Consolidated
Lead case: 3:16-md-02734

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:19-cv-03366
Nature of Suit367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Aug 30, 2019
Terminated:Aug 05, 2020
Case in other court:Michigan Western, 1:19-cv-00602
Last checked: Wednesday Feb 26, 2020 4:06 AM EST
Defendant
BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY
Represented By
THOMAS LARRY HILL
Moore Hill & Westmoreland Pa - Pensacola
contact info
Plaintiff
NATHAN BICK
2630 LILAC RD
HILLSDALE, MI 49242


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Wednesday, August 05, 2020
15 15 5 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Wed 08/05 3:01 PM
ORDER - Plaintiff Nathan Bicks 12 Motion to Dismiss Without Prejudice, is DENIED. Bick's case is hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE for failure to comply with Court orders. The Clerk is directed to close this case in its entirety for all purposes. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 8/5/2020. (djb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 09, 2020
utility Action Required by District Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases Thu 07/09 8:40 AM
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re:12 MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice,14 Response to Motion (djb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 08, 2020
14 14 respm Response to Motion Wed 07/08 12:10 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re12 MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice filed by BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY. (STERN, MITCHELL)
Related: [-]
13 13 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 07/08 12:08 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by MITCHELL RUSSELL STERN on behalf of BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY (STERN, MITCHELL)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 29, 2020
12 12 motion Dismiss Tue 06/30 3:10 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice by NATHAN BICK. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 7/13/2020) . (djb)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 08, 2020
11 11 1 pgs order Order Mon 06/08 9:17 AM
ORDER granting 10 MOTION to Extend Time as requested. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 6/8/2020. (djb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 20, 2020
utility Action Required by District Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases Wed 05/20 1:03 PM
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re:10 MOTION to Extend Time for Expert Witness Report and Depositions (djb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 19, 2020
10 10 motion Extend Time Wed 05/20 1:01 PM
MOTION to Extend Time for Expert Witness Report and Depositions by NATHAN BICK. (djb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 06, 2019
9 9 misc Docket Annotation Wed 11/06 10:31 AM
DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: Re: Telephone call from Mr. Bick, Plaintiff's address corrected to 2630 Lilac Rd. Mailed plaintiff Letter of Transfer and Orders 1131,1135,1136 1137,1138 from 3:16md2734. (djb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 17, 2019
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 10/17 3:55 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by THOMAS LARRY HILL on behalf of BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY (HILL, THOMAS)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 04, 2019
7 7 misc Docket Annotation Wed 09/04 2:49 PM
DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: Mailed plaintiff Letter of Transfer and Orders 1131,1135,1136 1137,1138 from 3:16md2734. (djb)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 30, 2019
6 6 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer (COURT USE ONLY) Fri 08/30 1:42 PM
Case transferred in from District of Michigan Western; Case Number 1:19-cv-00602. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]
Copy of Conditional Transfer Order (Certified)5 sent via U.S. Mail to Nathan Bick (clw) [Transferred from Michigan Western on 8/30/2019.]
Related: [-]
CASE ELECTRONICALLY TRANSFERRED to Northern District of Florida (clw) [Transferred from Michigan Western on 8/30/2019.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 29, 2019
5 5 2 pgs order Order Fri 08/30 12:19 PM
CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation; certified copy received from Northern District of Florida; case transferred to Northern District of Florida under MDL No. 2734, IN RE: ABILIFY (ARIPIPRAZOLE) PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION (clw) [Transferred from Michigan Western on 8/30/2019.]
Related: [-]
4 4 2 pgs order Order Fri 08/30 12:15 PM
COPY of CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation directed to the Northern District of Florida regarding case to be transferred to the Multidistrict Litigation Panel under MDL No. 2734, IN RE: ABILIFY (ARIPIPRAZOLE) PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION (clw) [Transferred from Michigan Western on 8/30/2019.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 30, 2019
Copy of Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge3 sent via U.S. Mail to Nathan Bick (mg) [Transferred from Michigan Western on 8/30/2019.]
Related: [-]
Monday, July 29, 2019
3 3 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, sdb) [Transferred from Michigan Western on 8/30/2019.]
Related: [-]
Friday, July 26, 2019
2 2 NOTICE of receipt of case (mg) [Transferred from Michigan Western on 8/30/2019.]
Related: [-]
Copy of Receipt of Case Notice2 sent via U.S. Mail to Nathan Bick (mg) [Transferred from Michigan Western on 8/30/2019.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 25, 2019
1 1 COMPLAINT against Bristol-Myers Squibb filed by Nathan Bick (mg) [Transferred from Michigan Western on 8/30/2019.]
Related: [-]
RECEIPT: in the amount of $400, receipt number KZ003903; for Filing fee (mg) [Transferred from Michigan Western on 8/30/2019.]
Related: [-]
SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendant Bristol-Myers Squibb and returned to plaintiff at counter (mg) Modified text on 7/26/2019 (mg). [Transferred from Michigan Western on 8/30/2019.]
Related: [-]