Consolidated
Lead case: 3:16-md-02734

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:19-cv-02904
Nature of Suit367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Aug 01, 2019
Terminated:Aug 05, 2020
Last checked: Tuesday Jan 28, 2020 3:27 AM EST
Defendant
BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY
Defendant
OTSUKA AMERICA PHARMACEUTICAL INC
Defendant
OTSUKA PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD
Plaintiff
KORINA HACKERT
Represented By
DIANE FENNER
Williams Cedar Llc - Bala Cynwyd PA
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Wednesday, August 05, 2020
15 15 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Wed 08/05 2:56 PM
ORDER granting Ms. Fenner's 11 Motion to Withdraw as Counsel. Consistent with the 14 Stipulation of Dismissal filed in this case, the Clerk is directed to dismiss the case with prejudice and close the file for all purposes. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 8/5/2020. (djb)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 03, 2020
utility Action Required by District Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases Fri 04/03 7:50 AM
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re:14 Stipulation of Dismissal (djb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 02, 2020
14 14 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Thu 04/02 7:37 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by KORINA HACKERT. (FENNER, DIANE)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 26, 2020
utility Action Required by District Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases Thu 03/26 7:54 AM
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re:13 Ex parte Submission re11 MOTION to Withdraw8 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (djb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 25, 2020
13 13 respm Response in Support of Motion 1 - Exparte Document - Use ONLY in Conjunction with Other Selection Thu 03/26 7:53 AM
EX PARTE Submission per12 Order. re11 MOTION to Withdraw8 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by KORINA HACKERT. (djb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 24, 2020
12 12 3 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Tue 03/24 3:53 PM
ORDER - The Clerk is directed to terminate the original 8 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney as MOOT. Counsel's ex parte submission is due by Wednesday, 3/25/2020 . To the extent the plaintiff still wishes to voluntarily dismiss her case, she must file a stipulation of dismissal signed by all parties, in accordance with Case No. 3:16md2734, ECF No. 106 at 8. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 3/24/2020. (djb)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 20, 2020
11 11 motion Withdraw Fri 03/20 12:19 PM
MOTION to Withdraw8 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by KORINA HACKERT. (FENNER, DIANE)
Related: [-]
utility Action Required by District Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases Fri 03/20 7:37 AM
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re:10 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal, see also8 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney re:9 Order (djb)
Related: [-]
utility Action Required by District Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases Fri 03/20 12:51 PM
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re:11 MOTION to Withdraw8 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (djb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 19, 2020
10 10 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Thu 03/19 2:14 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by KORINA HACKERT (FENNER, DIANE)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 18, 2020
9 9 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Wed 03/18 1:17 PM
ORDER re 8 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney. Ms. Fenner is directed to submit under seal in this case, for the Court's in camera review, a detailed explanation of the reason(s) for the firm's decision "that [it] would no longer be able to represent" Ms. Hackert, see id. at 1, particularly given the case review certification filed in the case on August 2, 2019, see ECF No. 4 . This submission is due by Wednesday, March 25, 2020 , with a copy of both this Order and Ms. Fenner's submission sent to Plaintiff Korina Hackert by that same date. If Ms. Hackert wishes to file a response, she must do so by Wednesday, April 8, 2020 . Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 3/18/2020. (djb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 17, 2020
utility Action Required by District Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases Tue 03/17 7:41 AM
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re:8 MOTION to to Withdraw as Counsel of Record Without Substitution (djb)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 16, 2020
8 8 motion Withdraw as Attorney Mon 03/16 2:45 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by KORINA HACKERT. (FENNER, DIANE)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 30, 2019
7 7 notice Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options Mon 09/30 2:41 PM
NOTICE Return of Service for Otsuka American Pharmaceutical by KORINA HACKERT (FENNER, DIANE)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 11, 2019
6 6 notice Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options Wed 09/11 2:50 PM
NOTICE Waiver of Service of Summons - Bristol-Myers Squibb by KORINA HACKERT (FENNER, DIANE)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 07, 2019
5 5 service Summons Issued Thu 08/08 3:08 PM
Summons Issued as to BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY, #1 OTSUKA AMERICA PHARMACEUTICAL INC, #2 OTSUKA PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD. (djb)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 02, 2019
4 4 notice Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options Fri 08/02 1:09 PM
NOTICE Plaintiff's Counsel Certification by KORINA HACKERT (FENNER, DIANE)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Docket Annotation Fri 08/02 12:56 PM
DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: Notice to Filer - MDL cases originating in the same district as the master MDL Docket are referred to as direct file MDL cases. When filing a direct complaint please choose origin code, 8 Multidistrict Litigation - Direct File. The code has been added to the civil cover sheet, (JS 44 (Rev. 06/17). Clerk will correct origin code. (djb)
Related: [-]
utility Action Required by District Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases Fri 08/02 2:48 PM
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re:4 Notice Plaintiff's Counsel Certification (djb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 01, 2019
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Thu 08/01 3:56 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET. (FENNER, DIANE)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 SUMMONS FOR BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY,
Att: 2 SUMMONS FOR OTSUKA PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD.,
Att: 3 SUMMONS FOR OTSUKA AMERICA PHARMACEUTICAL, INC.
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 08/01 3:41 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4574964.), filed by KORINA HACKERT. (FENNER, DIANE)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Fri 08/02 12:48 PM
JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS and MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES added. MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY and SENIOR JUDGE ROGER VINSON no longer assigned to case. (djb)
Related: [-]