Carickhoff v. Taiji Group (USA) Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-12143
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-12143
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Christopher S Sontchi |
Case #: | 1:19-ap-50409 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Oct 04, 2019 |
Terminated: | Jul 30, 2021 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Taiji Group (USA) Inc.
405 Wortha Herman Road SW
Conover, NC 28316 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David W. Carickhoff, solely in his capacity as Chapter 7 Trustee of Durafiber Technologies (DFT) Inc., et al.
Archer & Greiner, P.C. 300 Delaware Ave Suite 1100
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Friday, July 30, 2021 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Fri 07/30 1:26 PM
Adversary Case 1:19-ap-50409 Closed (Murin, Leslie) |
||
Thursday, July 29, 2021 | ||
29 | 29
notice
Dismissal - Notice
Thu 07/29 4:06 PM
Notice of Dismissal Filed by David W. Carickhoff (Root, Alan) |
|
Tuesday, April 06, 2021 | ||
28 | 28
notice
Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED) - Notice
Tue 04/06 6:50 PM
HEARING CANCELLED. Notice of Agenda of Matters not going forward. The following hearing has been cancelled. Filed by David W. Carickhoff. Hearing scheduled for 4/14/2021 at 12:30 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. (Root, Alan) |
|
27 | 27
order
Approve Compromise Under Rule 9019
Tue 04/06 3:10 PM
ORDER APPROVING CHAPTER 7 TRUSTEES FOURTH OMNIBUS MOTION FOR AN ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENTS OF CHAPTER 5 CAUSES OF ACTION PURSUANT TO FED. R. BANKR. P. 9019 Order Signed on 4/6/2021. (DRG) Modified on 4/6/2021 (DRG) |
|
26 | 26
misc
Certificate of No Objection(Multi)
Tue 04/06 10:22 AM
Certificate of No Objection Regarding Chapter 7 Trustee's Fourth Omnibus Motion for an Order Approving Settlements of Chapter 5 Causes of Action Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 9019. Filed by David W. Carickhoff. (Root, Alan) |
|
Thursday, March 11, 2021 | ||
25 | 25
motion
Approve Compromise Under Rule 9019 - Motion
Thu 03/11 4:48 PM
Motion to Approve Compromise under Rule 9019 : Chapter 7 Trustee's Fourth Omnibus Motion for an Order Approving Settlements of Chapter 5 Causes of Action Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 9019. Filed by David W. Carickhoff. Hearing scheduled for 4/14/2021 at 12:30 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 4/1/2021. (Root, Alan) |
|
Monday, February 15, 2021 | ||
24 | 24
court
Mediator Report Past Due
Mon 02/15 11:00 PM
Mediator Report Past Due (ADI) |
|
Tuesday, January 19, 2021 | ||
23 | 23
mediation
Settled Prior to Mediation
Tue 01/19 10:58 AM
Mediator's Certification After Appointment Indicating Parties Have Settled Prior to Mediation Services Being Rendered. Parties Shall File Settlement Document(s) and/or Notice of Dismissal with the Court Settlement due by: 03/22/2021. (Brown, Charles) |
|
Friday, January 15, 2021 | ||
22 | 22
court
Mediator Report Past Due
Fri 01/15 11:00 PM
Mediator Report Past Due (ADI) |
|
Sunday, November 15, 2020 | ||
21 | 21
court
Mediator Report Past Due
Sun 11/15 11:00 PM
Mediator Report Past Due (ADI) |
|
Tuesday, September 15, 2020 | ||
20 | 20
court
Mediator Report Past Due
Tue 09/15 11:00 PM
Mediator Report Past Due (ADI) |
|
Thursday, August 27, 2020 | ||
19 | 19
misc
Status Report
Thu 08/27 10:47 AM
Status Report Fourth Status Report With Respect to Certain Adversary Proceedings Filed by David W. Carickhoff. (Shaw, Kevin) |
|
Saturday, August 15, 2020 | ||
18 | 18
court
Mediator Report Past Due
Sat 08/15 11:00 PM
Mediator Report Past Due (ADI) |
|
Monday, July 13, 2020 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Status Report
Mon 07/13 1:43 PM
Status Report : Fourth Status Report with Respect to Certain Adversary Matters. Filed by David W. Carickhoff. (Shaw, Kevin) |
|
Thursday, May 28, 2020 | ||
16 | 16
3
pgs
order
Order
Thu 05/28 2:08 PM
AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER Order Signed on 5/28/2020. (CAS) |
|
Wednesday, May 27, 2020 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Certification of Counsel(Aty)
Wed 05/27 6:30 PM
Certification of Counsel Regarding Amended Scheduling Order. Filed by David W. Carickhoff. (Shaw, Kevin) |
|
Friday, May 22, 2020 | ||
14 | 14
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Sat 05/23 12:42 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Notice Date 05/22/2020. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, May 20, 2020 | ||
13 | 13
court
VAN-447 Order Assigning Adversary Proceeding to Mediation (Alternate)
Wed 05/20 2:54 PM
Order Assigning Adversary Proceeding to Mediation. Charles Brown, Esquire is Appointed as the Mediator in this Adversary Proceeding. Trial Date to be Determined. Mediation Report due by 7/20/2020. Signed on 5/20/2020. (DMC) |
|
Thursday, April 16, 2020 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Status Report
Thu 04/16 12:00 PM
Status Report Filed by David W. Carickhoff. (Shaw, Kevin) |
|
Tuesday, March 03, 2020 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Status Report
Tue 03/03 11:33 AM
Status Report Filed by David W. Carickhoff. (Shaw, Kevin) |
|
Monday, March 02, 2020 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Service
Mon 03/02 3:49 PM
Notice of Service of Initial Disclosures Filed by David W. Carickhoff (Shaw, Kevin) |
|
Tuesday, January 21, 2020 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED) - Notice
Tue 01/21 3:08 PM
HEARING CANCELLED. Notice of Agenda of Matters not going forward. The following hearing has been cancelled. Filed by David W. Carickhoff. Hearing scheduled for 1/22/2020 at 11:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. (Shaw, Kevin) |
|
Friday, January 17, 2020 | ||
8 | 8
order
Scheduling Order
Fri 01/17 4:12 PM
Scheduling Order Signed on 1/17/2020 The case judge is Christopher S. Sontchi. (DMC) |
|
Tuesday, January 14, 2020 | ||
utility
Reopen AP Case
Tue 01/14 3:16 PM
Adversary Case Reopened. Closed in Error. (Murin, Leslie) |
||
Tuesday, January 07, 2020 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Tue 01/07 9:13 AM
Adversary Case 1:19-ap-50409 Closed (Murin, Leslie) |
||
Monday, December 16, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED) - Notice
Mon 12/16 5:27 PM
HEARING CANCELLED. Notice of Agenda of Matters not going forward. The following hearing has been cancelled. Filed by David W. Carickhoff. Hearing scheduled for 12/18/2019 at 11:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. (Shaw, Kevin) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing - Notice (Multi)
Mon 12/16 11:26 AM
Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by David W. Carickhoff. Hearing scheduled for 12/18/2019 at 11:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. (Shaw, Kevin) |
|
Monday, December 09, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 12/09 3:45 PM
Amended Answer to Complaint Filed by Taiji Group (USA) Inc. Mediation due date: 04/7/2020.(Hehn, Curtis) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Monday, December 02, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 12/02 8:48 AM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Taiji Group (USA) Inc. Mediation due date: 3/31/2020. (Murin, Leslie) |
|
Tuesday, November 05, 2019 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference
Tue 11/05 10:35 AM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Taiji Group (USA) Inc.. Pretrial Conference set for 12/18/2019 at 11:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 1/6/2020. (Root, Alan) |
|
Monday, October 07, 2019 | ||
2 | 2
crditcrd
none
Mon 10/07 8:07 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 19-50409 CSS) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number Deferred, amount $ 350.00. (COH) |
|
Friday, October 04, 2019 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
RETIRED - Complaint
Fri 10/04 7:49 PM
Adversary case 19-50409 Complaint to Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 547, 548 and 550 and to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 502(d) by David W. Carickhoff against Taiji Group (USA) Inc.. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). (Root, Alan) |