Johnson et al v. Northside Independent School District
Texas Western District Court | |
Judge: | Jason K Pulliam |
Referred: | Richard B Farrer |
Case #: | 5:19-cv-00393 |
Nature of Suit | 448 Civil Rights - Education |
Cause | 20:1401 Education: Handicapped Child Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 15, 2019 |
Re-opened: | Mar 26, 2024 |
Terminated: | Sep 09, 2022 |
Last checked: Saturday Oct 12, 2019 3:20 AM CDT |
Defendant
Northside Independent School District
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Regina Johnson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jose and Linda Lartigue
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Debra Montiel
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
123 | 123
1
pgs
order
Order
Wed 04/10 3:00 PM
ORDER WITHDRAWING ORDER re121 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, the Court will await the Fifth Circuits issuance of a mandate before taking further action in this case. Signed by Judge Jason K. Pulliam. (wg) |
|
Tuesday, April 09, 2024 | ||
122 | 122
appeal
Letter of Transmittal from USCA
Tue 04/09 2:22 PM
Letter of transmittal from USCA received for106 Notice of Appeal, filed by Kaylee Lartigue.***The Courts mandate is hereby recalled in the above case. It issued prematurely. Please make the necessary corrections to your docket sheet.***FYI...I DID NOT DOCKET JUDGMENT/MANDATE FROM 5TH CIRCUIT DATED 4/8/2024.*** (dtg) |
|
Friday, April 05, 2024 | ||
121 | 121
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Mon 04/08 8:34 AM
ORDER GRANTING IN PART120 Motion to Continue Status Conference.It is ORDERED that, on or before Friday, April 12, 2024, the partiesshall confer and file a joint advisory notifying the Court of three potential dates that both parties are available between April 15, 2024 and May 15, 2024. Signed by Judge Jason K. Pulliam. (wg) |
|
Thursday, April 04, 2024 | ||
120 | 120
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Thu 04/04 4:51 PM
Unopposed MOTION to Reset the Status Conference re119 Order, Set Hearings by Northside Independent School District.(Payne, Katie) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Granting Defendant's Unopposed Motion |