Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Tamara O Mitchell
Case #: 2:18-bk-04177
Case Filed:Oct 14, 2018
Plan Confirmed:Apr 15, 2019

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$100,000,001 to $500 million
Est. Liabilities $100,000,001 to $500 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Mission Coal Company, LLC, et al.,
7 Sheridan Square, Suite 300
Kingsport, TN 37660
Represented By
James H.M. Sprayregen
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
contact info
Daniel D Sparks
contact info
Ciara Foster
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
contact info
Brad Weiland
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
contact info
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
contact info
Stephen E. Hessler
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
contact info
Austin Klar
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
contact info
Melissa N. Koss
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
contact info
Bill D Bensinger
Christian & Small, LLP
contact info
Last checked: Thursday Feb 07, 2019 5:16 PM CST
Accountant
KPMG LLP
1676 International Drive
McLean, VA 22102
Accountant
Carr, Riggs, & Ingram, LLC
1117 Boll Weevil Circle
Enterprise, AL 36331
Attorney
Kellis Vegetation Management
Kitchens Kelley Gaynes PC 5555 Glenridge Connector, Suite 800 Glenridge Highlands One
Atlanta, GA 30342
Represented By
Bryan Scott Kaplan
Kitchens Kelley Gaynes, PC
contact info
Auditor
Cherry Bekaret, LLP
P.O. Box 25549
Richmond, VA 23260
Bankruptcy Administrator
Jon A Dudeck
1800 5th Avenue North
Birmingham, AL 35203
Bankruptcy Administrator
J. Thomas Corbett
Bankruptcy Administrator 1800 5th Avenue North
Birmingham, AL 35203
Consultant
Lucha LLC
274 Gentle Breeze Drive
Chapmanville, WV 25598
Creditor
MMD Mineral Sizing (America) Inc.
PO Box 4054
Montgomery, AL 36103
Represented By
Stuart H. Memory
Memory, Memory & Causby, LLP
contact info
Creditor
THOMPSON TRACTOR CO., INC.
HAND ARENDALL HARRISON SALE LLC 1801 5th Avenue North Suite 400
Birmingham,, AL 35203
Represented By
Benjamin Shaw Goldman
Hand Arendall Harrison Sale LLC
contact info
Creditor
Rockwood Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By
Kevin A Rogers
Wells Marble And Hurst, PLLC
contact info
Creditor
Phillips Machine Service, Inc.
Represented By
Clark R Hammond
Wallace Jordan Ratliff & Brandt, LLC
contact info
Steven L. Thomas
Kay Casto & Chaney PLLC
contact info
Creditor
Natural Resource Partners L.P.
Christian & Barton, LLP 909 E. Main Street, Suite 1200
Richmond, VA 23219
Represented By
Jennifer M. McLemore
Christian & Barton, LLP
contact info
Brian R Walding
Walding LLC
contact info
Augustus C. Epps, Jr.
Christian & Barton, LLP
contact info
Michael D. Mueller
Christian & Barton, LLP
contact info
Creditor
Mission Coal Funding, LLC
6801 Falls Of Neuse Road Suite 100
Raleigh, NC 27615
Represented By
Ryan David Thompson
Maynard Cooper & Gale PC
contact info
John Isbell
Thompson Hine LLP
contact info
Garrett Nail
Thompson Hine LLP
contact info
Alan R. Lepene
Thompson Hine, LLP
contact info
Evan Nicholas Parrott
Maynard, Cooper & Gale, P.C.
contact info
J Leland Murphree
Maynard Cooper & Gale, PC
contact info
Garrett A. Nail
Thompson Hine, LLP
contact info
Creditor
Indemnity National Insurance Company
725 Cool Springs Boulevard, Suite 600
Franklin, TN 37067
Represented By
Daniel Isaac Waxman
Wyatt, Tarrant & Combs, LLP
contact info
Creditor
Jam Khorrami
115 West Main, Ste 200A
Columbus, OH 43215
Creditor
Industrial Mining Supply, Inc.
Represented By
Michael E Bybee
contact info
Creditor
Alabama Power Company
P.O. Box 306
Birmingham, AL 35201
Represented By
Eric T Ray
Balch & Bingham LLP
contact info
Creditor
United Mine Workers of America
UMWA Headquarters 18354 Quantico Gateway Drive #200
Triangle, VA 22172
Represented By
Robert H Adams
Rumberger, Kirk & Caldwell, P.C.
contact info
Frederick Darrell Clarke, III
Rumberger, Kirk & Caldwell
contact info
R. Scott Williams
Rumberger, Kirk & Caldwell, P.C.
contact info
Creditor
United Mine Workers of America 1974 Pension Plan and Trust and its Trustees
Represented By
John C. Goodchild, III
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP
contact info
Glen Marshall Connor
Quinn, Connor, Weaver, Davies & Rouco
contact info
George N. Davies
Quinn, Connor, Weaver, Davies & Rouco
contact info
Rachel Jaffe Mauceri
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP
contact info
John R. Mooney
Mooney, Green, Saindon, Murphy & Welch,
contact info
Diana M. Bardes
Mooney, Green, Saindon, Murphy & Welch
contact info
Matthew Ziegler
Morgan Lewis Bockius LLP
contact info
Paul A. Green
Mooney, Green, Saindon, Murphy & Welch,
contact info
Creditor
United Mine Workers of America 1993 Benefit Plan
Represented By
John C. Goodchild, III
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP
contact info
Glen Marshall Connor
Quinn, Connor, Weaver, Davies & Rouco
contact info
George N. Davies
Quinn, Connor, Weaver, Davies & Rouco
contact info
Rachel Jaffe Mauceri
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP
contact info
John R. Mooney
Mooney, Green, Saindon, Murphy & Welch,
contact info
Diana M. Bardes
Mooney, Green, Saindon, Murphy & Welch
contact info
Matthew Ziegler
Morgan Lewis Bockius LLP
contact info
Paul A. Green
Mooney, Green, Saindon, Murphy & Welch,
contact info
Creditor
Warrior River Water Authority
Represented By
Vernie Edward Freeman
contact info
Robert S. Dooley
contact info
Creditor
Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB
Seward & Kissel, LLP One Battery Park Plaza
New York, NY 10004
Represented By
John Ashmead
Seward & Kissel, LLP
contact info
Creditor
Coking Coal Leasing, LLC
1901 6th Ave North
Birmingham, AL 35203
Represented By
Roberto J. Kampfner
White & Case, LLP
contact info
Craig H. Averch
White & Case LLP
contact info
Evan Nicholas Parrott
Maynard, Cooper & Gale, P.C.
contact info
Ronald Gorsich
White & Case LLP
contact info
J Leland Murphree
Maynard Cooper & Gale, PC
contact info
Creditor
ENCECO Inc.
1901 6th Ave North
Birmingham, AL 35203
Represented By
Roberto J. Kampfner
White & Case, LLP
contact info
Craig H. Averch
White & Case LLP
contact info
Evan Nicholas Parrott
Maynard, Cooper & Gale, P.C.
contact info
Ronald Gorsich
White & Case LLP
contact info
J Leland Murphree
Maynard Cooper & Gale, PC
contact info
Creditor
Charles A. Ebetino, Jr.
1901 6th Ave North
Birmingham, AL 35203
Represented By
Roberto J. Kampfner
White & Case, LLP
contact info
Craig H. Averch
White & Case LLP
contact info
Evan Nicholas Parrott
Maynard, Cooper & Gale, P.C.
contact info
Ronald Gorsich
White & Case LLP
contact info
J Leland Murphree
Maynard Cooper & Gale, PC
contact info
Creditor
Iron Management II, LLC
1901 6th Ave North
Birmingham, AL 35203
Represented By
Roberto J. Kampfner
White & Case, LLP
contact info
Craig H. Averch
White & Case LLP
contact info
Evan Nicholas Parrott
Maynard, Cooper & Gale, P.C.
contact info
Ronald Gorsich
White & Case LLP
contact info
J Leland Murphree
Maynard Cooper & Gale, PC
contact info
Creditor
Iron Management III, LLC
1901 6th Ave North
Birmingham, AL 35203
Represented By
Roberto J. Kampfner
White & Case, LLP
contact info
Craig H. Averch
White & Case LLP
contact info
Evan Nicholas Parrott
Maynard, Cooper & Gale, P.C.
contact info
Ronald Gorsich
White & Case LLP
contact info
J Leland Murphree
Maynard Cooper & Gale, PC
contact info
Creditor
Joann Waid, et al.
Spain & Gillon, LLC 505 North 20th Street 1200 Financial Center
Birmingham, AL 35203
Represented By
Walter F McArdle
Spain & Gillon, LLC
contact info
David Skinner
David C. Skinner, L.L.C.
contact info
Creditor
Jason R. McCoy
1901 6th Ave North
Birmingham, AL 35203
Represented By
Craig H. Averch
White & Case LLP
contact info
Evan Nicholas Parrott
Maynard, Cooper & Gale, P.C.
contact info
Ronald Gorsich
White & Case LLP
contact info
J Leland Murphree
Maynard Cooper & Gale, PC
contact info
Creditor
Kenneth R. McCoy
1901 6th Ave North
Birmingham, AL 35203
Represented By
Roberto J. Kampfner
White & Case, LLP
contact info
Craig H. Averch
White & Case LLP
contact info
Evan Nicholas Parrott
Maynard, Cooper & Gale, P.C.
contact info
Ronald Gorsich
White & Case LLP
contact info
J Leland Murphree
Maynard Cooper & Gale, PC
contact info
Creditor
Carter Machinery Company, Inc.
Jones Walker LLP 420 20th St. N. Suite 1100
Birmingham, AL 35203
Represented By
Clyde Ellis Brazeal, III
Jones Walker LLP
contact info
Creditor
Bluestone Coal Corporation and Double Bonus Mining Company
Represented By
Richard Patrick Carmody
contact info
Russell Rutherford
Adams And Reese LP
contact info
Creditor
Cleveland-Cliffs, Inc. f/k/a Cliffs Natural Resources, Inc.
2311 Highland Avenue South
Birmingham, AL 35205
Represented By
Stephen B Porterfield
Sirote & Permutt
contact info
Thomas Benjamin Humphries
Sirote & Permutt PC
contact info
Creditor
Custom Engineering, Inc.
656 Hall St
Clay, KY 42404
Represented By
Sandra D. Freeburger
Dietz, Shields & Freebuger, LLP
contact info
Creditor
Berwind Land Company
Spilman Thomas & Battle PLLC P. O. Box 90
Roanoke, VA 24002
Represented By
Jeremy L Retherford
Balch & Bingham
contact info
Peter M. Pearl
Spilman, Thomas & Battle, PLLC
contact info
Creditor
Debtor in Possession Lenders
Represented By
Michael Leo Hall
contact info
Marty L. Brimmage, Jr.
Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP
contact info
Allison P. Miller
Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP
contact info
Heather A Jamison
Burr & Forman LLP
contact info
D Christopher Carson
Burr & Forman LLP
contact info
Erik Y. Preis
Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP
contact info
Jason P. Rubin
Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP
contact info
Lacy M. Lawrence
Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP
contact info
Lisa G. Beckerman
Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP
contact info
Kathryn G. Demander
Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP
contact info
Creditor
Delaware Trust Company, Adm. Agt. for First Lien Holders
Miles & Stockbridge P.C. 100 Light St., 10th Fl.
Baltimore, MD 21202
Represented By
Linda V. Donhauser
Miles & Stockbridge PC
contact info
Creditor
First Lien Lenders
Represented By
Michael Leo Hall
contact info
Marty L. Brimmage, Jr.
Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP
contact info
Allison P. Miller
Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP
contact info
Heather A Jamison
Burr & Forman LLP
contact info
D Christopher Carson
Burr & Forman LLP
contact info
Erik Y. Preis
Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP
contact info
Jason P. Rubin
Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP
contact info
Lacy M. Lawrence
Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP
contact info
Lisa G. Beckerman
Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP
contact info
Kathryn G. Demander
Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP
contact info
Creditor
Bay Point Advisors, LLC
Jones Walker LLP 420 20th Street North
Birmingham, AL 35203
Represented By
Kevin J. Walsh
Mintz Levin Cohn Ferris Glovsky & Popeo
contact info
Timothy J. McKeon
Mintz Levin Cohn Ferris Glovsky & Popeo
contact info
Clyde Ellis Brazeal, III
Jones Walker LLP
contact info
Creditor
Appalachian Power Company d/b/a American Electric Power
Post Office Box 306
Birmingham, AL 35201
Represented By
Eric T Ray
Balch & Bingham LLP
contact info
Creditor
Anthem, Inc.
Represented By
Joseph Sinnott Sheerin
Mcguirewoods LLP
contact info
Creditor
Alabama Surface Mining Commission
P. O. Box 2390
Jasper, AL 35502
Represented By
Grady Milton McCarthy
Al. Surface Mining Commission
contact info
Creditor
COWIN EQUIPMENT COMPANY, INC.
Bradley Arant Boult Cummings, LLP 1819 5th Avenue North
Birmingham, AL 35203
Represented By
Jay R. Bender
One Federal Place
contact info
Cathleen C Moore
Bradley Arant Boult Cummings LLP
contact info
Creditor Committee
UMWA 1974 Pension Plan and Trust
2121 K Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20037
Creditor Committee
Tracy Barton
2204 Lakeshore Sr., Ste 406
Birmingham, AL 35209
Represented By
Lloyd Weaver Gathings, II
Gathings Law
contact info
Creditor Committee
United Central Industrial Supply Company, LLC
1241 Volunteer Pkwy, Ste. 1000
Bristol, TN 37620
Creditor Committee
Cleveland-Cliffs Inc. f.k.a. Cliffs Natural Resources, Inc.
200 Public Square, Ste 3300
Cleveland, OH 44114
Creditor Committee
United Mine Workers of America
18354 Quantico Gateway Drive, Suite 200
Triangle, VA 22172
Creditor Committee
Webster, et al vs. Oak Grove et al
2224 1st Avenue North
Birmingham, AL 35203
Represented By
Max A. Moseley
Kumar, Prabhu, Patel & Banerjee
contact info
Creditor Committee
Pense Bros. Drilling Co., Inc.
P. O. Box 551
Frederick Town, MO 63645
Creditor Committee
Coal Speciality Funding, LLC
707 Grant St., Ste 2200 Gulf Tower
Pittsburgh, PA 15219
Creditor Committee
White Armature Works, Inc.
P. O. Box 330
Mallory, WV 25634
Creditor Committee
Official Committee Of Unsecured Creditors Of Mission Coal Company, LLC, et al.
Represented By
Gabriel L. Olivera
contact info
Arielle B. Adler
contact info
Jennifer Brooke Kimble
Lowenstein Sandler LLP
contact info
Lowenstein Sandler LLP
contact info
Mary E. Seymour
Lowenstein Sandler LLP
contact info
Rita L Hullett
Baker Donelson Bearman Caldwell & Berkowitz PC
contact info
Baker, Donelson, Bearman, Caldwell & Berkowitz, PC
contact info
Jeffey Cohen
Lowenstein Sandler LLP
contact info
Nicole Fulfree
Lowenstein Sandler LLP
contact info
Examiner
Direct Fee Review LLC
Don F. Oliver 1000 N West Street Suite 1200
Wilmington, DE 19801
Financial Advisor
Berkeley Research Group, LLC
Edwin N. Ordway, Jr. 810 Seventh Avenue, Suite 4100
New York, NY 10019
Financial Advisor
Ernst & Young LLP
1401 McKinney St Ste 1200
Houston, TX 77010
Interested Party
Brad Weiland
Kirkland & Ellis LLP 300 North LaSalle
Chicago, IL 60654
Interested Party
Thomas M Clarke
2019 Third Avenue North
Birmingham, AL 35203
Represented By
Oscar Pinkas
Dentons Us LLP
contact info
Gerald C. Bender
Dentons Us LLP
contact info
Oscar N. Pinkas
Dentons Us LLP
contact info
Lee R. Benton
Benton & Centeno, LLP
contact info
Laura Gibson
Dentons Us LLP
contact info
Samuel Stephens
Benton & Centeno, LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Zolfo Cooper Management, LLC
5 Becker Farm Road 4th Floor
Roseland, NJ 07068
Interested Party
Gilbert Wallice
Kirkland & Ellis LLP 601 Lexington Avenue
New York, NY 10022
Interested Party
Anne Gilbert Wallice
Kirkland & Ellis LLP 601 Lexington Avenue
New York, NY 10022
Interested Party
Travis M. Bayer
Kirkland & Ellis LLP 300 North LaSalle
Chicago, IL 60654
Interested Party
Mark Nelson
Represented By
Warren R. McGraw, II
contact info
Interested Party
JoAnn Waid
Represented By
Walter F McArdle
Spain & Gillon, LLC
contact info
Interested Party
Lennis L. Waid
Represented By
Walter F McArdle
Spain & Gillon, LLC
contact info
Interested Party
Ana M Clarke
2019 Third Avenue North
Birmingham, AL 35203
Represented By
Oscar Pinkas
Dentons Us LLP
contact info
Gerald C. Bender
Dentons Us LLP
contact info
Oscar N. Pinkas
Dentons Us LLP
contact info
Lee R. Benton
Benton & Centeno, LLP
contact info
Laura Gibson
Dentons Us LLP
contact info
Samuel Stephens
Benton & Centeno, LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Ciara Foster
Kirkland & Ellis LLP 601 Lexington Avenue
New York, NY 10022
Interested Party
Stephen E. Hessler
Kirkland & Ellis LLP 601 Lexington Avenue
New York, NY 10022
Interested Party
Francis Petrie
Kirkland & Ellis LLP 601 Lexington Avenue
New York, NY 10022
Interested Party
Michael P. Esser
Kirkland & Ellis LLP 555 California Street
San Francisco, CA 94104
Interested Party
Hilda Mitros
P O Box 1145
Welch, WV 24801
Interested Party
Melissa N. Koss
Kirkland & Ellis LLP 300 North LaSalle
Chicago, IL 60654
Other Professional
Towers Watson Delaware, Inc.
P.O. Box 28025
Chicago, IL 60673
Other Professional
Jefferies LLC
520 Madison Avenue
New York, NY 10022
Other Professional
Omni Management Group
1120 Avenue of the Americas, 4th Floor
New York, NY 10036
Special Counsel
Meyers, Roman, Friedberg & Lewis
28601 Chagrin Blvd, Suite 600
Cleveland, OH 44122
Special Counsel
Law Office of John F. Tyra, PC
1661 McFarland Blvd N
Tuscaloosa, AL 35406
Special Counsel
Bingham Greenebaum Doll, LLP
300 West Vine Street Suite 1200
Lexington, KY 40507
Special Counsel
Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak & Stewart PC
P.O. Box 89
Columbia, SC 29202
Special Counsel
Fabian VanCott
215 South State Street, Suite 1200
Salt Lake City, UT 84111
Special Counsel
Richards, Layton & Finger, P.A.
One Rodney Square, P.O. Box 551
Wilmington, DE 19899
Special Counsel
Bradley Arant Boult Cummings, LLP
One Federal Place 1819 Fifth Avenue North
Birmingham, AL 35203
Special Counsel
Grove, Holmstrand & Delk, PLLC
44 1/2 Fifteen Street
Wheeling, WV 26003
Special Counsel
Gibbons P.C.
One Gateway Center
Newark, NJ 07102
Special Counsel
Sirote & Permutt, PC
P O Bo 55727
Birmingham, AL 35255

GPO Mar 01 2019
Memorandum Opinion and Order Granting 635 Debtors Motion for Entry of an Order (I) Authorizing, but Not Directing, the Debtors to (A) Reject Their Collective Bargaining Agreements, (B) Modify Certain Union-Related Retiree Benefits, and (C) Implement Terms of Their Section 1113 and Section 1114 Proposal, and (II) Granting Related Relief. 797 Objection filed by United Mine Workers of America is overruled, 801 Objection filed by United Mine Workers of America 1974 Pension Plan and Trust and its Trustees and United Mine Workers of America 1993 Benefit Plan is overruled). Signed on 3/1/2019 (klt)
Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Saturday, March 08, 2025
1932 1932 court BNC Certificate of Notice Sat 03/08 11:47 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+]. Notice Date 03/08/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 1931 Order Rescheduling Hearing
Thursday, March 06, 2025
1931 1931 1 pgs order Order Rescheduling Hearing Thu 03/06 2:37 PM
Order Rescheduling Hearing Signed on 3/6/2025 Related [+]. Hearing scheduled 5/19/2025 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham. (cmh)
Related: [-] 1802 Motion for Contempt filed by Movant Gilbert E. Nathan,1807 Response filed by Creditor Bluestone Coal Corporation and Double Bonus Mining Company,1810 Motion to Vacate Order filed by Creditor Bluestone Coal Corporation and Double Bonus Mining Company,1812 Response filed by Movant Gilbert E. Nathan,1819 Motion to Compel filed by Movant Gilbert E. Nathan