Dr. Stella Safo et al v. Dr. Prabhjot Singh
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Vernon S Broderick |
Referred: | Jennifer E Willis |
Case #: | 1:19-cv-03779 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 28:451 Employment Discrimination |
Case Filed: | Apr 26, 2019 |
Last checked: Monday May 23, 2022 9:17 PM EDT |
Defendant
Icahn School of Medicine at Mount Sinai
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Bruno Silva
205 Water St. Apt. 3M
Brooklyn, NY 11201 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Dr. Prabhjot Singh
624 Timpson St.
Pelham, NY 10803 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Dr. Dennis S. Charney
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Amanda Misiti
159 Stanton Street Apt. 8A
New York, NY 10002 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Geraldine Llames
325 E 92nd Street Apt. 2D
New York, NY 10128 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Emilie Bruzelius
228 Leonard Street
Brooklyn, NY 11211 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dr. Stella Safo
24 W. 131st Street Apt. 4
New York, NY 10037 |
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Mount Sinai Health System, Inc.
Terminated: 05/16/2022
Icahn School of Medicine 1 Gustave L. Levy Pl
New York, NY 10029 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
David Berman
Terminated: 01/14/2022
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mary Caliendo
Terminated: 01/14/2022
1646 1st Avenue Apt. 14C
New York, NY 10028 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Humale Khan
Terminated: 01/14/2022
644 Wilson Avenue Apt. 3L
Brooklyn, NY 11207 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dr. Natasha Anushri Anandaraja
Terminated: 01/14/2022
250 W. 100th St. Penthouse 3
New York, NY 10025 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dr. Holly Atkinson
Terminated: 01/14/2022
1623 3rd Ave. Apt. 28K
New York, NY 10128 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Tuesday, July 02, 2024 | ||
148 | 148
1
pgs
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 07/02 6:12 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Rachel Kessler on behalf of Dennis S. Charney, Icahn School of Medicine at Mount Sinai, Bruno Silva, Prabhjot Singh..(Kessler, Rachel) |
|
147 | 147
5
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Tue 07/02 5:50 PM
ORDER granting146 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. The request to extend fact discovery is GRANTED. The new fact discovery deadline is November 1, 2024. The new expert discovery deadline is January 10, 2025. Should the Parties need an extension of the expert discovery deadline, they should seek such at the close of fact discovery. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer E. Willis on 7/2/2024) (tg) |
|
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Tue 07/02 5:51 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Expert Discovery due by 1/10/2025. Fact Discovery due by 11/1/2024. (tg) |
||
Friday, June 28, 2024 | ||
146 | 146
2
pgs
motion
Extension of Time
Fri 06/28 6:53 PM
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Magistrate Judge Jennifer Willis from Jan Cervenka dated 06/28/2024. Document filed by Emilie Bruzelius, Geraldine Llames, Amanda Misiti, Stella Safo..(Cervenka, Jan) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Amended Case Management Order |