Taco Bueno Restaurants, Inc.
Texas Northern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Stacey G Jernigan |
Case #: | 3:18-bk-33678 |
Case Filed: | Nov 06, 2018 |
Terminated: | Jan 25, 2023 |
Plan Confirmed: | Dec 19, 2018 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $10,000,001 to $50 million |
Est. Liabilities | $100,000,001 to $500 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Taco Bueno Restaurants, Inc.
300 E John Carpenter Fwy Ste 800
Irving, TX 75062-3082 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
1100 Commerce Street Room 976
Dallas, TX 75242 |
1. | Taco Bueno files for Chapter 11 bankruptcy protection (nrn.com) |
Submitted Thu 11/08/2018 | |
Docket last updated: 14 minutes ago |
Wednesday, January 25, 2023 | ||
court
Close bankruptcy case
Wed 01/25 12:49 PM
Bankruptcy case closed. Pursuant to LBR 9070-1, any exhibits that were admitted by the Court may be claimed and removed from the Clerks Office during the 60-day period following final disposition of a case by the attorney or party who introduced the exhibits. Any exhibit not removed within the 60-day period may be destroyed or otherwise disposed of by the Bankruptcy Clerk. (Whitaker, Sheniqua) |