Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:16-md-02734
Nature of Suit245 Real Property - Tort Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Oct 03, 2016
Terminated:May 19, 2022
Last checked: Thursday Aug 15, 2019 6:52 PM EDT
Defendant
BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY
Represented By
THOMAS LARRY HILL
Moore Hill & Westmoreland Pa - Pensacola
contact info
DAVID JOSEPH WALZ
Carlton Fields Jorden Etc Pa - Tampa Fl
contact info
JESSICA R CATERINA
Arnold & Porter Llp - New York Ny
contact info
ANAND AGNESHWAR
Arnold & Porter Llp - New York Ny
contact info
CHARLES FRANKLIN BEALL, JR.
Moore Hill & Westmoreland Pa - Pensacola Fl
contact info
PAIGE SHARPE
Arnold & Porter Llp - Washington Dc
contact info
JAMES J WARD
Hogan Lovells Us Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
MITCHELL RUSSELL STERN
Arnold & Porter Llp - New York Ny
contact info
KIMBERLY SPEER SULLIVAN
Moore Hill & Westmoreland Pa - Pensacola Fl
contact info
LAUREN S COLTON
Hogan Lovells Us Llp - Baltimore Md
contact info
JULIE SCHINDEL
Hogan Lovells Us Llp - Baltimore Md
contact info
DAVID JONATHAN ROBBINS
Hogan Lovells Us Llp - San Francisco Ca
contact info
EDWARD W GERECKE
Carlton Fields Jorden Etc Pa - Tampa Fl
contact info
BARRY J THOMPSON
Hogan Lovells Us Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
DANIEL S PARISER
Arnold & Porter Llp - Washington Dc
contact info
CHRISTINA E SHARKEY
Kirkland & Ellis Llp - Chicago Il
contact info
ROBERT C BROCK
Kirkland & Ellis Llp - Washington Dc
contact info
FRANK CHADWICK MORRISS
Kirkland & Ellis Llp - Washington Dc
contact info
ANDREA W TRENTO
Office Of Attorney Counsel - Baltimore Md
contact info
ALLISON J CAPLIS
Hogan Lovells Us Llp - Baltimore Md
contact info
SYDNEY FAIRCHILD FITCH
Hogan Lovells Us Llp - Baltimore Md
contact info
MATTHEW ALAN CAMPBELL
Winston & Strawn Llc - Washington Dc
contact info
JOCELYN A WIESNER
Arnold & Porter Llp - Washington Dc
contact info
MATTHEW A EISENSTEIN
Arnold & Porter Llp - Washington Dc
contact info
KEVIN A CLINE
Arnold & Porter Llp - Washington Dc
contact info
Defendant
MCKESSON CORPORATION
Represented By
ROBYN C CALLAHAN
Joseph & Cohen Pc - San Francisco Ca
contact info
JONATHAN MICHAEL COHEN
Joseph & Cohen Pc - San Francisco Ca
contact info
Defendant
OTSUKA AMERICA PHARMACEUTICAL INC
Represented By
RAND K BROTHERS
Winston & Strawn Llc - Washington Dc
contact info
LUKE A CONNELLY
Winston & Strawn Llp - New York Ny
contact info
WILLIAM BENNETT CARTER, JR
Dennis Jackson Martin Etc - Tallahassee Fl
contact info
CHRISTINA E SHARKEY
Kirkland & Ellis Llp - Chicago Il
contact info
SARAH J BILY
Winston & Strawn Llc - Washington Dc
contact info
ROBERT C BROCK
Kirkland & Ellis Llp - Washington Dc
contact info
FRANK CHADWICK MORRISS
Kirkland & Ellis Llp - Washington Dc
contact info
NATALIE L ARBAUGH
Winston & Strawn Llp - Dallas Tx
contact info
JEFF PHILIP JOHNSON
Winston & Strawn Llc - Washington Dc
contact info
KELLY OVERSTREET JOHNSON
Baker Donelson Bearman Etc Pc - Tallahassee Fl
contact info
JOANNA C WADE
Winston & Strawn Llp - Charlotte Nc
contact info
MATTHEW ALAN CAMPBELL
Winston & Strawn Llc - Washington Dc
contact info
JOHN W HARDING
Winston & Strawn Llc - Washington Dc
contact info
ERIC M GOLDSTEIN
Financial Industry Regulatory Authority
contact info
RUSSELL BRADBURY BUCHANAN
Baker Donelson Bearman Etc Pc - Tallahassee Fl
contact info
JOHN J ROSENTHAL
Winston & Strawn Llc - Washington Dc
contact info
HAL K LITCHFORD
Baker Donelson - Orlando Fl
contact info
KYLE A DIAMANTAS
Baker Donelson Bearman Etc Pc - Orlando Fl
contact info
JOELLE L ROSS
Winston & Strawn Llc - Washington Dc
contact info
MELISSA STEEDLE BOGAD
Merus Us Inc - Cambridge Ma
contact info
MATTHEW M SAXON
Winston & Strawn Llc - Washington Dc
contact info
ERIKA L BERMAN
Kobre & Kim Llp - Washington Dc
contact info
Defendant
OTSUKA PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD
Represented By
RAND K BROTHERS
Winston & Strawn Llc - Washington Dc
contact info
LUKE A CONNELLY
Winston & Strawn Llp - New York Ny
contact info
WILLIAM BENNETT CARTER, JR
Dennis Jackson Martin Etc - Tallahassee Fl
contact info
CHRISTINA E SHARKEY
Kirkland & Ellis Llp - Chicago Il
contact info
SARAH J BILY
Winston & Strawn Llc - Washington Dc
contact info
ROBERT C BROCK
Kirkland & Ellis Llp - Washington Dc
contact info
FRANK CHADWICK MORRISS
Kirkland & Ellis Llp - Washington Dc
contact info
NATALIE L ARBAUGH
Winston & Strawn Llp - Dallas Tx
contact info
JEFF PHILIP JOHNSON
Winston & Strawn Llc - Washington Dc
contact info
KELLY OVERSTREET JOHNSON
Baker Donelson Bearman Etc Pc - Tallahassee Fl
contact info
JOANNA C WADE
Winston & Strawn Llp - Charlotte Nc
contact info
MATTHEW ALAN CAMPBELL
Winston & Strawn Llc - Washington Dc
contact info
JOHN W HARDING
Winston & Strawn Llc - Washington Dc
contact info
ERIC M GOLDSTEIN
Financial Industry Regulatory Authority
contact info
RUSSELL BRADBURY BUCHANAN
Baker Donelson Bearman Etc Pc - Tallahassee Fl
contact info
JOHN J ROSENTHAL
Winston & Strawn Llc - Washington Dc
contact info
HAL K LITCHFORD
Baker Donelson - Orlando Fl
contact info
KYLE A DIAMANTAS
Baker Donelson Bearman Etc Pc - Orlando Fl
contact info
JOELLE L ROSS
Winston & Strawn Llc - Washington Dc
contact info
MELISSA STEEDLE BOGAD
Merus Us Inc - Cambridge Ma
contact info
MATTHEW M SAXON
Winston & Strawn Llc - Washington Dc
contact info
ERIKA L BERMAN
Kobre & Kim Llp - Washington Dc
contact info
In Re
ABILIFY (ARIPIPRAZOLE) PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION
Interested Party
ROMA PETKAUSKAS
Interested Party
JACOB WOODY
Interested Party
DOCKET HARVESTER
Notice Only Party MDL
WILLIAM OTIS JAMES BROWN
21932-057 FCI ESTILL PO BOX 699
ESTILL, SC 29918
Notice Only Party MDL
COURTNEY J CROSBY
CDC T50417 California Health Care Facility-Stockton 7707 Austin Road
Stockton, CA 95215
Notice Only Party MDL
JOHN DEREK GINSBERG
10 CHAPEL HILL DRIVE APT 5
PLYMOUTH, MA 02360
Notice Only Party MDL
CHRISTOPHER LIPSEY, JR
F-18039 KERN VALLEY STATE PRISON Facility: A, Bldg: 7, Cell: 209 P.O. BOX 5101
DELANO, CA 93216
Notice Only Party MDL
TERRY MADDEN
2028 AMERICUS AVENUE APT 5
PENSACOLA, FL 32507
Notice Only Party MDL
BRYAN MARSHALL
4064 SW 98TH TERRACE
GAINESVILLE, FL 32608
Notice Only Party MDL
DENNIS MCCLINTOCK
1212 GUADALUPE ST #904
AUSTIN, TX 78701
Notice Only Party MDL
NOTICE ONLY
Represented By
JONATHAN STEPHEN MANN
Pittman Dutton & Hellums Pc - Birmingham Al
contact info
LOUISE ANN LOCK
Louise A Lock Pa - Towson Md
contact info
GEORGE THARIN WILLIAMSON
Farr Farr Emerich Etc Pa - Punta Gorda Fl
contact info
AARON RUSSELL DIAS
Richardson Patrick Westbrook Etc - Mt Pleasant Sc
contact info
MARK HERBERT SCHLEIN
Baum Hedlund Aristei Etc Pc - Tallahassee Fl
contact info
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Kirtland & Packard Llp - El Segundo Ca
contact info
KEVIN BARRY ROGERS
Law Offices Of Kevin Rogers - Chicago Il
contact info
MICHAEL E GALLANT
Kelley Bernheim & Dolinksy - Washington Dc
contact info
DANIEL CHRISTOPHER BURKE
Bernstein Liebhard Llp - New York Ny
contact info
DOUGLAS C MONSOUR
Monsour Law Firm - Longview Tx
contact info
ROSA SCHWARE TREMBOUR
Eckert Seamans Cherin Etc Llc - Washington Dc
contact info
ERIC STEPHEN PAVLACK
Pavlack Law Llc - Indianapolis In
contact info
LAUREN D CALVERT
Morris Anderson - Las Vegas Nv
contact info
JASON JOHNSTON
Zimmerman Reed Llp - Minneapolis Mn
contact info
DOUGLAS BRETT TURNBULL
Turnbull Law Firm - Birmingham Al
contact info
M BRANDON SMITH
Childers Schlueter & Smith Llc - Atlanta Ga
contact info
ERNEST CORY
Cory Watson Pc - Birmingham Al
contact info
DAVID TODD MATHEWS
Gori Julian & Associates Pc - Edwardsville Il
contact info
ALEXANDRA K PIAZZA
Berger & Montague - Philadelphia PA
contact info
JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Napoli Shkolnik Pllc - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
ELIZABETH A PETERSON
Lockridge Grindal Nauen Pllp
contact info
MUHAMMAD S AZIZ
Abraham Watkins Nichols Etc - Houston Tx
contact info
WILLIAM A KERSHAW
Kershaw Cook & Talley Pc - Sacramento Ca
contact info
JEFFREY LAURENCE OSTERWISE
Berger & Montague - Philadelphia PA
contact info
ROBERT EDWARD LEMOINE
Turnbull Law Firm - Birmingham Al
contact info
PAMELA V HANSEN
Morris Bart Llc - New Orleans La
contact info
DANAE N BENTON
Baron & Budd Pc - Dallas Tx
contact info
TROY F TATTING
Robins Kaplan Miller Etc - Minneapolis Mn
contact info
NICHOLAS SCOTT CLEVENGER
Peterson & Associates Pc - Kansas City Mo
contact info
PHILIP MYCHAEL HERNANDEZ
Lieff Cabraser Heimann Etc Llp - San Franciso Ca
contact info
RICHARD L ROOT
Morris Bart Llc - New Orleans La
contact info
LEXI J HAZAM
Lieff Cabraser Heimann Etc Llp - San Franciso Ca
contact info
WILLIAM L BROSS, IV
Heninger Garrison Davis Llc - Birmingham Al
contact info
JENNIFER LEE LAWRENCE
The Lawrence Law Firm - Covington Ky
contact info
RAYNA E KESSLER
Robins Kaplan Llp - New York Ny
contact info
DANIEL JAMES THORNBURGH
Aylstock Witkin Kreis Etc Pllc - Pensacola Fl
contact info
YVONNE FLAHERTY
Lockridge Grindal Nauen Pllp
contact info
JOSEPH M LYON
The Lyon Firm - Cincinnati Oh
contact info
STUART C TALLEY
Kershaw Cook & Talley Pc - Sacramento Ca
contact info
ERIC M LINDENFELD
Robins Kaplan Miller Etc - Minneapolis Mn
contact info
ELIZABETH MIDDLETON BURKE
Richardson Patrick Westbrook Etc - Mt Pleasant Sc
contact info
JOHN D SILEO
Law Offices Of John D Sileo LLC
contact info
C MARK WHITEHEAD, III
The Whitehead Law Firm - Lafayette La
contact info
BRIAN S FRANCISKATO
Nash & Franciskato Law Firm - Kansas City Mo
contact info
MARY E PUTNICK
Putnick Legal Llc - Sewell Nj
contact info
STEPHEN HERRE ECHSNER
Aylstock Witkin Kreis Etc Pllc - Pensacola Fl
contact info
NINA TOWLE HERRING
Cory Watson Crowder Etc - Birmingham Al
contact info
BRANDON LEE BOGLE
Levin Papantonio Thomas Etc Pa - Pensacola Fl
contact info
RUSSELL TODD ABNEY
Ferrer Poirot Wansbrough Etc - Atlanta Ga
contact info
JULIE REYNOLDS
Robins Kaplan Miller Etc - Minneapolis Mn
contact info
GENEVIEVE MARY ZIMMERMAN
Meshbesher & Spence - Minneapolis Mn
contact info
MARLENE JAYE GOLDENBERG
Goldenberg Law Pllc - Minneapolis Mn
contact info
CHARLES HOUSSIERE, III
Houssiere Durant & Houssiere Llp - Houston Tx
contact info
J GORDON RUDD
Zimmerman Reed Llp - Minneapolis Mn
contact info
TARA SUTTON
Robins Kaplan Llc - Minneapolis Mn
contact info
GARY WILSON
Robins Kaplan Llc - Minneapolis Mn
contact info
JUSTIN GRAEM WITKIN
Aylstock Witkin Kreis Etc Pllc - Pensacola Fl
contact info
GRANT L DAVIS
Davis Bethune & Jones Llc - Kansas City Mo
contact info
EMILY ROARK
Bryant Law Center Psc - Paducah Ky
contact info
DONALD C ARBITBLIT
Lieff Cabraser Heimann Etc Llp - San Franciso Ca
contact info
EMILY T ACOSTA
Childers Schlueter & Smith Llc - Atlanta Ga
contact info
JASON L DEPAUW
Robins Kaplan Llc - Minneapolis Mn
contact info
DOUGLAS MICHAEL SCHREINER
Jackson Schreiner Llc - Leawood Ks
contact info
AMBER MARIE SEU YIN PANG PARRA
Justinian Associates Pllc - San Antonio Tx
contact info
ASHLEIGH RASO
Meshbesher & Spence - Minneapolis Mn
contact info
MUNIR MEGHJEE
Robins Kaplan Llc - Minneapolis Mn
contact info
MEGAN J MCKENZIE
Robins Kaplan Llc - Minneapolis Mn
contact info
BOBBY J BRADFORD
Aylstock Witkin Kreis Etc Pllc - Pensacola Fl
contact info
THOMAS CHRISTOPHER PINEDO
Hilliard Martinez Gonzales Llp - Corpus Christi Tx
contact info
DOUGLAS R PLYMALE
Dugan Law Firm - New Orleans La
contact info
CHRISTINA E SHARKEY
Kirkland & Ellis Llp - Chicago Il
contact info
MARTIN RICHARD LUECK
contact info
TROY ALAN RAFFERTY
Levin Papantonio - Pensacola Fl
contact info
CHRISTOPHER GUS PAULOS
Levin Papantonio - Pensacola Fl
contact info
KILEY LYNN GROMBACHER
Bradley Grombacher Llp - Westlake Village Ca
contact info
THOMAS J LECH
Goldenberg Heller & Antognoli - Edwardsville Il
contact info
DOUGLAS E KLEIN
Law Offices Of Douglas E Klein
contact info
KARA MICHELE HARP
The Lawrence Law Firm - Covington Ky
contact info
STEPHEN R HUNT, JR
Cory Watson Crowder Etc - Birmingham Al
contact info
MITCHELL T THEODORE
Cory Watson Pc - Birmingham Al
contact info
GARRY TRINH
contact info
RICHARD W SCHULTE
Wright & Schulte Llc - Vandalia Oh
contact info
J GORDON RUDD, JR
Zimmerman Reed Llp - Minneapolis Mn
contact info
CHRISTOPHER THEODORE HELLUMS
Pittman Dutton & Hellums Pc - Birmingham Al
contact info
KIMBALL J JONES
Bighorn Law Llc - Las Vegas Nv
contact info
SHANON JUDE CARSON
Berger & Montague - Philadelphia PA
contact info
DANIEL NIGH
Levin Papantonio Thomas Etc Pa - Pensacola Fl
contact info
LEVI M PLESSET
Milstein Jackson Fairchild & Wade - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
WILLIAM D NEFZGER
William D Nefzger Pllc - Louisville Ky
contact info
Notice Only Party MDL
DOUGLAS MEMLER
1112 MONTEREY CT
NAPERVILLE, IL 60540
Notice Only Party MDL
ERIC J STIGGLE, SR
170767 CONNECTICUT CORRECTIONAL FACILITY PO BOX 100
SOMERS, CT 06071
Notice Only Party MDL
SHELDON WEISS
7217 WATSON RD UNIT 190174
ST LOUIS, MO 63119
Plaintiff
LIAISON COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFFS
Represented By
KELLY K MCNABB
Lieff Cabraser Heimann Etc Llp - New York Ny
contact info
BRYAN FREDERICK AYLSTOCK
Aylstock Witkin Kreis Etc Pllc - Pensacola Fl
contact info
MUNIR MEGHJEE
Robins Kaplan Llc - Minneapolis Mn
contact info
LEXI J HAZAM
Lieff Cabraser Heimann Etc Llp - San Franciso Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
CO-LEAD COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFFS
Represented By
BRYAN FREDERICK AYLSTOCK
Aylstock Witkin Kreis Etc Pllc - Pensacola Fl
contact info
B KRISTIAN W RASMUSSEN
Cory Watson Pc - Birmingham Al
contact info
GARY WILSON
Robins Kaplan Llc - Minneapolis Mn
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Notice Only Party MDL
FATHER LASTER
Terminated: 10/30/2018
3218 11TH ST
GULFPORT, MS 39501

GPO May 15 2017
ORDER. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on May 15, 2017. (aow)
GPO Sep 29 2017
OMNIBUS ORDER and AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULE granting in part and denying in part 522 Defendants' Motion For Leave to Maintain Provisionally Sealed Filings Under Seal; granting 534 Defendants' Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Portions of Defendants' Motion to Compel Discovery From the Trial Pool Plaintiffs and for Relief from September 22, 2017 Deadline to Depose Plaintiffs; granting in part and denying in part 535 Defendants' Motion to Compel Discovery From the Trial Pool Plaintiffs and for Relief From September 22, 2017 Deadline to Depose Plaintiffs; granting in part and denying in part 536 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Defendants' Discovery Responses. The Case Management Schedule 273 is amended as provided in this order. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES on 09/29/17. (grj)
GPO Dec 29 2017
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 562 Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Production of Certain Documents on Defendants' Privilege Logs. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES on 12/29/17. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B) (grj)
GPO Apr 04 2018
ORDER denying 816 Defendants' Motion to Strike Errata Sheet of Deponent Darryl Lyons. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES on 04/04/18. (grj)
GPO Apr 18 2018
ORDER granting 847 Plaintiffs' Motion to Conduct Limited Additional Discovery Regarding Information Found in Recently Produced Audit Reports. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES on 04/18/18. (grj)
GPO Sep 17 2018
ont>ORDER denying 737 Plaintiffs' Disclosure Motion Regarding Two Documents Defendant Bristol-Myers Squibb Company Claims Are Privileged and Inadvertently Disclosed. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES on 09/17/18. (grj)
GPO Oct 05 2018
ORDER denying 719 Plaintiffs' Spoliation and Rule 37 Motion for Sanctions Against Defendant Otsuka America Pharmaceutical, Inc.. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES on 10/05/18. (grj)
GPO Nov 29 2018
ORDER granting 1062 Plaintiffs' Request for Additional Discovery from Dr. Berit Carlson, filed by LIAISON COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFFS. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES on 11/29/18. (grj)
GPO Jan 08 2019
hment(s) added on 1/8/2019: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C) (GRJ).ORDER granting in part and denying in part 644 Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Production of Documents on Defendants' New Privilege Logs. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES on 01/08/19. (grj) (Additional attac
GPO Dec 06 2019
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF SPECIAL MASTER ELLEN K. REISMAN REGARDING AWARD OF COMMON BENEFIT FEES AND EXPENSES (Internal deadline for referral to district judge if objections are not filed earlier: 12/20/2019). (TVJ)
GPO Dec 21 2019
ORDER adopting Special Master Ellen Reisman's Report and Recommendation Regarding Award of Common Benefit Fees and Expenses 1219. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 12/21/2019. (TVJ)

Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Friday, April 21, 2023
1362 1362 misc Letter Fri 04/21 4:40 PM
EXHIBIT RETURN Letter from Clerk to Counsel as to IN RE: ABILIFY (ARIPIPRAZOLE) PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION returning exhibits entered at500 Jury Trial on 8/3/2017, and1223 Rule 16 Hearing on 12/9/2019. Plaintiff Exhibits returned to BRYAN AYLSTOCK, AYLSTOCK WITKIN KREIS & OVERHOLTZ, Defendant Exhibits returned to LARRY HILL, MOORE HILL & WESTMORELAND PA. (blr)
Related: [-]