rosen, Avrum) |
|
Att: 1 Adversary Cover Sheet | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit "A" Summons and Complaint | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit "B" Debtor's Amended Answer | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit "C" Amerasia Bank Answer |