Carickhoff v. Auxis Managed Solutions
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-12143
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-12143
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Christopher S Sontchi |
Case #: | 1:19-ap-50394 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Oct 04, 2019 |
Terminated: | Apr 08, 2020 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Auxis Managed Solutions
8151 Peters Road, Suite 3500
Fort Lauderdale, FL 33324 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David W. Carickhoff, solely in his capacity as Chapter 7 Trustee of Durafiber Technologies (DFT) Inc., et al.
Archer & Greiner, P.C. 300 Delaware Ave Suite 1100
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Wednesday, April 08, 2020 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Dismissal - Notice
Wed 04/08 1:23 PM
Notice of Dismissal Filed by David W. Carickhoff (Shaw, Kevin) |
|
court
Close Adversary Case
Wed 04/08 3:49 PM
Adversary Case 1:19-ap-50394 Closed (DMC) |
||
Monday, March 23, 2020 | ||
14 | 14
order
Approve Compromise Under Rule 9019
Mon 03/23 12:52 PM
ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENTS OF AVOIDANCE ACTIONS PURSUANT TO FED. R. BANKR. P. 9019 Order Signed on 3/23/2020. (DRG) |
|
13 | 13
notice
Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING RESCHEDULED) - Notice
Mon 03/23 11:21 AM
HEARING RESCHEDULED. Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing. Hearing Originally Scheduled for 3/26/2020 has been rescheduled. Filed by David W. Carickhoff. Hearing scheduled for 4/27/2020 at 02:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. (Shaw, Kevin) |
|
12 | 12
misc
Certificate of No Objection(Adv)
Mon 03/23 11:09 AM
Certificate of No Objection Regarding Chapter Trustee's First Omnibus Motion for an Order Approving Settlements of Avoidance Actions Filed by David W. Carickhoff. (Shaw, Kevin) |
|
Tuesday, March 03, 2020 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Status Report
Tue 03/03 11:33 AM
Status Report Filed by David W. Carickhoff. (Shaw, Kevin) |
|
Friday, February 28, 2020 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Approve Compromise Under Rule 9019 - Motion
Fri 02/28 11:53 AM
Omnibus Motion to Approve Compromise under Rule 9019 (First) Filed by David W. Carickhoff. Hearing scheduled for 3/26/2020 at 02:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 3/13/2020. (Shaw, Kevin) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Auxis Settlement Agreement | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Centrotrade Settlement Agreement | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Goulston Settlement Agreement | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Proposed Order | ||
Att: 5 Notice | ||
Att: 6 Certificate of Service | ||
Tuesday, January 21, 2020 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED) - Notice
Tue 01/21 3:08 PM
HEARING CANCELLED. Notice of Agenda of Matters not going forward. The following hearing has been cancelled. Filed by David W. Carickhoff. Hearing scheduled for 1/22/2020 at 11:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. (Shaw, Kevin) |
|
Friday, January 17, 2020 | ||
8 | 8
order
Scheduling Order
Fri 01/17 4:12 PM
Scheduling Order Signed on 1/17/2020 The case judge is Christopher S. Sontchi. (DMC) |
|
Thursday, January 02, 2020 | ||
7 | 7
answer
Answer to Complaint
Thu 01/02 2:30 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Auxis Managed Solutions Mediation due date: 05/1/2020. (Friedman, Brent) |
|
Monday, December 16, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED) - Notice
Mon 12/16 5:27 PM
HEARING CANCELLED. Notice of Agenda of Matters not going forward. The following hearing has been cancelled. Filed by David W. Carickhoff. Hearing scheduled for 12/18/2019 at 11:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. (Shaw, Kevin) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing - Notice (Multi)
Mon 12/16 11:26 AM
Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by David W. Carickhoff. Hearing scheduled for 12/18/2019 at 11:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. (Shaw, Kevin) |
|
Tuesday, December 03, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Stipulation
Tue 12/03 10:28 AM
Stipulation Between David W. Carickhoff and Auxis Managed Solutions Extending Time for Defendant to Answer, Move or Otherwise Plead . Filed by David W. Carickhoff. (Shaw, Kevin) |
|
Tuesday, November 05, 2019 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference
Tue 11/05 10:00 AM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Auxis Managed Solutions. Pretrial Conference set for 12/18/2019 at 11:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 1/6/2020. (Root, Alan) |
|
Monday, October 07, 2019 | ||
2 | 2
crditcrd
none
Mon 10/07 8:07 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 19-50394 CSS) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number Deferred, amount $ 350.00. (COH) |
|
Friday, October 04, 2019 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
RETIRED - Complaint
Fri 10/04 6:23 PM
Adversary case 19-50394 Complaint to Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 547, 548 and 550 and to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 502(d) by David W. Carickhoff against Auxis Managed Solutions. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). (Root, Alan) |