Carickhoff v. Papa
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-12143
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-12143
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Christopher S Sontchi |
Case #: | 1:19-ap-50398 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Oct 04, 2019 |
Terminated: | Mar 31, 2021 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Frank Papa
103 Avenue of the Estates
Cary, NC 27518 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David W. Carickhoff, solely in his capacity as Chapter 7 Trustee of Durafiber Technologies (DFT) Inc., et al.
Archer & Greiner, P.C. 300 Delaware Ave Suite 1100
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Wednesday, March 31, 2021 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Wed 03/31 9:16 AM
Adversary Case 1:19-ap-50398 Closed (Murin, Leslie) |
||
Tuesday, March 30, 2021 | ||
38 | 38
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Tue 03/30 4:19 PM
Stipulation of Dismissal Filed by David W. Carickhoff. (Root, Alan) |
|
Friday, February 26, 2021 | ||
37 | 37
notice
Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED) - Notice
Fri 02/26 4:47 PM
HEARING CANCELLED. Notice of Agenda of Matters not going forward. The following hearing has been cancelled. Filed by David W. Carickhoff. Hearing scheduled for 3/10/2021 at 11:15 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. (Root, Alan) |
|
Monday, February 22, 2021 | ||
36 | 36
order
Approve Compromise Under Rule 9019
Mon 02/22 9:11 AM
ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT OF MEDIATED CLAIMS AGAINST ERWIN BETTE AND FRANK PAPA PURSUANT TO FED. R. BANKR. P. 9019 Order Signed on 2/22/2021. (DRG) |
|
Friday, February 19, 2021 | ||
35 | 35
misc
Certificate of No Objection(Multi)
Fri 02/19 5:49 PM
Certificate of No Objection Regarding Chapter 7 Trustee's Motion for an Order Approving Settlement of Mediated Claims Against Erwin Bette and Frank Papa Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 9019. Filed by David W. Carickhoff. (Root, Alan) |
|
Thursday, January 28, 2021 | ||
34 | 34
motion
Approve Compromise Under Rule 9019 - Motion
Thu 01/28 2:46 PM
Motion to Approve Compromise under Rule 9019 : Chapter 7 Trustee's Motion for an Order Approving Settlement of Mediated Claims Against Erwin Bette and Frank Papa Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 9019. Filed by David W. Carickhoff. Hearing scheduled for 3/10/2021 at 11:15 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 2/18/2021. (Root, Alan) |
|
Wednesday, December 16, 2020 | ||
33 | 33
mediation
Mediator's Certificate of Completion
Wed 12/16 2:15 PM
Mediator's Certificate of Completion (Ward, Christopher) |
|
Tuesday, December 15, 2020 | ||
32 | 32
court
Mediator Report Past Due
Tue 12/15 11:00 PM
Mediator Report Past Due (ADI) |
|
Friday, October 23, 2020 | ||
31 | 31
2
pgs
order
Order
Fri 10/23 12:44 PM
ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIMETO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT Order Signed on 10/23/2020. (CAS) |
|
30 | 30
3
pgs
order
Order
Fri 10/23 12:43 PM
SECOND AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER Order Signed on 10/23/2020. (CAS) |
|
Thursday, October 22, 2020 | ||
29 | 29
misc
Certification of Counsel(Adv)
Thu 10/22 4:56 PM
Certification of Counsel Submitting Stipulation and Proposed Order for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to First Amended Complaint Filed by David W. Carickhoff. (Root, Alan) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A: Stipulation | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B: Proposed Form of Order | ||
28 | 28
misc
Certification of Counsel for Approval of Proposed Scheduling Order
Thu 10/22 4:50 PM
Certification of Counsel for Approval of Proposed Scheduling Order Filed by David W. Carickhoff. (Root, Alan) |
|
Thursday, October 08, 2020 | ||
27 | 27
misc
Status Report
Thu 10/08 6:19 PM
Status Report : Trustee's Fourth Status Report. Filed by David W. Carickhoff. (Root, Alan) |
|
Thursday, September 24, 2020 | ||
26 | 26
cmp
Amended Complaint
Thu 09/24 1:37 PM
Amended Complaint to Add Count Filed by David W. Carickhoff (Root, Alan) |
|
Wednesday, September 23, 2020 | ||
25 | 25
2
pgs
order
Order
Wed 09/23 12:51 PM
ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION AUTHORIZINGPLAINTIFF TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT Order Signed on 9/23/2020. (CAS) |
|
Wednesday, September 16, 2020 | ||
24 | 24
mediation
Mediation Status Report
Wed 09/16 12:12 PM
Mediation Status Report (Ward, Christopher) |
|
Tuesday, September 15, 2020 | ||
23 | 23
court
Mediator Report Past Due
Tue 09/15 11:00 PM
Mediator Report Past Due (ADI) |
|
22 | 22
motion
Stipulation
Tue 09/15 4:24 PM
Stipulation Authorizing Plaintiff to File First Amended Complaint. Between David W. Carickhoff and Defendant, Frank Papa . Filed by David W. Carickhoff. (Root, Alan) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A: Proposed First Amended Complaint | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Form of Order | ||
Monday, August 24, 2020 | ||
21 | 21
misc
Status Report
Mon 08/24 1:30 PM
Status Report Trustee's Third Status Report Filed by David W. Carickhoff. (Shaw, Kevin) |
|
Thursday, July 09, 2020 | ||
20 | 20
3
pgs
order
Order
Thu 07/09 6:03 AM
AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER Order Signed on 7/9/2020. (CAS) |
|
Wednesday, July 08, 2020 | ||
19 | 19
misc
Certification of Counsel for Approval of Proposed Scheduling Order
Wed 07/08 11:58 AM
Certification of Counsel for Approval of Proposed Scheduling Order Filed by David W. Carickhoff. (Shaw, Kevin) |
|
Wednesday, July 01, 2020 | ||
18 | 18
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Thu 07/02 12:49 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Notice Date 07/01/2020. (Admin.) |
|
Monday, June 29, 2020 | ||
17 | 17
court
VAN-447 Order Assigning Adversary Proceeding to Mediation (Alternate)
Mon 06/29 4:12 PM
Order Assigning Adversary Proceeding to Mediation. Christopher Ward, Esquire is Appointed as the Mediator in this Adversary Proceeding. Trial Date to be Determined. Mediation Report due by 8/31/2020. Signed on 6/29/2020. (DMC) |
|
utility
Reopen AP Case
Mon 06/29 4:05 PM
Adversary Case Reopened. (DMC) |
||
Friday, June 26, 2020 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Fri 06/26 8:29 AM
Adversary Case 1:19-ap-50398 Closed (Murin, Leslie) |
||
Thursday, June 25, 2020 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Stipulation Regarding Appointment of Mediator
Thu 06/25 3:23 PM
Stipulation Regarding Appointment of Mediator Between David W. Carickhoff, as Trustee and Frank Papa . Filed by David W. Carickhoff. (Root, Alan) |
|
Tuesday, May 26, 2020 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Status Report
Tue 05/26 6:47 PM
Status Report Trustee's Second Status Report Filed by David W. Carickhoff. (Shaw, Kevin) |
|
Monday, April 13, 2020 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Status Report
Mon 04/13 5:02 PM
Status Report Filed by David W. Carickhoff. (Shaw, Kevin) |
|
Wednesday, April 08, 2020 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Service
Wed 04/08 4:02 PM
Notice of Service of Initial Disclosures Filed by David W. Carickhoff (Shaw, Kevin) |
|
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Service
Wed 04/08 3:36 PM
Notice of Service of Initial Disclosures of Frank Papa Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) and Fed. R. Bankr. P. 7026 Filed by Frank Papa (McNeill, R. Stephen) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Thursday, February 27, 2020 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED) - Notice
Thu 02/27 12:59 PM
HEARING CANCELLED. Notice of Agenda of Matters not going forward. The following hearing has been cancelled. Filed by David W. Carickhoff. Hearing scheduled for 2/28/2020 at 02:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. (Shaw, Kevin) |
|
Wednesday, February 26, 2020 | ||
10 | 10
order
Scheduling Order
Wed 02/26 2:48 PM
Scheduling Order. Signed on 2/26/2020. (Murin, Leslie) |
|
9 | 9
notice
Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing - Notice (Multi)
Wed 02/26 9:29 AM
Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by David W. Carickhoff. Hearing scheduled for 2/28/2020 at 02:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. (Shaw, Kevin) |
|
Monday, February 03, 2020 | ||
8 | 8
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 02/03 5:00 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Frank Papa Mediation due date: 06/2/2020.(McNeill, R. Stephen) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Friday, January 10, 2020 | ||
7 | 7
2
pgs
order
Order
Fri 01/10 4:15 PM
Order Approving Stipulation For Extension of Time To Answer or Otherwise Respond To Complaint. Order Signed on 1/10/2020. (DMC) |
|
Friday, January 03, 2020 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Certification of Counsel(Adv)
Fri 01/03 5:42 PM
Certification of Counsel Submitting Stipulation and Proposed Order for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint Filed by Frank Papa. (McNeill, R. Stephen) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B | ||
Monday, December 16, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED) - Notice
Mon 12/16 5:27 PM
HEARING CANCELLED. Notice of Agenda of Matters not going forward. The following hearing has been cancelled. Filed by David W. Carickhoff. Hearing scheduled for 12/18/2019 at 11:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. (Shaw, Kevin) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing - Notice (Multi)
Mon 12/16 11:26 AM
Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by David W. Carickhoff. Hearing scheduled for 12/18/2019 at 11:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. (Shaw, Kevin) |
|
Tuesday, November 05, 2019 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference
Tue 11/05 10:19 AM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Frank Papa. Pretrial Conference set for 12/18/2019 at 11:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 1/6/2020. (Root, Alan) |
|
Monday, October 07, 2019 | ||
2 | 2
crditcrd
none
Mon 10/07 8:07 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 19-50398 CSS) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number Deferred, amount $ 350.00. (COH) |
|
Friday, October 04, 2019 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
RETIRED - Complaint
Fri 10/04 6:47 PM
Adversary case 19-50398 Complaint to Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 547, 548 and 550 and to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 502(d) by David W. Carickhoff against Frank Papa. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). (Root, Alan) |