Rupert Baptiste v. Fatou Jallow
Original Case: 2:16-cv-04593
Third Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:19-cv-02544 |
Type | civil / private / diversity |
Nature of Suit | 370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud |
Case Filed: | Jul 05, 2019 |
Terminated: | Sep 12, 2019 |
Last checked: Friday Sep 13, 2019 4:32 AM EDT |
Defendant
FATOU JALLOW
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
FATOU JALLOW
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
RUPERT BAPTISTE
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/13/2019 4:32 AM EDT |
Friday, July 05, 2019 | ||
RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (MB) | ||
CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Rupert Baptiste in District Court No. 2-16-cv-04593. (MB) | ||
Att: 1 4 pgs Civil Case Docketed | ||
Att: 2 2 pgs DC Order | ||
Att: 3 1 pgs Caption | ||
Att: 4 1 pgs Standing Order | ||
Att: 5 2 pgs Case Opening Letter |