Member Case
Lead case is: 3:18-bk-33678

Texas Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Stacey G Jernigan
Case #: 3:18-bk-33686
Case Filed:Nov 06, 2018
Terminated:Jan 25, 2023

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$50,000,001 to $100 million
Est. Liabilities $0 to $50,000
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
TB Holdings II Parent, Inc.
300 E John Carpenter Fwy Ste 800
Irving, TX 75062-3082
Represented By
Garrick Chase Smith
Vinson & Elkins LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
1100 Commerce Street Room 976
Dallas, TX 75242


Docket last updated: 50 minutes ago
Wednesday, January 25, 2023
court Close bankruptcy case Wed 01/25 2:52 PM
Bankruptcy case closed. (Whitaker, Sheniqua)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 12, 2023
28 28 court BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document Thu 01/12 11:19 PM
BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 01/12/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 27 Order granting United States Trustee's amended motion to dismiss Debtor (Reference lead case 18-33678 Document 473). Entered on 1/10/2023
Tuesday, January 10, 2023
27 27 order Dismiss case Tue 01/10 9:59 AM
Order granting United States Trustee's amended motion to dismiss Debtor Related [+]. Entered on 1/10/2023 (Whitaker, Sheniqua)
Related: [-] ference lead case 18-33678 Document 473
Wednesday, December 07, 2022
26 26 misc Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report Wed 12/07 1:06 PM
Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report for Case Number 18-33686 for the Quarter Ending: 9/30/2022 filed by Debtor TB Holdings II Parent, Inc.. (Liepins, Eric)
Related: [-]
25 25 misc Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report Wed 12/07 1:04 PM
Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report for Case Number 18-33686 for the Quarter Ending: 6/30/2022 filed by Debtor TB Holdings II Parent, Inc.. (Liepins, Eric)
Related: [-]
24 24 misc Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report Wed 12/07 1:03 PM
Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report for Case Number 18-33686 for the Quarter Ending: 3/30/2022 filed by Debtor TB Holdings II Parent, Inc.. (Liepins, Eric)
Related: [-]
23 23 misc Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report Wed 12/07 1:02 PM
Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report for Case Number 18-33686 for the Quarter Ending: 12/31/2021 filed by Debtor TB Holdings II Parent, Inc.. (Liepins, Eric)
Related: [-]
22 22 misc Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report Wed 12/07 1:00 PM
Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report for Case Number 18-33686 for the Quarter Ending: 9/30/2021 filed by Debtor TB Holdings II Parent, Inc.. (Liepins, Eric)
Related: [-]
21 21 misc Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report Wed 12/07 12:58 PM
Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report for Case Number 18-33686 for the Quarter Ending: 6/30/2021 filed by Debtor TB Holdings II Parent, Inc.. (Liepins, Eric)
Related: [-]
20 20 misc Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report Wed 12/07 12:56 PM
Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report for Case Number 18-33686 for the Quarter Ending: 3/31/2021 filed by Debtor TB Holdings II Parent, Inc.. (Liepins, Eric)
Related: [-]
19 19 misc Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report Wed 12/07 12:50 PM
Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report for Case Number 18-33686 for the Quarter Ending: 12/31/2020 filed by Debtor TB Holdings II Parent, Inc.. (Liepins, Eric)
Related: [-]
18 18 misc Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report Wed 12/07 12:49 PM
Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report for Case Number 18-33686 for the Quarter Ending: 9/30/2020 filed by Debtor TB Holdings II Parent, Inc.. (Liepins, Eric)
Related: [-]
17 17 misc Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report Wed 12/07 12:47 PM
Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report for Case Number 18-33686 for the Quarter Ending: 6/30/2020 filed by Debtor TB Holdings II Parent, Inc.. (Liepins, Eric)
Related: [-]
16 16 misc Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report Wed 12/07 12:46 PM
Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report for Case Number 18-33686 for the Quarter Ending: 3/30/2020 filed by Debtor TB Holdings II Parent, Inc.. (Liepins, Eric)
Related: [-]
15 15 misc Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report Wed 12/07 12:42 PM
Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report for Case Number 18-33686 for the Quarter Ending: 12/31/2019 filed by Debtor TB Holdings II Parent, Inc.. (Liepins, Eric)
Related: [-]
14 14 misc Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report Wed 12/07 12:41 PM
Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report for Case Number 18-33686 for the Quarter Ending: 9/30/2019 filed by Debtor TB Holdings II Parent, Inc.. (Liepins, Eric)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report Wed 12/07 12:39 PM
Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report for Case Number 18-33686 for the Quarter Ending: 6/30/2019 filed by Debtor TB Holdings II Parent, Inc.. (Liepins, Eric)
Related: [-]
12 12 misc Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report Wed 12/07 12:36 PM
Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report for Case Number 18-33686 for the Quarter Ending: 3/31/2019 filed by Debtor TB Holdings II Parent, Inc.. (Liepins, Eric)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 20, 2018
11 11 misc Statement of financial affairs Tue 11/20 8:14 PM
Statement of financial affairs for a non-individual TB Holdings II Parent, Inc. . Filed by Debtor TB Holdings II Parent, Inc. Related [+]. (Smith, Garrick)
Related: [-] 2 Notice of deficiency
10 10 misc Schedules Tue 11/20 8:12 PM
Schedules: Schedules A/B and D-H. Filed by Debtor TB Holdings II Parent, Inc. Related [+]. (Smith, Garrick)
Related: [-] 2 Notice of deficiency
Friday, November 16, 2018
9 9 court BNC certificate of mailing - meeting of creditors Fri 11/16 11:44 PM
BNC certificate of mailing - meeting of creditors. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 11/16/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 6 Meeting of creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 12/10/2018 at 10:30 AM at Dallas 341 Rm 524. Proofs of Claims due by 3/10/2019. Attorney(s)certificate of service of 341 meeting chapter 11 to be filed by 12/10/2018.
Monday, November 12, 2018
8 8 misc 20 Largest unsecured creditors Mon 11/12 6:29 PM
Chapter 11 or Chapter 9 Cases Non- Individual List of Creditors Who Have 20 Largest Unsecured Claims Against You and Are Not Insiders . Filed by Debtor TB Holdings II Parent, Inc.. (Smith, Garrick)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 09, 2018
7 7 court BNC certificate of mailing Fri 11/09 11:32 PM
BNC certificate of mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 11/09/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 2 Notice of deficiency. Schedule A/B due 11/20/2018. Schedule D due 11/20/2018. Schedule E/F due 11/20/2018. Schedule G due 11/20/2018. Schedule H due 11/20/2018. Summary of Assets and Liabilities and Certain Statistical Information due 11/20/2018. Statement of Financial Affairs due 11/20/2018. Creditor matrix due 11/9/2018. 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors due 11/8/2018.
Thursday, November 08, 2018
6 6 court Meeting of creditors chapter 11 Thu 11/08 4:35 PM
Meeting of creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 12/10/2018 at 10:30 AM at Dallas 341 Rm 524. Proofs of Claims due by 3/10/2019. Attorney(s)certificate of service of 341 meeting chapter 11 to be filed by 12/10/2018. (Neary, William)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Support/supplemental document Thu 11/08 1:24 PM
Support/supplemental document /Verification of Mailing List filed by Debtor TB Holdings II Parent, Inc. Related [+]. (Smith, Garrick)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary petition (chapter 11)
Wednesday, November 07, 2018
4 4 order Joint administration Wed 11/07 7:54 PM
Order granting motion for joint administration lead case 3:18-bk-33678 with member case 3:18-bk-33686 Related [+]Judge Stacey G. Jernigan assigned. Involvement of Judge Barbara J. Houser terminated An order has been entered in this case in accordance with Rule 1015(b) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure and Rule 1015-1 of the Local Bankruptcy Rules of the United States Bankruptcy Court for the Northern District of Texas directing the joint administration of the chapter 11 cases of CBI Restaurants, Inc., Taco Bueno Equipment Company, Taco Bueno Franchise Company L.P., Taco Bueno Restaurants, Inc., Taco Bueno Restaurants L.P., Taco Bueno West, Inc., TB Corp., TB Holdings II, Inc., TB Holdings II Parent Inc., and TB Kansas LLC. The docket in Case No. 18-33678 should be consulted for all matters affecting the case. All further pleadings and other papers shall be filed in and all further docket entries shall be made in Case No. 18-33678 Entered on 11/7/2018. (Bradden, T.)
Related: [-] 3
3 3 motion Joint administration Wed 11/07 7:53 PM
Motion for joint administration of cases 18-33678 thru 18-33687 Filed by Debtor TB Holdings II Parent, Inc. (Bradden, T.)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Notice of deficiency Wed 11/07 8:25 AM
Notice of deficiency. Schedule A/B due 11/20/2018. Schedule D due 11/20/2018. Schedule E/F due 11/20/2018. Schedule G due 11/20/2018. Schedule H due 11/20/2018. Summary of Assets and Liabilities and Certain Statistical Information due 11/20/2018. Statement of Financial Affairs due 11/20/2018. Creditor matrix due 11/9/2018. 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors due 11/8/2018. (Hurtado, Melissa)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 06, 2018
1 1 352 pgs misc Voluntary petition ch 11 (attorney filer) Tue 11/06 2:42 PM
Non-individual Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition. Fee Amount $1717 Filed by TB Holdings II Parent, Inc. (Smith, Garrick)
Related: [-]
crditcrd none Tue 11/06 2:52 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary petition (chapter 11) 18-33686 11) [misc,volp11a] (1717.00). Receipt number 25845932, amount $1717.00 Related [+]. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1