HEREDIA MONS et al v. MCALEENAN et al
District Of Columbia District Court | |
Judge: | James E Boasberg |
Case #: | 1:19-cv-01593 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 05:551 Administrative Procedure Act |
Case Filed: | May 30, 2019 |
Last checked: Tuesday Nov 26, 2019 3:55 AM EST |
Defendant
NATHALIE ASHER
in her official capacity as Acting Executive Associate Director of ICE Enforcement and Removal Operations ICE
Washington, DC 20536 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
KEVIN K. MCALEENAN
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
GEORGE LUND, III
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
MATTHEW T. ALBENCE
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
MIGUEL ANGEL GIRON MARTINEZ
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
ANGEL ALEJANDRO HEREDIA MONS
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
J.M.R.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
F.J.B.H.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
M.R.M.H.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
DAYANA MENA LOPEZ
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
ROLAND NCHANGO TUMENTA
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
P.S.P.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
DOUGLAS ENRIQUE PUCHE MORENO
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
R.O.P.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
ADRIAN TOLEDO FLORES
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Y.A.L.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Tuesday, August 27, 2024 | ||
252 | 252
misc
Status Report
Tue 08/27 11:03 AM
Joint STATUS REPORT by MATTHEW T. ALBENCE, NATHALIE ASHER, GEORGE LUND, III, KEVIN K. MCALEENAN. (Simon, Jeremy) |
|
order
.Order
Tue 08/27 2:59 PM
MINUTE ORDER: The Court ADOPTS the parties'252 Joint Status Report and ORDERS that they shall file a further joint status report by October 1, 2024. So ORDERED by Chief Judge James E. Boasberg on 8/27/2024. (lcjeb2) |
||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Tue 08/27 3:12 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 10/1/2024. (znbn) |
||
Thursday, August 22, 2024 | ||
251 | 251
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Thu 08/22 8:45 AM
Consent MOTION to Modify the Time Period for Reporting by Defendants by MATTHEW T. ALBENCE, NATHALIE ASHER, GEORGE LUND, III, KEVIN K. MCALEENAN.(Simon, Jeremy) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
order
.Order
Thu 08/22 11:09 AM
MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that: 1) The Consent251 Motion to Modify the Time Period for Reporting by Defendants is GRANTED; 2) Beginning September 24, 2024, Defendants' reporting pursuant to the minute order dated October 7, 2019, shall be on a quarterly basis and no longer on a monthly basis; and 3) Defendants are excused from filing a report for the month of August 2024. So ORDERED by Chief Judge James E. Boasberg on August 20, 2024. (lcjeb3) |