Angel Alejandro Heredia Mons, et al v. Chad F. Wolf, et al
Original Case: 1:19-cv-01593
D.C. Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:19-cvus-05306 |
Type | civil us / united states |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Nov 08, 2019 |
Terminated: | Jun 29, 2020 |
Last checked: Thursday Apr 18, 2024 10:38 PM EDT |
Defendant - Appellant
Chad F. Wolf, in his official capacity as Acting Secretary of the Department of Homeland Security
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
George Lund, III, in his official capacity as Director of the ICE New Orleans Field Office
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
Nathalie Asher, in her official capacity as Acting Executive Associate Director of ICE Enforcement and Removal Operations
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
Matthew T. Albence, in his official capacity as Acting Director of U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
Kevin K. McAleenan, in his official capacity as Acting Secretary of the Department of Homeland Security
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Y.A.L.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
R.O.P.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
P.S.P.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
J.M.R.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Angel Alejandro Heredia Mons
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Miguel Angel Giron Martinez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
F.J.B.H.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
M.R.M.H.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Douglas Enrique Puche Moreno
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Dayana Mena Lopez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Adrian Toledo Flores
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Roland Nchango Tumenta
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 10:38 PM EDT |
Friday, November 08, 2019 | ||
US CIVIL CASE docketed. 19-5306 | ||
42 pgs NOTICE OF APPEAL [1815057] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:19-cv-01593-JEB filed by Matthew T. Albence, Nathalie Asher, George Lund, III and Kevin K. McAleenan. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 19-5306 19-5306 | ||
1 pgs LETTER [1815064] sent regarding attorney membership to Mary Bauer for Angel Alejandro Heredia Mons, Roland Nchango Tumenta, Adrian Toledo Flores, Dayana Mena Lopez, Douglas Enrique Puche Moreno, M.R.M.H., F.J.B.H., Miguel Angel Giron Martinez, Y.A.L., J.M.R., P.S.P. and R.O.P., Melissa Crow for Angel Alejandro Heredia Mons, Roland Nchango Tumenta, Adrian Toledo Flores, Dayana Mena Lopez, Douglas Enrique Puche Moreno, M.R.M.H., F.J.B.H., Miguel Angel Giron Martinez, Y.A.L., J.M.R., P.S.P. and R.O.P., Bruce Warfield Hamilton for Angel Alejandro Heredia Mons, Roland Nchango Tumenta, Adrian Toledo Flores, Dayana Mena Lopez, Douglas Enrique Puche Moreno, M.R.M.H., F.J.B.H., Miguel Angel Giron Martinez, Y.A.L., J.M.R., P.S.P. and R.O.P., Luz Virginia Lopez for Angel Alejandro Heredia Mons, Roland Nchango Tumenta, Adrian Toledo Flores, Dayana Mena Lopez, Douglas Enrique Puche Moreno, M.R.M.H., F.J.B.H., Miguel Angel Giron Martinez, Y.A.L., J.M.R., P.S.P. and R.O.P. and Laura Rivera for Angel Alejandro Heredia Mons, Roland Nchango Tumenta, Adrian Toledo Flores, Dayana Mena Lopez, Douglas Enrique Puche Moreno, M.R.M.H., F.J.B.H., Miguel Angel Giron Martinez, Y.A.L., J.M.R., P.S.P. and R.O.P.. Application for Admission due 12/09/2019. 19-5306 | ||
2 pgs CLERK'S ORDER [1815066] filed directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 12/09/2019. APPELLANT certificate as to parties due 12/09/2019. APPELLANT statement of issues due 12/09/2019. APPELLANT underlying decision due 12/09/2019. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 12/09/2019. APPELLANT notice of appearance due 12/09/2019. APPELLANT transcript status report due 12/09/2019. APPELLANT procedural motions due 12/09/2019. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 12/23/2019; directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties due 12/09/2019. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 12/09/2019. APPELLEE procedural motions due 12/09/2019. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 12/23/2019 19-5306 |