Carickhoff v. Geodis Logistics LLC
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-12143
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-12143
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Christopher S Sontchi |
Case #: | 1:19-ap-50399 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Oct 04, 2019 |
Terminated: | Jan 12, 2021 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Geodis Logistics LLC
15604 Collections Center Drive
Chicago, IL 60693 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David W. Carickhoff, solely in his capacity as Chapter 7 Trustee of Durafiber Technologies (DFT) Inc., et al.
Archer & Greiner, P.C. 300 Delaware Ave Suite 1100
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Tuesday, January 12, 2021 | ||
20 | 20
notice
Dismissal - Notice
Tue 01/12 1:09 PM
Notice of Dismissal Filed by David W. Carickhoff (Root, Alan) |
|
court
Close Adversary Case
Tue 01/12 4:25 PM
Adversary Case 1:19-ap-50399 Closed. (FMo) |
||
Tuesday, July 21, 2020 | ||
19 | 19
notice
Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED) - Notice
Tue 07/21 11:23 AM
HEARING CANCELLED. Notice of Agenda of Matters not going forward. The following hearing has been cancelled. Filed by David W. Carickhoff. Hearing scheduled for 7/23/2020 at 11:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. (Shaw, Kevin) |
|
18 | 18
order
Approve Compromise Under Rule 9019
Tue 07/21 10:28 AM
ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENTS OF AVOIDANCE ACTIONS PURSUANT TO FED. R. BANKR. P. 9019 Order Signed on 7/21/2020. (DRG) |
|
Monday, July 20, 2020 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Certificate of No Objection(Multi)
Mon 07/20 4:22 PM
Certificate of No Objection Regarding Chapter 7 Trustee's Second Omnibus Motion for an Order Approving Settlements of Avoidance Actions Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 9019. Filed by David W. Carickhoff. (Root, Alan) |
|
Monday, June 22, 2020 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Rescheduled Hearing - Notice
Mon 06/22 11:00 AM
Notice of Rescheduled Hearing : Notice of Rescheduled Hearing on Chapter 7 Trustee's Second Omnibus Motion for an Order Approving Settlements of Avoidance Actions Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 9019. Hearing Originally Scheduled for July 24, 2020 has been rescheduled. Filed by David W. Carickhoff. Hearing scheduled for 7/23/2020 at 11:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 7/17/2020. (Shaw, Kevin) |
|
Wednesday, June 17, 2020 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Approve Compromise Under Rule 9019 - Motion
Wed 06/17 2:40 PM
Motion to Approve Compromise under Rule 9019 : Chapter 7 Trustee's Second Omnibus Motion for an Order Approving Settlements of Avoidance Actions Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. 9019. Filed by David W. Carickhoff. Hearing scheduled for 7/24/2020 at 11:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 7/17/2020. (Shaw, Kevin) |
|
Friday, April 03, 2020 | ||
14 | 14
2
pgs
order
Order
Fri 04/03 5:13 PM
ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION GRANTING DEFENDANT ANEXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER, MOVE, OR OTHERWISE PLEAD Order Order Signed on 4/3/2020. (CAS) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Stipulation | ||
13 | 13
misc
Certification of Counsel(Adv)
Fri 04/03 3:30 PM
Certification of Counsel Regarding Order Approving Stipulation Granting Defendant an Extension of Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Plead Filed by Geodis Logistics LLC. (Murley, Lucian) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, March 19, 2020 | ||
12 | 12
2
pgs
order
Order
Thu 03/19 2:56 PM
ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION GRANTING DEFENDANT ANEXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER, MOVE, OR OTHERWISE PLEAD Order Signed on 3/19/2020. (CAS) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Stipulation | ||
Wednesday, March 04, 2020 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Certification of Counsel(Adv)
Wed 03/04 3:11 PM
Certification of Counsel Regarding Order Approving Stipulation Granting Defendant an Extension of Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Plead Filed by Geodis Logistics LLC. (Murley, Lucian) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order | ||
Monday, February 03, 2020 | ||
10 | 10
order
Stipulation
Mon 02/03 9:47 AM
ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION GRANTING DEFENDANT AN EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER, MOVE, OR OTHERWISE PLEAD Signed on 2/3/2020. (DRG) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Stipulation | ||
Friday, January 31, 2020 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Certification of Counsel(Adv)
Fri 01/31 1:35 PM
Certification of Counsel Regarding Order Approving Stipulation Granting Defendant an Extension of Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Plead Filed by Geodis Logistics LLC. (Murley, Lucian) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, January 02, 2020 | ||
8 | 8
2
pgs
order
Order
Thu 01/02 3:51 PM
ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION GRANTING DEFENDANT ANEXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER, MOVE, OR OTHERWISE PLEAD Order Signed on 1/2/2020. (CAS) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Stipulation | ||
7 | 7
misc
Certification of Counsel(Adv)
Thu 01/02 1:58 PM
Certification of Counsel Regarding Order Approving Stipulation Granting Defendant an Extension of Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Plead Filed by Geodis Logistics LLC. (Murley, Lucian) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order | ||
Monday, December 16, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED) - Notice
Mon 12/16 5:27 PM
HEARING CANCELLED. Notice of Agenda of Matters not going forward. The following hearing has been cancelled. Filed by David W. Carickhoff. Hearing scheduled for 12/18/2019 at 11:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. (Shaw, Kevin) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing - Notice (Multi)
Mon 12/16 11:26 AM
Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by David W. Carickhoff. Hearing scheduled for 12/18/2019 at 11:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. (Shaw, Kevin) |
|
Thursday, November 21, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Stipulation
Thu 11/21 4:28 PM
Stipulation Between David W. Carickhoff and Geodis Logistics LLC Granting Defendant an Extension of Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Plead . Filed by David W. Carickhoff. (Shaw, Kevin) |
|
Tuesday, November 05, 2019 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference
Tue 11/05 10:20 AM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Geodis Logistics LLC. Pretrial Conference set for 12/18/2019 at 11:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 1/6/2020. (Root, Alan) |
|
Monday, October 07, 2019 | ||
2 | 2
crditcrd
none
Mon 10/07 8:07 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 19-50399 CSS) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number Deferred, amount $ 350.00. (COH) |
|
Friday, October 04, 2019 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
RETIRED - Complaint
Fri 10/04 6:50 PM
Adversary case 19-50399 Complaint to Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 547, 548 and 550 and to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 502(d) by David W. Carickhoff against Geodis Logistics LLC. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). (Root, Alan) |