OG Resources Wind Down Co, LLC
Member Case
Lead case is: 2:18-bk-04177
Lead case is: 2:18-bk-04177
Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Tamara O Mitchell |
Case #: | 2:18-bk-04176 |
Case Filed: | Oct 14, 2018 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 200-999 |
Est. Assets | $50,000,001 to $100 million |
Est. Liabilities | $100,000,001 to $500 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Oak Grove Resources, LLC
7 Sheridan Sq Ste 300
Kingsport, TN 37660-7451 |
Represented By
|
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Tuesday, July 23, 2019 | ||
18 | 18
![]() Order Granting Reorganized Debtors' Motion for Administrative Order Changing Dockets and Case Caption to Reflect that Each of the Debtors 1) Are now Reorganized Debtors, 2) Have Undergone a Legal Name Change, and 3) Have a Change of Address Signed on 7/23/2019. (klt) |
|
Thursday, February 14, 2019 | ||
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card
Thu 02/14 8:51 AM
Receipt of Amended Schedules (Fee)([LINK 18-04176 TOM11] ) [misc,amdsch2] ( 31.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A23211046. Fee Amount 31.00 (U.S. Treasury) |
||
Wednesday, February 13, 2019 | ||
17 | 17
![]() Amended Schedules. AMENDED SCHEDULES OF ASSETS AND LIABILITIES FOR OAK GROVE RESOURCES, LLC Fee Amount $31 Filed by Debtor Oak Grove Resources, LLC. (Bensinger, Bill) |
|
Friday, November 16, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
![]() Statement of Financial Affairs for Non-Individual Filed by Debtor Oak Grove Resources, LLC. (Sparks, Daniel) |
|
15 | 15
![]() Schedules A-J Filed by Debtor Oak Grove Resources, LLC. (Sparks, Daniel) |
|
Thursday, October 18, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
![]() BNC Certificate of Notice . Notice Date 10/18/2018. (Admin.) |
|
Tuesday, October 16, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
![]() Order Granting Debtors Motion for Entry of an Order (I) Directing Joint Administration of Chapter 11 Cases and (II) Granting Related Relief. All original pleadings shall be captioned as indicated and all original docket entries shall be made in the case of mission Coal Company, LLC, Case No. 18-04177 TOM-11. An order has been entered in this case directing the consolidation and joint administration for procedural purposes only of the chapter 11 cases of Mission Coal Company, LLC, Case No. 18-04177 11; Beard Pinnacle, LLC, Case No. 18-04178 11; Oak Grove Land Company, LLC, Case No. 04179-11; Oak Grove Resources, LLC, Case No. 18-04176 11; Pinnacle Land Company, LLC, Case No. 18-04180 11; Pinnacle Mining Company, LLC, Case No. 18-04181 11; Seminole Alabama Mining Complex, LLC, Case No. 18-04182 11; Seminole Coal Resources, LLC, Case No. 18-04183 11; Seminole West Virginia Mining Complex, LLC, Case No. 18-04184 11; Seneca Coal Resources, LLC, Case No. 18-04185 11; and Seneca North American Coal, LLC, Case No. 18-04186 11. The docket in the chapter 11 case of Mission Coal Company, Inc., Case No. 18-04177 should be consulted for all matters affecting this case and the affiliated Case Nos. 18-04178 18-04179 18-04176 18-04180 18-04181 18-04182 18-04183 18-04184 18-04185 and 18-04186 Signed on 10/16/2018. (klt) |
|
12 | 12
![]() Order Granting Debtors Motion for Entry of an Order (I) Directing Joint Administration of Chapter 11 Cases and (II) Granting Related Relief. All original pleadings shall be captioned as indicated and all original docket entries shall be made in the case of mission Coal Company, LLC, Case No. 18-04177 TOM-11. An order has been entered in this case directing the consolidation and joint administration for procedural purposes only of the chapter 11 cases of Mission Coal Company, LLC, Case No. 18-04177 11; Beard Pinnacle, LLC, Case No. 18-04178 11; Oak Grove Land Company, LLC, Case No. 04179-11; Oak Grove Resources, LLC, Case No. 18-04176 11; Pinnacle Land Company, LLC, Case No. 18-04180 11; Pinnacle Mining Company, LLC, Case No. 18-04181 11; Seminole Alabama Mining Complex, LLC, Case No. 18-04182 11; Seminole Coal Resources, LLC, Case No. 18-04183 11; Seminole West Virginia Mining Complex, LLC, Case No. 18-04184 11; Seneca Coal Resources, LLC, Case No. 18-04185 11; and Seneca North American Coal, LLC, Case No. 18-04186 11. The docket in the chapter 11 case of Mission Coal Company, Inc., Case No. 18-04177 should be consulted for all matters affecting this case and the affiliated Case Nos. 18-04178 18-04179 18-04176 18-04180 18-04181 18-04182 18-04183 18-04184 18-04185 and 18-04186 Signed on 10/16/2018. (klt) |
|
11 | 11
![]() Order Granting Debtors Motion for Entry of an Order (I) Directing Joint Administration of Chapter 11 Cases and (II) Granting Related Relief. All original pleadings shall be captioned as indicated and all original docket entries shall be made in the case of mission Coal Company, LLC, Case No. 18-04177 TOM-11. An order has been entered in this case directing the consolidation and joint administration for procedural purposes only of the chapter 11 cases of Mission Coal Company, LLC, Case No. 18-04177 11; Beard Pinnacle, LLC, Case No. 18-04178 11; Oak Grove Land Company, LLC, Case No. 04179-11; Oak Grove Resources, LLC, Case No. 18-04176 11; Pinnacle Land Company, LLC, Case No. 18-04180 11; Pinnacle Mining Company, LLC, Case No. 18-04181 11; Seminole Alabama Mining Complex, LLC, Case No. 18-04182 11; Seminole Coal Resources, LLC, Case No. 18-04183 11; Seminole West Virginia Mining Complex, LLC, Case No. 18-04184 11; Seneca Coal Resources, LLC, Case No. 18-04185 11; and Seneca North American Coal, LLC, Case No. 18-04186 11. The docket in the chapter 11 case of Mission Coal Company, Inc., Case No. 18-04177 should be consulted for all matters affecting this case and the affiliated Case Nos. 18-04178 18-04179 18-04176 18-04180 18-04181 18-04182 18-04183 18-04184 18-04185 and 18-04186 Signed on 10/16/2018. (klt) |
|
10 | 10
![]() Order Granting Debtors Motion for Entry of an Order (I) Directing Joint Administration of Chapter 11 Cases and (II) Granting Related Relief. All original pleadings shall be captioned as indicated and all original docket entries shall be made in the case of mission Coal Company, LLC, Case No. 18-04177 TOM-11. An order has been entered in this case directing the consolidation and joint administration for procedural purposes only of the chapter 11 cases of Mission Coal Company, LLC, Case No. 18-04177 11; Beard Pinnacle, LLC, Case No. 18-04178 11; Oak Grove Land Company, LLC, Case No. 04179-11; Oak Grove Resources, LLC, Case No. 18-04176 11; Pinnacle Land Company, LLC, Case No. 18-04180 11; Pinnacle Mining Company, LLC, Case No. 18-04181 11; Seminole Alabama Mining Complex, LLC, Case No. 18-04182 11; Seminole Coal Resources, LLC, Case No. 18-04183 11; Seminole West Virginia Mining Complex, LLC, Case No. 18-04184 11; Seneca Coal Resources, LLC, Case No. 18-04185 11; and Seneca North American Coal, LLC, Case No. 18-04186 11. The docket in the chapter 11 case of Mission Coal Company, Inc., Case No. 18-04177 should be consulted for all matters affecting this case and the affiliated Case Nos. 18-04178 18-04179 18-04176 18-04180 18-04181 18-04182 18-04183 18-04184 18-04185 and 18-04186 Signed on 10/16/2018. (klt) |
|
9 | 9
![]() Order Granting Debtors Motion for Entry of an Order (I) Directing Joint Administration of Chapter 11 Cases and (II) Granting Related Relief. All original pleadings shall be captioned as indicated and all original docket entries shall be made in the case of mission Coal Company, LLC, Case No. 18-04177 TOM-11. An order has been entered in this case directing the consolidation and joint administration for procedural purposes only of the chapter 11 cases of Mission Coal Company, LLC, Case No. 18-04177 11; Beard Pinnacle, LLC, Case No. 18-04178 11; Oak Grove Land Company, LLC, Case No. 04179-11; Oak Grove Resources, LLC, Case No. 18-04176 11; Pinnacle Land Company, LLC, Case No. 18-04180 11; Pinnacle Mining Company, LLC, Case No. 18-04181 11; Seminole Alabama Mining Complex, LLC, Case No. 18-04182 11; Seminole Coal Resources, LLC, Case No. 18-04183 11; Seminole West Virginia Mining Complex, LLC, Case No. 18-04184 11; Seneca Coal Resources, LLC, Case No. 18-04185 11; and Seneca North American Coal, LLC, Case No. 18-04186 11. The docket in the chapter 11 case of Mission Coal Company, Inc., Case No. 18-04177 should be consulted for all matters affecting this case and the affiliated Case Nos. 18-04178 18-04179 18-04176 18-04180 18-04181 18-04182 18-04183 18-04184 18-04185 and 18-04186 Signed on 10/16/2018. (klt) |
|
8 | 8
![]() Order Granting Debtors Motion for Entry of an Order (I) Directing Joint Administration of Chapter 11 Cases and (II) Granting Related Relief. All original pleadings shall be captioned as indicated and all original docket entries shall be made in the case of mission Coal Company, LLC, Case No. 18-04177 TOM-11. An order has been entered in this case directing the consolidation and joint administration for procedural purposes only of the chapter 11 cases of Mission Coal Company, LLC, Case No. 18-04177 11; Beard Pinnacle, LLC, Case No. 18-04178 11; Oak Grove Land Company, LLC, Case No. 04179-11; Oak Grove Resources, LLC, Case No. 18-04176 11; Pinnacle Land Company, LLC, Case No. 18-04180 11; Pinnacle Mining Company, LLC, Case No. 18-04181 11; Seminole Alabama Mining Complex, LLC, Case No. 18-04182 11; Seminole Coal Resources, LLC, Case No. 18-04183 11; Seminole West Virginia Mining Complex, LLC, Case No. 18-04184 11; Seneca Coal Resources, LLC, Case No. 18-04185 11; and Seneca North American Coal, LLC, Case No. 18-04186 11. The docket in the chapter 11 case of Mission Coal Company, Inc., Case No. 18-04177 should be consulted for all matters affecting this case and the affiliated Case Nos. 18-04178 18-04179 18-04176 18-04180 18-04181 18-04182 18-04183 18-04184 18-04185 and 18-04186 Signed on 10/16/2018. (klt) |
|
7 | 7
![]() Order Granting Debtors Motion for Entry of an Order (I) Directing Joint Administration of Chapter 11 Cases and (II) Granting Related Relief. All original pleadings shall be captioned as indicated and all original docket entries shall be made in the case of mission Coal Company, LLC, Case No. 18-04177 TOM-11. An order has been entered in this case directing the consolidation and joint administration for procedural purposes only of the chapter 11 cases of Mission Coal Company, LLC, Case No. 18-04177 11; Beard Pinnacle, LLC, Case No. 18-04178 11; Oak Grove Land Company, LLC, Case No. 04179-11; Oak Grove Resources, LLC, Case No. 18-04176 11; Pinnacle Land Company, LLC, Case No. 18-04180 11; Pinnacle Mining Company, LLC, Case No. 18-04181 11; Seminole Alabama Mining Complex, LLC, Case No. 18-04182 11; Seminole Coal Resources, LLC, Case No. 18-04183 11; Seminole West Virginia Mining Complex, LLC, Case No. 18-04184 11; Seneca Coal Resources, LLC, Case No. 18-04185 11; and Seneca North American Coal, LLC, Case No. 18-04186 11. The docket in the chapter 11 case of Mission Coal Company, Inc., Case No. 18-04177 should be consulted for all matters affecting this case and the affiliated Case Nos. 18-04178 18-04179 18-04176 18-04180 18-04181 18-04182 18-04183 18-04184 18-04185 and 18-04186 Signed on 10/16/2018. (klt) |
|
6 | 6
![]() Order Granting Debtors Motion for Entry of an Order (I) Directing Joint Administration of Chapter 11 Cases and (II) Granting Related Relief. All original pleadings shall be captioned as indicated and all original docket entries shall be made in the case of mission Coal Company, LLC, Case No. 18-04177 TOM-11. An order has been entered in this case directing the consolidation and joint administration for procedural purposes only of the chapter 11 cases of Mission Coal Company, LLC, Case No. 18-04177 11; Beard Pinnacle, LLC, Case No. 18-04178 11; Oak Grove Land Company, LLC, Case No. 04179-11; Oak Grove Resources, LLC, Case No. 18-04176 11; Pinnacle Land Company, LLC, Case No. 18-04180 11; Pinnacle Mining Company, LLC, Case No. 18-04181 11; Seminole Alabama Mining Complex, LLC, Case No. 18-04182 11; Seminole Coal Resources, LLC, Case No. 18-04183 11; Seminole West Virginia Mining Complex, LLC, Case No. 18-04184 11; Seneca Coal Resources, LLC, Case No. 18-04185 11; and Seneca North American Coal, LLC, Case No. 18-04186 11. The docket in the chapter 11 case of Mission Coal Company, Inc., Case No. 18-04177 should be consulted for all matters affecting this case and the affiliated Case Nos. 18-04178 18-04179 18-04176 18-04180 18-04181 18-04182 18-04183 18-04184 18-04185 and 18-04186 Signed on 10/16/2018. (klt) |
|
5 | 5
![]() Order Granting Debtors Motion for Entry of an Order (I) Directing Joint Administration of Chapter 11 Cases and (II) Granting Related Relief. All original pleadings shall be captioned as indicated and all original docket entries shall be made in the case of mission Coal Company, LLC, Case No. 18-04177 TOM-11. An order has been entered in this case directing the consolidation and joint administration for procedural purposes only of the chapter 11 cases of Mission Coal Company, LLC, Case No. 18-04177 11; Beard Pinnacle, LLC, Case No. 18-04178 11; Oak Grove Land Company, LLC, Case No. 04179-11; Oak Grove Resources, LLC, Case No. 18-04176 11; Pinnacle Land Company, LLC, Case No. 18-04180 11; Pinnacle Mining Company, LLC, Case No. 18-04181 11; Seminole Alabama Mining Complex, LLC, Case No. 18-04182 11; Seminole Coal Resources, LLC, Case No. 18-04183 11; Seminole West Virginia Mining Complex, LLC, Case No. 18-04184 11; Seneca Coal Resources, LLC, Case No. 18-04185 11; and Seneca North American Coal, LLC, Case No. 18-04186 11. The docket in the chapter 11 case of Mission Coal Company, Inc., Case No. 18-04177 should be consulted for all matters affecting this case and the affiliated Case Nos. 18-04178 18-04179 18-04176 18-04180 18-04181 18-04182 18-04183 18-04184 18-04185 and 18-04186 Signed on 10/16/2018. (klt) |
|
4 | 4
![]() Order Granting Debtors Motion for Entry of an Order (I) Directing Joint Administration of Chapter 11 Cases and (II) Granting Related Relief. All original pleadings shall be captioned as indicated and all original docket entries shall be made in the case of mission Coal Company, LLC, Case No. 18-04177 TOM-11. An order has been entered in this case directing the consolidation and joint administration for procedural purposes only of the chapter 11 cases of Mission Coal Company, LLC, Case No. 18-04177 11; Beard Pinnacle, LLC, Case No. 18-04178 11; Oak Grove Land Company, LLC, Case No. 04179-11; Oak Grove Resources, LLC, Case No. 18-04176 11; Pinnacle Land Company, LLC, Case No. 18-04180 11; Pinnacle Mining Company, LLC, Case No. 18-04181 11; Seminole Alabama Mining Complex, LLC, Case No. 18-04182 11; Seminole Coal Resources, LLC, Case No. 18-04183 11; Seminole West Virginia Mining Complex, LLC, Case No. 18-04184 11; Seneca Coal Resources, LLC, Case No. 18-04185 11; and Seneca North American Coal, LLC, Case No. 18-04186 11. The docket in the chapter 11 case of Mission Coal Company, Inc., Case No. 18-04177 should be consulted for all matters affecting this case and the affiliated Case Nos. 18-04178 18-04179 18-04176 18-04180 18-04181 18-04182 18-04183 18-04184 18-04185 and 18-04186 Signed on 10/16/2018. (klt) |
|
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card
Tue 10/16 8:07 AM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 18-04176 11] ) [misc,volp11] (1717.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number duplicate (fee paid). Fee Amount 1717.00 (thc) |
||
Monday, October 15, 2018 | ||
court
Receipt of Filing Fee (OTC auto)
Mon 10/15 6:15 PM
Receipt of Chapter 11 Filing Fee - $1717.00 by PG. Receipt Number 68993. (adiuser) |
||
Sunday, October 14, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
![]() Motion for Joint Administration Filed by Debtor Oak Grove Resources, LLC (Bensinger, Bill) |
|
2 | 2
![]() Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Bill D Bensinger Filed by Debtor Oak Grove Resources, LLC. (Bensinger, Bill) |
|
1 | 1
![]() Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual. Fee Amount $1717 Filed by Oak Grove Resources, LLC (Sparks, Daniel) |