Consolidated
Lead case: 3:16-md-02734

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:19-cv-03342
Nature of Suit367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Aug 29, 2019
Case in other court:Delaware, 1:19-cv-01533
Last checked: Tuesday Feb 25, 2020 4:16 AM EST
Defendant
OTSUKA AMERICA PHARMACEUTICAL INC
Represented By
MATTHEW ALAN CAMPBELL
Winston & Strawn Llc - Washington Dc
contact info
Defendant
OTSUKA PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD
Represented By
MATTHEW ALAN CAMPBELL
Winston & Strawn Llc - Washington Dc
contact info
Defendant
BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY
Represented By
THOMAS LARRY HILL
Moore Hill & Westmoreland Pa - Pensacola
contact info
Plaintiff
KENNETH BLACKWOOD
Represented By
JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Napoli Shkolnik Pllc - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Napoli Shkolnik, LLC
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Plaintiff
JOHNNIE SWEETEN
Terminated: 12/17/2019
Represented By
JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Napoli Shkolnik Pllc - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Napoli Shkolnik, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
HOPE PEREA
Terminated: 12/17/2019
Represented By
JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Napoli Shkolnik Pllc - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Napoli Shkolnik, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
SHAWN PARKER
Terminated: 12/17/2019
Represented By
JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Napoli Shkolnik Pllc - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Napoli Shkolnik, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
JOETTA PALMER
Terminated: 12/17/2019
Represented By
JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Napoli Shkolnik Pllc - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Napoli Shkolnik, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
WILLIAM OURADNIK
Terminated: 12/17/2019
Represented By
JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Napoli Shkolnik Pllc - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Napoli Shkolnik, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
ANGELA YOUNG
Terminated: 12/17/2019
Represented By
JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Napoli Shkolnik Pllc - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Napoli Shkolnik, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
ANGELA M JOHNSON
Terminated: 12/17/2019
Represented By
JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Napoli Shkolnik Pllc - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Napoli Shkolnik, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
TIMOTHY OSHEFSKY
Terminated: 12/17/2019
Represented By
JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Napoli Shkolnik Pllc - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Napoli Shkolnik, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
NORMA NIEVES
Terminated: 12/17/2019
Represented By
JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Napoli Shkolnik Pllc - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Napoli Shkolnik, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
LINDA NEUGEBAUER
Terminated: 12/17/2019
Represented By
JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Napoli Shkolnik Pllc - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Napoli Shkolnik, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
JAMES MCGRUDER
Terminated: 12/17/2019
Represented By
JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Napoli Shkolnik Pllc - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Napoli Shkolnik, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
DEMETRIA MATHIS
Terminated: 12/17/2019
Represented By
JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Napoli Shkolnik Pllc - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Napoli Shkolnik, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
PATRICK MARTIN
Terminated: 12/17/2019
Represented By
JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Napoli Shkolnik Pllc - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Napoli Shkolnik, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
CHRISTINE LOWERY
Terminated: 12/17/2019
Represented By
JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Napoli Shkolnik Pllc - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Napoli Shkolnik, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
DONNA JOHNSON-POTEAT
Terminated: 12/17/2019
Represented By
JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Napoli Shkolnik Pllc - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Napoli Shkolnik, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
MUHSEN HASSAN
Terminated: 12/17/2019
Represented By
JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Napoli Shkolnik Pllc - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Napoli Shkolnik, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
LEAVON HAIRE
Terminated: 12/17/2019
Represented By
JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Napoli Shkolnik Pllc - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Napoli Shkolnik, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
DENNIS BRODEUR
Terminated: 12/17/2019
Represented By
JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Napoli Shkolnik Pllc - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Napoli Shkolnik, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
JAMES BROWN
Terminated: 12/17/2019
Represented By
JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Napoli Shkolnik Pllc - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Napoli Shkolnik, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
JASON BROWN
Terminated: 12/17/2019
Represented By
JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Napoli Shkolnik Pllc - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Napoli Shkolnik, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
JOSEPH BROWN
Terminated: 12/17/2019
Represented By
JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Napoli Shkolnik Pllc - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Napoli Shkolnik, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
SHARON CALHOUN
Terminated: 12/17/2019
Represented By
JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Napoli Shkolnik Pllc - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Napoli Shkolnik, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
LATONYA CHRISTIAN
Terminated: 12/17/2019
Represented By
JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Napoli Shkolnik Pllc - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Napoli Shkolnik, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
TRENA CLARK
Terminated: 12/17/2019
Represented By
JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Napoli Shkolnik Pllc - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Napoli Shkolnik, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
BLAKE DINGER
Terminated: 12/17/2019
Represented By
JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Napoli Shkolnik Pllc - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Napoli Shkolnik, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
CALVIN ORTIZ ECHOLS
Terminated: 12/17/2019
Represented By
JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Napoli Shkolnik Pllc - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Napoli Shkolnik, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
BECKY FULCHER
Terminated: 12/17/2019
Represented By
JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Napoli Shkolnik Pllc - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Napoli Shkolnik, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
CHRISTINE GAGNE
Terminated: 12/17/2019
Represented By
JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Napoli Shkolnik Pllc - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Napoli Shkolnik, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
FATRAL GIBSON
Terminated: 12/17/2019
Represented By
JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Napoli Shkolnik Pllc - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Napoli Shkolnik, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
VERA GIVENS
Terminated: 12/17/2019
Represented By
JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Napoli Shkolnik Pllc - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Napoli Shkolnik, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
JOSEPH GATES GOZA
Terminated: 12/17/2019
Represented By
JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Napoli Shkolnik Pllc - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Napoli Shkolnik, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
ELDRIDGE HENDERSON
Terminated: 12/17/2019
Represented By
JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Napoli Shkolnik Pllc - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Napoli Shkolnik, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Monday, May 11, 2020
22 22 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Mon 05/11 4:52 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by KENNETH BLACKWOOD. (CARO, LOUISE)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 08, 2020
21 21 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 05/08 4:11 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by LOUISE R CARO on behalf of KENNETH BLACKWOOD (CARO, LOUISE)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 17, 2019
20 20 7 pgs order Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties Tue 12/17 2:30 PM
ORDER - The Clerk is directed to sever each plaintiff in the cases identified on Exhibit A, other than the first plaintiff named in the original complaint, assign separate civil action numbers to each severed plaintiff, and associate his or her each new case with the master docket for the MDL, 3:16md2734. JASON BROWN, JOSEPH BROWN, SHARON CALHOUN, LATONYA CHRISTIAN, TRENA CLARK, BLAKE DINGER, CALVIN ORTIZ ECHOLS, BECKY FULCHER, CHRISTINE GAGNE, FATRAL GIBSON, VERA GIVENS, JOSEPH GATES GOZA, LEAVON HAIRE, MUHSEN HASSAN, ELDRIDGE HENDERSON, ANGELA M. JOHNSON, DONNA JOHNSON-POTEAT, CHRISTINE LOWERY, PATRICK MARTIN, DEMETRIA MATHIS, JAMES MCGRUDER, LINDA NEUGEBAUER, NORMA NIEVES, TIMOTHY OSHEFSKY, WILLIAM OURADNIK, JOETTA PALMER, SHAWN PARKER, HOPE PEREA, JOHNNIE SWEETEN, ANGELA YOUNG, DENNIS BRODEUR and JAMES BROWN terminated. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 12/17/2019. (Clerk will assign case numbers. Counsel will be notified of new case through NEF) (djb)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 18, 2019
utility Action Required by District Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases Mon 11/18 7:37 AM
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re:19 Response to Order to Show Cause,17 Order,18 NOTICE of Filing Attorney Certification in Compliance with February 25, 2019 Order Regarding Case Review Process (djb)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 15, 2019
19 19 misc Response to Order to Show Cause Fri 11/15 6:50 PM
RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by KENNETH BLACKWOOD, JOSEPH BROWN, SHARON CALHOUN, LATONYA CHRISTIAN, TRENA CLARK, BLAKE DINGER, CALVIN ORTIZ ECHOLS, BECKY FULCHER, CHRISTINE GAGNE, FATRAL GIBSON, VERA GIVENS, JOSEPH GATES GOZA, LEAVON HAIRE, MUHSEN HASSAN, ELDRIDGE HENDERSON, ANGELA M. JOHNSON, DONNA JOHNSON-POTEAT, CHRISTINE LOWERY, PATRICK MARTIN, DEMETRIA MATHIS, JAMES MCGRUDER, LINDA NEUGEBAUER, NORMA NIEVES, TIMOTHY OSHEFSKY, JOETTA PALMER, SHAWN PARKER, HOPE PEREA, ANGELA YOUNG. (LIAKOS, JENNIFER)
Related: [-]
18 18 notice Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options Fri 11/15 6:27 PM
NOTICE of Filing Attorney Certification in Compliance with February 25, 2019 Order Regarding Case Review Process by JOSEPH BROWN, SHARON CALHOUN, LATONYA CHRISTIAN, TRENA CLARK, BLAKE DINGER, CALVIN ORTIZ ECHOLS, BECKY FULCHER, CHRISTINE GAGNE, JOSEPH GATES GOZA, LEAVON HAIRE, MUHSEN HASSAN, ELDRIDGE HENDERSON, DONNA JOHNSON-POTEAT, PATRICK MARTIN, DEMETRIA MATHIS, JAMES MCGRUDER, LINDA NEUGEBAUER, NORMA NIEVES, TIMOTHY OSHEFSKY, JOETTA PALMER, SHAWN PARKER, ANGELA YOUNG (LIAKOS, JENNIFER)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 28, 2019
17 17 7 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Mon 10/28 1:51 PM
ORDER - Defendants' 13 and 15 Motions for Order to Show Cause re PPFs and SPPFs are GRANTED. The individual plaintiffs identified on Exhibits A and B are hereby ORDERED to show cause why their cases should not be dismissed with prejudice for failure to comply with orders of the Court, by 11/15/2019 . The plaintiffs' responses to this show cause order must be filed on the docket for this individual case only. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 10/28/2019. (djb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 17, 2019
16 16 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 10/17 3:41 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by THOMAS LARRY HILL on behalf of BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY (HILL, THOMAS)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 16, 2019
15 15 motion Show Cause Wed 10/16 1:41 PM
MOTION for Order to Show Cause re PPFs and SPPFs by BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY, OTSUKA AMERICA PHARMACEUTICAL INC, OTSUKA PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD. (CAMPBELL, MATTHEW)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - List of Plaintiffs,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Deficiency Letter
utility Action Required by District Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases Wed 10/16 4:31 PM
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re:15 MOTION for Order to Show Cause re PPFs and SPPFs (djb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 15, 2019
utility Action Required by District Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases Tue 10/15 8:10 AM
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re:6 Notice of Filing Attorney Certification by Angela M. Johnson,8 Notice of Filing Attorney Certification by Fatral Gibson,9 Notice of Filing Attorney Certification by Hope Perea,7 Notice of Filing Attorney Certification by Christine Lowery,11 Notice of Filing Attorney Certification by Vera Givens,10 Notice of Filing Attorney Certification by Kenneth Blackwood (djb)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 14, 2019
14 14 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 10/14 6:04 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by JENNIFER R LIAKOS on behalf of All Plaintiffs (LIAKOS, JENNIFER)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 11, 2019
utility Action Required by District Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases Fri 10/11 8:42 AM
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re:13 MOTION for Order to Show Cause re Certifications (djb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 10, 2019
13 13 motion Show Cause Thu 10/10 6:32 PM
MOTION for Order to Show Cause re Certifications by BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY, OTSUKA AMERICA PHARMACEUTICAL INC, OTSUKA PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD. (CAMPBELL, MATTHEW)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - List of Plaintiffs,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Deficiency Letter
Wednesday, October 09, 2019
12 12 misc Docket Annotation Wed 10/09 8:11 AM
DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: Notice to Attorney Jennifer Liakos - Please enter a notice of appearance on behalf of plaintiffs re: Certifications filed 10/8/2019 re: docket entries6 through11 . (djb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 08, 2019
11 11 notice Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options Tue 10/08 10:41 PM
NOTICE of Filing Attorney Certification in Compliance with February 25, 2019 Order Regarding Case Review Process by VERA GIVENS (LIAKOS, JENNIFER)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options Tue 10/08 10:40 PM
NOTICE of Filing Attorney Certification in Compliance with February 25, 2019 Order Regarding Case Review Process by KENNETH BLACKWOOD (LIAKOS, JENNIFER)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options Tue 10/08 10:39 PM
NOTICE of Filing Attorney Certification in Compliance with February 25, 2019 Order Regarding Case Review Process by HOPE PEREA (LIAKOS, JENNIFER)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options Tue 10/08 10:39 PM
NOTICE of Filing Attorney Certification in Compliance with February 25, 2019 Order Regarding Case Review Process by FATRAL GIBSON (LIAKOS, JENNIFER)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options Tue 10/08 10:38 PM
NOTICE of Filing Attorney Certification in Compliance with February 25, 2019 Order Regarding Case Review Process by CHRISTINE LOWERY (LIAKOS, JENNIFER)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options Tue 10/08 10:29 PM
NOTICE of Filing Attorney Certification in Compliance with February 25, 2019 Order Regarding Case Review Process by ANGELA M. JOHNSON (LIAKOS, JENNIFER)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 29, 2019
5 5 notice Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options Thu 08/29 10:35 AM
NOTICE REGARDING ATTORNEY ADMISSION. (djb)
Related: [-]
4 4 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer (COURT USE ONLY) Thu 08/29 10:08 AM
Case transferred in from District of Delaware; Case Number 1:19-cv-01533. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]
3 3 2 pgs order Order Thu 08/29 10:10 AM
CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-27). Signed by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel on 8/27/2019. (nms)
Related: [-]
Case transferred to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Florida. (nms) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/29/2019.]
Related: [-]
transfer Case Transferred Out - District Transfer (COURT USE ONLY) Thu 08/29 10:11 AM
Case transferred to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Florida. (nms)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 21, 2019
Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-01531-RGA, 1:19-cv-01532-RGA, 1:19-cv-01533-RGA, 1:19-cv-01534-RGA (rjb) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/29/2019.]
Related: [-]
Friday, August 16, 2019
2 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (amf) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/29/2019.]
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Otsuka America Pharmaceutical, Inc., and Otsuka Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2710182) - filed by Eldridge Henderson, Johnnie Sweeten, Christine Gagne, Jason Brown, Blake Dinger, Kenneth Blackwood, William Ouradnik, Vera Givens, Joseph Gates Goza, Joetta Palmer, Hope Perea, Shawn Parker, Norma Nieves, Muhsen Hassan, Angela M. Johnson, Sharon Calhoun, Timothy Oshefsky, Latonya Christian, Fatral Gibson, Angela Young, Leavon Haire, Christine Lowery, Dennis Brodeur, Calvin Ortiz Echols, Joseph Brown, Patrick Martin, Trena Clark, Linda Neugebauer, Donna Johnson-Poteat, James McGruder, Becky Fulcher, Demetria Mathis, and James Brown.(amf) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/29/2019.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
No Summons Issued. (amf) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/29/2019.]
Related: [-]