Carickhoff v. Indorama Ventures PTA Montreal LP
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-12143
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-12143
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Christopher S Sontchi |
Case #: | 1:19-ap-50403 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Oct 04, 2019 |
Terminated: | Jan 15, 2021 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Indorama Ventures PTA Montreal LP, a/k/a Company Indorama PTA Montreal SEC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David W. Carickhoff, solely in his capacity as Chapter 7 Trustee of Durafiber Technologies (DFT) Inc., et al.
Archer & Greiner, P.C. 300 Delaware Ave Suite 1100
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Friday, January 15, 2021 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Fri 01/15 8:31 AM
Adversary Case 1:19-ap-50403 Closed (DMC) |
||
Thursday, January 14, 2021 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Dismissal - Notice
Thu 01/14 12:13 PM
Notice of Dismissal Filed by David W. Carickhoff (Root, Alan) |
|
Tuesday, October 06, 2020 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED) - Notice
Tue 10/06 1:28 PM
HEARING CANCELLED. Notice of Agenda of Matters not going forward. The following hearing has been cancelled. Filed by David W. Carickhoff. Hearing scheduled for 10/15/2020 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. (Root, Alan) |
|
13 | 13
order
Approve Compromise Under Rule 9019
Tue 10/06 9:19 AM
ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT OF ESTATE CLAIMS AGAINST INDORAMA ENTITIES PURSUANT TO FED. R. BANKR. P. 9019 Order Signed on 10/6/2020. (DRG) |
|
Monday, October 05, 2020 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Certificate of No Objection(Multi)
Mon 10/05 4:53 PM
Certificate of No Objection Regarding Chapter 7 Trustee's Motion for an Order Approving Settlement of Estate Claims Against Indorama Entities Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 9019. Filed by David W. Carickhoff. (Root, Alan) |
|
Wednesday, September 09, 2020 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Approve Compromise Under Rule 9019 - Motion
Wed 09/09 1:32 PM
Motion to Approve Compromise under Rule 9019 : Chapter 7 Trustee's Motion for an Order Approving Settlement of Estate Claims Against Indorama Entities Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 9019. Filed by David W. Carickhoff. Hearing scheduled for 10/15/2020 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 10/1/2020. (Root, Alan) |
|
Monday, June 08, 2020 | ||
10 | 10
6
pgs
order
Order
Mon 06/08 9:01 AM
ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF ANEXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE COMPLAINT Order Signed on 6/8/2020. (CAS) |
|
Friday, June 05, 2020 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Certification of Counsel(Adv)
Fri 06/05 3:05 PM
Certification of Counsel Regarding Stipulation Granting Plaintiff an Extension of Time to Serve Complaint. Filed by David W. Carickhoff. (Root, Alan) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A: Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, May 06, 2020 | ||
8 | 8
6
pgs
order
Order
Wed 05/06 4:26 PM
ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF ANEXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE COMPLAINT Order Signed on 5/6/2020. (CAS) |
|
7 | 7
misc
Certification of Counsel(Adv)
Wed 05/06 11:19 AM
Certification of Counsel Regarding Stipulation Granting Plaintiff an Extension of Time to Serve Complaint. Filed by David W. Carickhoff. (Root, Alan) |
|
Monday, April 06, 2020 | ||
6 | 6
6
pgs
order
Order
Mon 04/06 2:49 PM
ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF ANEXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE COMPLAINT Order Signed on 4/6/2020. (CAS) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Certification of Counsel(Adv)
Mon 04/06 12:44 PM
Certification of Counsel Regarding Stipulation Granting Plaintiff an Extension of Time to Serve Complaint. Filed by David W. Carickhoff. (Root, Alan) |
|
Friday, January 10, 2020 | ||
4 | 4
6
pgs
order
Order
Fri 01/10 12:26 PM
ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF AN EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE COMPLAINT Order Signed on 1/10/2020. (DRG) |
|
Thursday, January 02, 2020 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Certification of Counsel(Adv)
Thu 01/02 4:03 PM
Certification of Counsel Regarding Stipulation Granting Plaintiff an Extension of Time to Serve Complaint. Filed by David W. Carickhoff. (Root, Alan) |
|
Monday, October 07, 2019 | ||
2 | 2
crditcrd
none
Mon 10/07 8:07 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 19-50403 CSS) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number Deferred, amount $ 350.00. (COH) |
|
Friday, October 04, 2019 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
RETIRED - Complaint
Fri 10/04 7:25 PM
Adversary case 19-50403 Complaint to Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 547, 548 and 550 and to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 502(d) by David W. Carickhoff against Indorama Ventures PTA Montreal LP. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). (Root, Alan) |