DuraFiber Technologies (DFT) Inc.
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Karen B Owens |
Case #: | 1:17-bk-12143 |
Case Filed: | Oct 06, 2017 |
Creditor Meeting: | Nov 03, 2017 |
Claims Deadline: | Mar 26, 2018 |
Debtor
DuraFiber Technologies (DFT) Inc.
13620 Reese Blvd E Ste 400
Huntersville, NC 28078-6415 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Trustee
David W. Carickhoff
Archer & Greiner, P.C. 300 Delaware Av Suite 1100
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
Represented By
|
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/24/2024 9:19 AM EDT |
Friday, October 06, 2017 | ||
court
Case Assigned
Fri 10/06 12:21 PM
Judge Christopher S. Sontchi added to case. (AK) |
||
1 | 1
14
pgs
misc
RETIRED - Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)
Fri 10/06 12:03 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition. Amount Paid $335. Filed by DuraFiber Technologies (DFT) Inc.. (Pacitti, Domenic) |
|
2 | 2
court
VAN-313 Notice Regarding Deficient Filings
Fri 10/06 2:02 PM
**CURED** - 10/6/2017. SEE DOCKETS 3 and 4. Notice Regarding Deficient Filings ~ Must upload creditor matrix & list of creditors due by 10/10/2017. Must Submit Disclosure of Compensation, Schedules A,B,D,E,F,G,H, Summary of Schedules, Declaration Concerning the Debtor's Schedules, Statement of Financial Affairs & Declaration All due by 10/20/2017. (COH) Modified on 10/10/2017 (DMC) |
|
3 | 3
547
pgs
misc
Schedules/Statements
Fri 10/06 5:22 PM
Schedules/Statements filed: Sch A-B, Sch D, Sch E-F, Sch G, Sch H, , Sum of Assets and Liabilities, Decl Concerning Debtors Schs,. Filed by DuraFiber Technologies (DFT) Inc.. (Pacitti, Domenic) |
|
4 | 4
233
pgs
misc
Schedules/Statements
Fri 10/06 5:25 PM
Schedules/Statements filed: , Stmt of Financial Affairs,. Filed by DuraFiber Technologies (DFT) Inc.. (Pacitti, Domenic) |
|
5 | 5
crditcrd
none
Fri 10/06 5:52 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) 17-12143 [misc,volp7] ( 335.00). Receipt Number 8612632, amount $ 335.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
6 | 6
misc
Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor - Rule 2016(b)
Fri 10/06 6:13 PM
Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor - Rule 2016(b) Filed by DuraFiber Technologies (DFT) Inc.. (Pacitti, Domenic) |