BAPTISTE v. JALLOW
New Jersey District Court | |
Judge: | Esther Salas |
Referred: | Michael A Hammer |
Case #: | 2:16-cv-04593 |
Nature of Suit | 370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Fraud |
Case Filed: | Jul 28, 2016 |
Terminated: | Jun 06, 2019 |
Last checked: Tuesday Jan 24, 2017 4:27 AM EST |
Defendant
FATOU JALLOW
|
|
Plaintiff
RUPERT BAPTISTE
1063 BRIGHTON STREET
UNION, NJ 07083 |
Docket last updated: 09/06/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, July 09, 2024 | ||
appeal
USCA Appeal Fees
Wed 07/10 8:30 AM
USCA Appeal Fees received $605 receipt number CAM15086, Re:67 Notice of Appeal (USCA), filed by RUPERT BAPTISTE. (js) |