Consolidated
Lead case: 3:16-md-02734

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:19-cv-02902
Nature of Suit367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Aug 01, 2019
Terminated:Apr 15, 2020
Last checked: Tuesday Jan 28, 2020 3:30 AM EST
Defendant
BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY
Defendant
OTSUKA AMERICA PHARMACEUTICAL INC
Defendant
OTSUKA PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD
Plaintiff
SHERRINE GARLAND
Represented By
DIANE FENNER
Williams Cedar Llc - Bala Cynwyd PA
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Wednesday, April 15, 2020
10 10 notice Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options Wed 04/15 9:34 AM
CLERK'S DISMISSAL re9 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice (djb)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 13, 2020
9 9 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Mon 04/13 9:47 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by SHERRINE GARLAND. (FENNER, DIANE)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 30, 2019
8 8 notice Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options Mon 09/30 2:45 PM
NOTICE Return of Service for Otsuka American Pharmaceutical by SHERRINE GARLAND (FENNER, DIANE)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 11, 2019
7 7 notice Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options Wed 09/11 2:58 PM
NOTICE Waiver of Service of Summons - Bristol-Myers Squibb by SHERRINE GARLAND (FENNER, DIANE)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 07, 2019
6 6 service Summons Issued Thu 08/08 3:07 PM
Summons Issued as to BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY, #1 OTSUKA AMERICA PHARMACEUTICAL INC, #2 OTSUKA PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD. (djb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 06, 2019
5 5 misc Docket Annotation Tue 08/06 4:22 PM
DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: Notice to Filer for future reference please use civil event "Notice - Other...," to attach summons to be issued or attach the summons to the complaint. Re2 Civil Cover Sheet (djb)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 02, 2019
4 4 notice Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options Fri 08/02 1:10 PM
NOTICE Plaintiff's Counsel Certification by SHERRINE GARLAND (FENNER, DIANE)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Docket Annotation Fri 08/02 12:59 PM
DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: Notice to Filer - MDL cases originating in the same district as the master MDL Docket are referred to as direct file MDL cases. When filing a direct complaint please choose origin code, 8 Multidistrict Litigation - Direct File. The code has been added to the civil cover sheet, (JS 44 (Rev. 06/17). Please also note that the first party defendant name, BRISOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY, should be entered in the case data. Clerk will correct origin code and party name. (djb)
Related: [-]
utility Action Required by District Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases Fri 08/02 2:47 PM
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re:4 Notice Plaintiff's Counsel Certification (djb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 01, 2019
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Thu 08/01 3:34 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET. (FENNER, DIANE)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 SUMMONS FOR OTSUKA AMERICA PHARMACEUTICAL, INC.,
Att: 2 SUMMONS FOR OTSUKA PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD.,
Att: 3 SUMMONS FOR BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 08/01 3:33 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4574920.), filed by SHERRINE GARLAND. (FENNER, DIANE)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Fri 08/02 11:28 AM
MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES added. MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY no longer assigned to case. (djb)
Related: [-]