Atkinson v. Mount Sinai Health System, Inc.
Original Case: 1:19-cv-03779
Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:22-cv-01128 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Case Filed: | May 24, 2022 |
Terminated: | Jul 19, 2022 |
Last checked: Saturday Jun 11, 2022 7:13 AM EDT |
Defendant
Mount Sinai Health System, Inc.
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
Mount Sinai Health System, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Dr. Prabhjot Singh
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Dr. Dennis S. Charney
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Bruno Silva
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
David Berman
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Icahn School of Medicine at Mount Sinai
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dr. Stella Safo
|
|
Plaintiff
Geraldine Llames
|
|
Plaintiff
Amanda Misiti
|
|
Plaintiff
Emilie Bruzelius
|
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Dr. Holly Atkinson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Dr. Natasha Anushri Anandaraja
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Mary Caliendo
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Humale Khan
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 10/13/2022 4:10 PM EDT |
Tuesday, May 24, 2022 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Natasha Anushri Anandaraja, Holly Atkinson, Mary Caliendo and Humale Khan, FILED. [3320511] 22-1128 [Entered: 05/24/2022 01:31 PM] | |
Att: 1 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax | ||
Att: 2 18 pgs Case FILED | ||
2 | 2 30+ pgs DISTRICT COURT OPINION AND ORDER, dated 01/14/2022, RECEIVED.[3320515] 22-1128 [Entered: 05/24/2022 01:34 PM] | |
3 | 3 1 pgs DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 04/25/2022, RECEIVED.[3320516] 22-1128 [Entered: 05/24/2022 01:34 PM] | |
4 | 4 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Natasha Anushri Anandaraja, Holly Atkinson, Mary Caliendo and Humale Khan, district court receipt # ANYSDC-26184202, FILED.[3320517] 22-1128 [Entered: 05/24/2022 01:35 PM] | |
7 | 7 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[3320935] 22-1128 [Entered: 05/25/2022 09:12 AM] | |
Att: 1 1 pgs Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed | ||
Att: 2 18 pgs Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED |