Royalty Properties, LLC v. Forest Preserve District of Cook County et al
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:19-bk-07692
Lead BK case is: 1:19-bk-07692
Illinois Northern - Chicago Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Jacqueline P Cox |
Case #: | 1:19-ap-00826 |
Nature of Suit | 71 Bankruptcy - Injunctive relief - imposition of stay |
Case Filed: | Jul 01, 2019 |
Terminated: | Dec 28, 2020 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Forest Preserve District of Cook County, Defendant
69 W. Washington, Suite 2010
Chicago, IL 60602 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mary B. Grossman, Defendant
W1905 Potter Road
Burlington, WI 53105 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Royalty Properties, LLC, Plaintiff
18 E. Dundee Rd, 3-204,
Barrington, IL 60010 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Monday, December 28, 2020 | ||
38 | 38
court
Close Adversary Case
Mon 12/28 12:22 PM
Adversary Case 1:19-ap-826 Closed . (Sims, LaKeysha) |
|
Tuesday, October 08, 2019 | ||
37 | 37
order
District Court re: Appeal
Tue 10/08 10:45 AM
Order By District Court Judge Martha M. Pacold, Re: Appeal on Civil Action Number: 19-cv-6164, Dated 10/8/2019. Debtor-Appellant's motion for voluntary dismissal of bankruptcy appeal is granted. This case is hereby dismissed. The motion hearing set for 10/10/2019 is stricken. . Signed on 10/8/2019 (USDC2) |
|
Monday, September 30, 2019 | ||
36 | 36
appeal
Follow Up Letter
Mon 09/30 10:50 AM
Follow Up Letter to Bankruptcy Judge and Parties . (Rivera, Melissa) |
|
Tuesday, September 24, 2019 | ||
35 | 35
order
Dismissing Adversary Proceeding
Thu 09/26 9:09 AM
Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding . Signed on 9/24/2019 (Bowles, Aaron) |
|
Tuesday, September 17, 2019 | ||
34 | 34
court
Hearing Continued (Motion)
Tue 09/17 4:35 PM
Hearing Continued . Hearing scheduled for 9/24/2019 at 10:30 AM at 219 South Dearborn, Courtroom 680, Chicago, Illinois 60604. (Green, Josephine) |
|
Monday, September 16, 2019 | ||
33 | 33
appeal
Notice of Docketing Notice of Appeal/Motion for Leave to Appeal/Record on Appeal
Mon 09/16 11:38 AM
Notice of Docketing Notice of Appeal, to District Court . Case Number 19 cv 6164 Assigned to Judge: Martha M. Pacold . (Rivera, Melissa) |
|
32 | 32
appeal
Transmittal of Appeal/Motion for Leave to Appeal/Record on Appeal
Mon 09/16 9:25 AM
Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to District Court . (Rivera, Melissa) |
|
31 | 31
court
Certificate of Service
Mon 09/16 9:00 AM
Certificate of Service . (Rivera, Melissa) |
|
Friday, September 13, 2019 | ||
30 | 30
notice
4-Notice of Filing
Fri 09/13 4:54 PM
Notice of Filing Notice of Filing - Notice of Appeal Filed by Anthony J Peraica on behalf of Royalty Properties, LLC. (Peraica, Anthony) |
|
29 | 29
crditcrd
none
Fri 09/13 4:51 PM
Receipt of Notice of Appeal 19-00826 [appeal,ntcapl] ( 298.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 40565608. Fee Amount $ 298.00 (U.S. Treasury) |
|
28 | 28
appeal
Notice of Appeal
Fri 09/13 4:50 PM
Notice of Appeal to District Court. Filed by Anthony J Peraica on behalf of Royalty Properties, LLC. Fee Amount $298. Appellant Designation due by 09/27/2019. Transmission of Record Due no later than 10/15/2019.(Peraica, Anthony) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Order Denying Preliminary Injunction | ||
27 | 27
misc
Appearance
Fri 09/13 4:20 PM
Appearance Filed by Anthony J Peraica on behalf of Royalty Properties, LLC. (Peraica, Anthony) |
|
Friday, August 30, 2019 | ||
26 | 26
order
Scheduling
Fri 08/30 2:14 PM
Order Scheduling . Status hearing to be held on 9/17/2019 at 10:30 AM at 219 South Dearborn, Courtroom 680, Chicago, Illinois 60604. Signed on 8/30/2019 (Bowles, Aaron) |
|
25 | 25
order
Preliminary Injunction
Fri 08/30 1:32 PM
Order Denying Motion for Preliminary Injunction , Denying Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Signed on 8/30/2019. (Bowles, Aaron) |
|
Monday, August 19, 2019 | ||
24 | 24
court
Hearing Continued (Motion)
Mon 08/19 6:21 PM
(E)Hearing Continued . Status hearing scheduled for 08/20/2019 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 680 219 South Dearborn, Chicago, IL, 60604.. Signed on 08/19/2019. (Green, Josephine) |
|
23 | 23
court
Hearing Continued (Motion)
Mon 08/19 6:21 PM
(E)Hearing Continued . hearing scheduled for 08/20/2019 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 680 219 South Dearborn, Chicago, IL, 60604.. Signed on 08/19/2019. (Green, Josephine) |
|
22 | 22
court
Hearing Continued (Motion)
Mon 08/19 6:21 PM
(E)Hearing Continued . Status hearing scheduled for 08/20/2019 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 680 219 South Dearborn, Chicago, IL, 60604.. Signed on 08/19/2019. (Green, Josephine) |
|
Friday, August 16, 2019 | ||
21 | 21
order
Authorize
Mon 08/19 6:48 AM
Order Granting Motion to Authorize Testimony of Walter Fuqua by Video Conferencing . Signed on 8/16/2019. (Camacho, Marilyn) |
|
Thursday, August 15, 2019 | ||
20 | 20
motion
Authorize
Thu 08/15 3:56 PM
Notice of Motion and Emergency Motion to Authorize Debtor to Present Testimony of Walter Fuqua by Video Conferencing at Trial Filed by John H Redfield on behalf of Royalty Properties, LLC. Hearing scheduled for 8/16/2019 at 01:00 PM at 219 South Dearborn, Courtroom 680, Chicago, Illinois 60604. |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
19 | 19
order
Application to Set Hearing on Emergency Motion
Thu 08/15 1:32 PM
Order Granting Application to Set Hearing on Emergency Motion . Signed on 8/15/2019. (Camacho, Marilyn) |
|
18 | 18
motion
Application to Set Hearing on Emergency Motion
Thu 08/15 11:14 AM
Application to Set Hearing on Emergency Motion Filed by John H Redfield on behalf of Royalty Properties, LLC. |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 | ||
Wednesday, August 14, 2019 | ||
17 | 17
court
Hearing Continued (Motion)
Wed 08/14 4:59 PM
(E)Hearing Continued . Status hearing scheduled for 08/19/2019 at 10:30 AM at Courtroom 680 219 South Dearborn, Chicago, IL, 60604.. Signed on 08/14/2019. (Green, Josephine) |
|
16 | 16
court
Hearing Continued (Motion)
Wed 08/14 4:59 PM
(E)Hearing Continued . hearing scheduled for 08/19/2019 at 10:30 AM at Courtroom 680 219 South Dearborn, Chicago, IL, 60604.. Signed on 08/14/2019. (Green, Josephine) |
|
15 | 15
order
Scheduling
Wed 08/14 4:33 PM
Order Scheduling . Hearing scheduled for 8/19/2019 at 10:00 AM at 219 South Dearborn, Courtroom 680, Chicago, Illinois 60604. Signed on 8/14/2019 (Hamilton, Annette) |
|
Wednesday, August 07, 2019 | ||
14 | 14
answer
Reply
Wed 08/07 4:30 PM
Reply in Support to Filed by Christopher W Carmichael on behalf of Forest Preserve District of Cook County, Mary B. Grossman (Carmichael, Christopher) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1-5 | ||
Wednesday, July 31, 2019 | ||
13 | 13
notice
4-Notice of Filing
Wed 07/31 9:52 AM
Notice of Filing Filed by John H Redfield on behalf of Royalty Properties, LLC . |
|
12 | 12
answer
Response
Wed 07/31 9:51 AM
Response to Filed by John H Redfield on behalf of Royalty Properties, LLC |
|
Wednesday, July 24, 2019 | ||
11 | 11
court
Hearing Continued (Motion)
Wed 07/24 3:39 PM
(E)Hearing Continued . hearing scheduled for 08/14/2019 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 680 219 South Dearborn, Chicago, IL, 60604.. Signed on 07/24/2019. (Green, Josephine) |
|
Wednesday, July 17, 2019 | ||
10 | 10
order
Scheduling
Fri 07/19 10:42 AM
Order Scheduling . Responsive documents due by 7/31/2019. Status hearing to be held on 8/7/2019 at 11:00 AM at 219 South Dearborn, Courtroom 680, Chicago, Illinois 60604. Signed on 7/17/2019 (Bowles, Aaron) |
|
9 | 9
court
Hearing Continued (Motion)
Wed 07/17 5:26 PM
(E)Hearing Continued . hearing scheduled for 08/07/2019 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 680 219 South Dearborn, Chicago, IL, 60604.. Signed on 07/17/2019. (Green, Josephine) |
|
Tuesday, July 16, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Tue 07/16 10:54 PM
Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by Christopher W Carmichael on behalf of Forest Preserve District of Cook County, Mary B. Grossman. Hearing scheduled for 7/24/2019 at 10:30 AM at 219 South Dearborn, Courtroom 680, Chicago, Illinois 60604. (Carmichael, Christopher) |
|
Tuesday, July 02, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Preliminary Injunction
Tue 07/02 2:33 PM
Notice of Motion and Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Notice of Motion and Motion for Temporary Restraining Order Filed by John H Redfield on behalf of Royalty Properties, LLC. Hearing scheduled for 7/17/2019 at 01:00 PM at 219 South Dearborn, Courtroom 680, Chicago, Illinois 60604. |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1-5 | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
6 | 6
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Tue 07/02 11:09 AM
Summons Service Executed on Forest Preserve District of Cook County, Mary B. Grossman . |
|
Monday, July 01, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
order
Application to Set Hearing on Emergency Motion
Mon 07/01 4:32 PM
Order Denying Application to Set Hearing on Emergency Motion . Signed on 7/1/2019. (Galimba, April) |
|
4 | 4
motion
Application to Set Hearing on Emergency Motion
Mon 07/01 3:00 PM
Application to Set Hearing on Emergency Motion Filed by John H Redfield on behalf of Royalty Properties, LLC. |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 | ||
3 | 3
crditcrd
none
Mon 07/01 2:47 PM
Receipt of Complaint 19-00826 [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 40061366. Fee Amount $ 350.00 (U.S. Treasury) |
|
2 | 2
court
Summons Issued (auto)
Mon 07/01 2:43 PM
Summons Issued on Forest Preserve District of Cook County Answer Due 07/31/2019; Mary B. Grossman Answer Due 07/31/2019 (Admin) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 07/01 2:43 PM
Adversary case 19-00826 (71 (Injunctive relief - reinstatement of stay)): Complaint by Royalty Properties, LLC against Forest Preserve District of Cook County, Mary B. Grossman. Fee Amount $350. Status hearing to be held on 8/14/2019 at 10:30 AM at 219 South Dearborn, Courtroom 680, Chicago, Illinois 60604. |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1-5 |