Royalty Properties, LLC
Illinois Northern - Chicago Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Jacqueline P Cox |
Case #: | 1:19-bk-07692 |
Case Filed: | Mar 19, 2019 |
Dismissed: | Sep 24, 2019 |
Terminated: | Oct 08, 2019 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $10,000,001 to $50 million |
Est. Liabilities | $10,000,001 to $50 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Royalty Properties, LLC
18 E. Dundee Rd, 3-204,
Barrington, IL 60010 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
Patrick S Layng
Office of the U.S. Trustee, Region 11 219 S Dearborn St Room 873
Chicago, IL 60604 |
Docket last updated: 03/18/2019 7:00 PM CDT |
Tuesday, March 19, 2019 | ||
1 | 1
13
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11a)
Tue 03/19 2:40 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition for a Non-Individual Fee Amount $1717, Filed by John H Redfield on behalf of Royalty Properties, LLC |
|
2 | 2
crditcrd
none
Tue 03/19 2:42 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 19-07692 [misc,volp11a] (1717.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 39320091. Fee Amount $1717.00 (U.S. Treasury) |