Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:18-bk-21635

Georgia Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:James R Sacca
Case #: 2:19-ap-02005
Nature of Suit68 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury
41 Bankruptcy - Objection / revocation of discharge - §727(c),(d),(e)
Case Filed:Jan 18, 2019
Terminated:Sep 17, 2020
Last checked: never
Defendant
Shawntae Harris
298 Grandview Circle
Cornelia, GA 30531
Represented By
Shawntae Harris
contact info
Plaintiff
Shayla Stevens
Tozzi Law LLC One Decatur Town Center, Suite 200
Decatur, GA 30030
Represented By
William Anderson Rountree
Rountree & Leitman, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 1:06 PM EDT
Saturday, September 19, 2020
35 35 misc Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order (492) Sun 09/20 12:53 AM
Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order Notice Date 09/19/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 17, 2020
34 34 order 01-Order Thu 09/17 1:59 PM
Final Consent Order. Service by BNC. Entered on 9/17/2020. Related [+] (gnh)
Related: [-] 1
misc Adversary Closed Thu 09/17 2:42 PM
Adversary 2:19-ap-2005 Closed (gnh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 27, 2020
33 33 misc Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order (492) Fri 08/28 12:55 AM
Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order Notice Date 08/27/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 25, 2020
32 32 order 01-Order Tue 08/25 1:27 PM
Order GRANTING Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss Counts III, IV and V of the Complaint and DENYING Defendant's Motion to Amend the Complaint as Moot and FURTHER ORDERING that Defendant shall file a written Answer to Counts I and II of the Complaint on or before September 11, 2020. Service by BNC. Entered on 8/25/2020. Related [+] (ggd)
Related: [-] 5 ,28
Tuesday, August 18, 2020
31 31 misc 0-Certificate of Service Tue 08/18 4:07 PM
Certificate of Service documents in compliance with the Courts Order dated August 11, 2020 [ Filed by Shayna M. Steinfeld on behalf of Shawntae Harris aka Da Brat. Related [+] (Steinfeld, Shayna)
Related: [-] 29
Friday, August 14, 2020
30 30 misc Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order (492) Sat 08/15 12:54 AM
Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order Notice Date 08/14/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 12, 2020
29 29 order 01-Order Wed 08/12 7:04 AM
Protective Order Service by BNC. Entered on 8/12/2020. (jwc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 23, 2020
28 28 motion Amend, Motion to Thu 07/23 8:54 PM
Motion to Amend Complaint filed by David S. Klein on behalf of Shayla Stevens. Related [+] (Klein, David)
Related: [-] 1
Att: 1 Proposed Amended and Restated Complaint
27 27 answer Response to Motion Thu 07/23 8:49 PM
Response to Motion filed by David S. Klein on behalf of Shayla Stevens. Related [+](Klein, David)
Related: [-] 5
Thursday, July 09, 2020
26 26 misc Status Report Thu 07/09 5:40 PM
Status Report Joint Mediation Report Filed by Benjamin Keck on behalf of Shayla Stevens. Related [+] (Keck, Benjamin)
Related: [-] 17 ,18
Monday, March 09, 2020
25 25 notice Notice (AP) Mon 03/09 4:10 PM
Notice of Leave of Absence:April 6 2020; May 1, 2020 and May 4, 2020; May 20, 2020 through May 24, 2020; May 26, 2020 through May 29, 2020; June 5, 2020 and June 8, 2020; July 8, 2020 through July 10, 2020; and September 28, 2020 (Yom Kippur). filed by Shayna M. Steinfeld on behalf of Shawntae Harris aka Da Brat. (Steinfeld, Shayna)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 28, 2020
24 24 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 02/28 6:52 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by David S. Klein on behalf of Shayla Stevens. (Klein, David)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 16, 2020
23 23 notice Notice of Leave of Absence Thu 01/16 4:19 PM
Notice of Leave of Absence of William A. Rountree from January 24-29, 2020. (gnh-Intake)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 27, 2019
22 22 notice Notice of Leave of Absence Fri 09/27 2:39 PM
Notice of Leave of Absence for October 9, 2019; November 5, 2019 through November 8, 2019; November 26, 2019 through November 27, 2019; December 23, 2019 through January 3, 2020 for Shayna M Steinfeld. (jwc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 11, 2019
21 21 misc 0-Withdrawal of Document Thu 04/11 6:53 PM
Withdrawal of Document of Notice pursuant Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 45(a)(4), as incorporated by Fed.R.Bankr.P. 9016, Subpoena to Produce Documents, Information, or Objects or to Permit Inspection of Premises in a Bankruptcy Case (or Adversary Proceeding) Filed by Shayna M. Steinfeld on behalf of Shawntae Harris aka Da Brat. Related [+] (Steinfeld, Shayna)
Related: [-] 20
20 20 notice Notice (AP) Thu 04/11 5:31 PM
Notice of Service ofSubpoena to Produce Documents, Information, or Objects or to Permit Inspection of Premises in a Bankruptcy Case (or Adversary Proceeding) on Chamberlain, Hrdlicka, White, Williams & Aughtry, P.C. filed by Shayna M. Steinfeld on behalf of Shawntae Harris aka Da Brat. (Steinfeld, Shayna)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit subpoena
Friday, April 05, 2019
19 19 misc Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order on Mediation Sat 04/06 1:24 AM
Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order on Mediation Notice Date 04/05/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 04, 2019
18 18 order Dismiss, Motion to Thu 04/04 7:19 AM
Order Extending Deadlines for the Parties to Respond to Certain Pleadings. Related [+] Service by BNC. Entered on 4/4/2019. (jwc)
Related: [-] 5
Wednesday, April 03, 2019
17 17 order Mediation, Motion for Wed 04/03 3:51 PM
Order Authorizing and Directing Mediation. Related [+] Service by BNC. Entered on 4/3/2019. (jwc)
Related: [-] 16
16 16 motion Mediation, Motion for Wed 04/03 11:24 AM
Joint Motion for Mediation filed by Samantha L. Tzoberi on behalf of Shayla Stevens. (Tzoberi, Samantha)
Related: [-]
Saturday, March 09, 2019
15 15 misc Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order on Motion to Extend Time Sun 03/10 1:17 AM
Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order on Motion to Extend Time Notice Date 03/09/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 08, 2019
14 14 notice Notice of Leave of Absence Fri 03/08 3:03 PM
Notice of Leave of Absence from March 29-April 8, 2019; and June 10-June 24, 2019 (gnh-Intake)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 07, 2019
13 13 order Extend Time, Motion to Thu 03/07 2:34 PM
Order on Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Claims Related [+] Service by BNC. Entered on 3/7/2019. (gnh)
Related: [-] 12
Tuesday, March 05, 2019
12 12 motion Extend Time, Motion to Tue 03/05 1:57 PM
Consent Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Motion to Dismiss Claims filed by Samantha L. Tzoberi on behalf of Shayla Stevens. Related [+] (Tzoberi, Samantha)
Related: [-] 5
Friday, March 01, 2019
11 11 misc Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order and Notice Sat 03/02 1:17 AM
Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order and Notice Notice Date 03/01/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 27, 2019
10 10 2 pgs notice Order and Notice Wed 02/27 12:49 PM
Order and Notice of Status Conference. Service by BNC. Entered on 2/27/2019. Hearing to be held on 3/26/2019 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 1404, Atlanta, (jwc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 26, 2019
9 9 notice Notice Tue 02/26 11:10 AM
Notice of Leave of Absence:March 11, 2019 through March 15, 2019; April 8 2019; May 6, 2019 through May 17, 2019; May23, 2019 and May 24, 2019; June 3, 2019 and July 10, 2019 through July 12, 2019. filed by Shayna M. Steinfeld on behalf of Shawntae Harris aka Da Brat. (Steinfeld, Shayna)
Related: [-]
Sunday, February 24, 2019
8 8 misc Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order and Notice Mon 02/25 1:24 AM
Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order and Notice Notice Date 02/24/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 22, 2019
7 7 2 pgs notice Order and Notice Fri 02/22 2:11 PM
Order and Notice of Status Conference. Service by BNC. Entered on 2/22/2019. Hearing to be held on 3/12/2019 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 1404, Atlanta, (jwc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 19, 2019
6 6 misc Brief Tue 02/19 1:34 PM
Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss Filed by Shayna M. Steinfeld on behalf of Shawntae Harris aka Da Brat. Related [+] (Steinfeld, Shayna)
Related: [-] 5
5 5 motion Dismiss, Motion to Tue 02/19 1:33 PM
Motion to Dismiss and request for definitive period to file answer following ruling on this motion filed by Shayna M. Steinfeld on behalf of Shawntae Harris aka Da Brat. (Steinfeld, Shayna)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 23, 2019
4 4 misc 0-Certificate of Service Wed 01/23 6:54 PM
Certificate of Service of Adversary Complaint and Summons Filed by William Anderson Rountree on behalf of Shayla Stevens. Related [+] (Rountree, William) Modified on 1/24/2019 (jwc)
Related: [-] 1 2
Tuesday, January 22, 2019
3 3 court Summons/Alias Summons Issued (auto) Tue 01/22 2:37 PM
Summons Issued on Shawntae Harris aka Da Brat. Answer Due 02/21/2019 (ggd)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 18, 2019
2 2 crditcrd Autodocket of Credit Card Fri 01/18 5:52 PM
Receipt of Complaint 19-02005 [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) filing fee. Receipt Number 50076460. Fee Amount 350.00 Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 01/18 5:50 PM
Adversary case 19-02005 Complaint against Shawntae Harris for Determination of Dischargeability and Discharge , Fee Collected $ 350 68 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury) 41 (Objection / revocation of discharge - 727(c),(d),(e)) Filed by Shayla Stevens (Rountree, William)
Related: [-]