Shawntae Harris
Georgia Northern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | James R Sacca |
Case #: | 2:18-bk-21635 |
Case Filed: | Aug 18, 2018 |
Terminated: | Jun 15, 2021 |
Debtor
Shawntae Harris
298 Grandview Cir
Cornelia, GA 30531-4411 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: Thursday Aug 23, 2018 2:15 PM EDT |
Creditor
BMW Bank of North America
4515 N Santa Fe Ave. Dept. APS
Oklahoma City, OK 73118 |
|
Creditor
Synchrony Bank
PO Box 41021
Norfolk, VA 23541 |
|
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee
362 Richard Russell Building 75 Ted Turner Drive, SW
Atlanta, GA 30303 |
Represented By
|
1. | Rapper Da Brat Files for Bankruptcy, Drowning in $7.7 Million of Debt (theblast.com) |
Submitted Thu 08/23/2018 | |
Docket last updated: 35 minutes ago |
Tuesday, June 15, 2021 | ||
misc
06-Close Bankruptcy Case - Dismissed
Tue 06/15 3:54 PM
Case Closed (gnh) |