Carickhoff v. Goulston Technologies Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-12143
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-12143
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Christopher S Sontchi |
Case #: | 1:19-ap-50401 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Oct 04, 2019 |
Terminated: | Apr 08, 2020 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Goulston Technologies Inc.
700 North Johnson Street
Monroe, NC 28110 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David W. Carickhoff, solely in his capacity as Chapter 7 Trustee of Durafiber Technologies (DFT) Inc., et al.
Archer & Greiner, P.C. 300 Delaware Ave Suite 1100
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Wednesday, April 08, 2020 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Dismissal - Notice
Wed 04/08 1:25 PM
Notice of Dismissal Filed by David W. Carickhoff (Shaw, Kevin) |
|
court
Close Adversary Case
Wed 04/08 3:55 PM
Adversary Case 1:19-ap-50401 Closed (DMC) |
||
Monday, March 23, 2020 | ||
11 | 11
order
Approve Compromise Under Rule 9019
Mon 03/23 12:59 PM
ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENTS OF AVOIDANCE ACTIONS PURSUANT TO FED. R. BANKR. P. 9019 Order Signed on 3/23/2020. (DRG) |
|
10 | 10
notice
Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING RESCHEDULED) - Notice
Mon 03/23 11:19 AM
HEARING RESCHEDULED. Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing. Hearing Originally Scheduled for 3/26/2020 has been rescheduled. Filed by David W. Carickhoff. Hearing scheduled for 4/27/2020 at 02:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. (Shaw, Kevin) |
|
9 | 9
misc
Certificate of No Objection(Adv)
Mon 03/23 11:10 AM
Certificate of No Objection Regarding Chapter 7 Trustee's First Omnibus Motion for an Order Approving Settlements of Avoidance Actions Filed by David W. Carickhoff. (Shaw, Kevin) |
|
Friday, February 28, 2020 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Approve Compromise Under Rule 9019 - Motion
Fri 02/28 12:01 PM
Omnibus Motion to Approve Compromise under Rule 9019 (First) Filed by David W. Carickhoff. Hearing scheduled for 3/26/2020 at 02:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 3/13/2020. (Shaw, Kevin) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Auxis Settlement Agreement | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Centrotrade Settlement Agreement | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Goulston Settlement Agreement | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Proposed Order | ||
Att: 5 Notice | ||
Att: 6 Certificate of Service | ||
Tuesday, December 31, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 12/31 12:39 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Goulston Technologies Inc. Mediation due date: 04/29/2020.(Schanne, John) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Monday, December 16, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED) - Notice
Mon 12/16 5:27 PM
HEARING CANCELLED. Notice of Agenda of Matters not going forward. The following hearing has been cancelled. Filed by David W. Carickhoff. Hearing scheduled for 12/18/2019 at 11:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. (Shaw, Kevin) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing - Notice (Multi)
Mon 12/16 11:26 AM
Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by David W. Carickhoff. Hearing scheduled for 12/18/2019 at 11:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. (Shaw, Kevin) |
|
Monday, December 02, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Stipulation
Mon 12/02 3:50 PM
Stipulation Between David W. Carickhoff and Goulston Technologies Inc. : Stipulation Granting Defendant an Extension of Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Plead. . Filed by David W. Carickhoff . (Root, Alan) |
|
Tuesday, November 05, 2019 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference
Tue 11/05 10:23 AM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Goulston Technologies Inc.. Pretrial Conference set for 12/18/2019 at 11:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 1/6/2020. (Root, Alan) |
|
Monday, October 07, 2019 | ||
2 | 2
crditcrd
none
Mon 10/07 8:07 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 19-50401 CSS) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number Deferred, amount $ 350.00. (COH) |
|
Friday, October 04, 2019 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
RETIRED - Complaint
Fri 10/04 6:57 PM
Adversary case 19-50401 Complaint to Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 547, 548 and 550 and to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 502(d) by David W. Carickhoff against Goulston Technologies Inc.. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). (Root, Alan) |