Carickhoff v. Piedmont Natural Gas Co.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-12143
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-12143
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Christopher S Sontchi |
Case #: | 1:19-ap-50406 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Oct 04, 2019 |
Terminated: | Mar 11, 2021 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Piedmont Natural Gas Co.
1720 Piedmont Row Drive
Charlotte, NC 28210 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David W. Carickhoff, solely in his capacity as Chapter 7 Trustee of Durafiber Technologies (DFT) Inc., et al.
Archer & Greiner, P.C. 300 Delaware Ave Suite 1100
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Thursday, March 11, 2021 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Thu 03/11 10:58 AM
Adversary Case 1:19-ap-50406 Closed. (FMo) |
||
Wednesday, March 10, 2021 | ||
21 | 21
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Wed 03/10 4:15 PM
Stipulation of Dismissal Filed by David W. Carickhoff. (Root, Alan) |
|
Friday, February 26, 2021 | ||
20 | 20
notice
Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED) - Notice
Fri 02/26 4:47 PM
HEARING CANCELLED. Notice of Agenda of Matters not going forward. The following hearing has been cancelled. Filed by David W. Carickhoff. Hearing scheduled for 3/10/2021 at 11:15 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. (Root, Alan) |
|
Monday, February 22, 2021 | ||
19 | 19
order
Approve Compromise Under Rule 9019
Mon 02/22 9:16 AM
RDER APPROVING SETTLEMENTS WITH DUKE ENERGY CAROLINAS, LLC AND PIEDMONT NATURAL GAS CO. PURSUANT TO FED. R. BANKR. P. 9019 Order Signed on 2/22/2021. (DRG) |
|
Friday, February 19, 2021 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Certificate of No Objection(Multi)
Fri 02/19 5:53 PM
Certificate of No Objection Regarding Chapter 7 Trustee's Motion for an Order Approving Settlements with Duke Energy Carolinas, LLC and Piedmont Natural Gas Co. Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 9019. Filed by David W. Carickhoff. (Root, Alan) |
|
Tuesday, February 02, 2021 | ||
17 | 17
motion
Approve Compromise Under Rule 9019 - Motion
Tue 02/02 9:17 AM
Motion to Approve Compromise under Rule 9019 : Chapter 7 Trustee's Motion for an Order Approving Settlements with Duke Energy Carolinas, LLC and Piedmont Natural Gas Co. Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 9019. Filed by David W. Carickhoff. Hearing scheduled for 3/10/2021 at 11:15 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 2/18/2021. (Root, Alan) |
|
Friday, December 11, 2020 | ||
16 | 16
mediation
Settled Prior to Mediation
Fri 12/11 9:54 AM
Mediator's Certification After Appointment Indicating Parties Have Settled Prior to Mediation Services Being Rendered. Parties Shall File Settlement Document(s) and/or Notice of Dismissal with the Court Settlement due by: 02/9/2021. (Brown, Charles) |
|
Wednesday, December 02, 2020 | ||
15 | 15
mediation
Mediation Status Report
Wed 12/02 10:26 AM
Mediation Status Report (Brown, Charles) |
|
Tuesday, November 17, 2020 | ||
14 | 14
mediation
Mediation Status Report
Tue 11/17 12:17 PM
Mediation Status Report (Brown, Charles) |
|
Sunday, November 15, 2020 | ||
13 | 13
court
Mediator Report Past Due
Sun 11/15 11:00 PM
Mediator Report Past Due (ADI) |
|
Tuesday, September 15, 2020 | ||
12 | 12
court
Mediator Report Past Due
Tue 09/15 11:00 PM
Mediator Report Past Due (ADI) |
|
Thursday, June 25, 2020 | ||
11 | 11
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Fri 06/26 12:53 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Notice Date 06/25/2020. (Admin.) |
|
Tuesday, June 23, 2020 | ||
10 | 10
court
VAN-416 Order Assigning Adversary Proceeding to Mediation
Tue 06/23 4:17 PM
Order Assigning Adversary Proceeding to Mediation and Setting Mediation Deadlines. Charles Brown, Esquire is Appointed as the Mediator in this Adversary Proceeding. Trial Date to be Determined. Mediation Report due by 8/24/2020. Signed on 6/23/2020. (DMC) |
|
Wednesday, February 26, 2020 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING RESCHEDULED) - Notice
Wed 02/26 9:31 AM
HEARING RESCHEDULED. Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing. Hearing Originally Scheduled for February 28, 2020 at 2:00 P.M. has been rescheduled. Filed by David W. Carickhoff. Hearing scheduled for 3/26/2020 at 02:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. (Shaw, Kevin) |
|
Monday, February 17, 2020 | ||
8 | 8
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 02/17 12:11 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Piedmont Natural Gas Co. Mediation due date: 06/16/2020.(Phillips, Marc) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Thursday, January 23, 2020 | ||
7 | 7
2
pgs
order
Order
Thu 01/23 3:19 PM
ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO COMPLAINT Order Signed on 1/23/2020. (DRG) |
|
6 | 6
misc
Certification of Counsel(Adv)
Thu 01/23 11:36 AM
Certification of Counsel Submitting Stipulation and Proposed Order for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint. Filed by David W. Carickhoff. (Root, Alan) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A: Stipulation | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B: Proposed Form of Order | ||
Monday, December 16, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED) - Notice
Mon 12/16 5:27 PM
HEARING CANCELLED. Notice of Agenda of Matters not going forward. The following hearing has been cancelled. Filed by David W. Carickhoff. Hearing scheduled for 12/18/2019 at 11:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. (Shaw, Kevin) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing - Notice (Multi)
Mon 12/16 11:26 AM
Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by David W. Carickhoff. Hearing scheduled for 12/18/2019 at 11:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. (Shaw, Kevin) |
|
Tuesday, November 05, 2019 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference
Tue 11/05 10:28 AM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Piedmont Natural Gas Co.. Pretrial Conference set for 12/18/2019 at 11:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 1/6/2020. (Root, Alan) |
|
Monday, October 07, 2019 | ||
2 | 2
crditcrd
none
Mon 10/07 8:07 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 19-50406 CSS) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number Deferred, amount $ 350.00. (COH) |
|
Friday, October 04, 2019 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
RETIRED - Complaint
Fri 10/04 7:35 PM
Adversary case 19-50406 Complaint to Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 547, 548 and 550 and to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 502(d) by David W. Carickhoff against Piedmont Natural Gas Co.. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). (Root, Alan) |