Jonathan Scarborough v. Federated Mutual Insurance Co.
Original Case: 0:15-cv-01633
Eighth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:19-cv-01918 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Case Filed: | May 03, 2019 |
Terminated: | Apr 29, 2021 |
Last checked: Friday Oct 01, 2021 1:52 PM CDT |
Defendant - Appellee
Federated Mutual Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Jonathan Scarborough
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Apr 29 2021
OPINION FILED - THE COURT: Steven M. Colloton, Morris S. Arnold and Jane Kelly AUTHORING JUDGE:Jane Kelly (PUBLISHED) [5030232] [19-1918] |
Docket last updated: 10/01/2021 1:52 PM CDT |
Friday, May 03, 2019 | ||
4 pgs Civil case docketed. [4784261] 19-1918 (CYZ) | ||
38 pgs Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, order of 3/29/2019, judgment of 4/1/2019 [4784266] 19-1918 (CYZ) | ||
2
pgs
BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Transcript due on or before 06/12/2019. Appendix due 06/24/2019. BRIEF APPELLANT, Jonathan Scarborough due 06/24/2019 Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. Appellant reply brief is due 21 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the appellee brief. [4784268] 19-1918 (CYZ) |
||
1 pgs APPEARANCE filed by John A. Fabian for Appellant Mr. Jonathan Scarborough w/service 05/03/2019 [4784303] 19-1918 (JAF) | ||
1 pgs APPEARANCE filed by David H. Redden for Appellant Mr. Jonathan Scarborough w/service 05/03/2019 [4784304] 19-1918 (JAF) |