SEC v. GenAudio Inc., et al
Original Case: 1:15-cv-02118
Tenth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:19-cv-01454 |
Type | civil / usa as party |
Nature of Suit | 850 Other Statutes - Securities/Commodities/Exchange |
Case Filed: | Nov 27, 2019 |
Terminated: | Apr 26, 2022 |
Last checked: Thursday Apr 28, 2022 2:21 AM MDT |
Defendant
TAJ JERRY MAHABUB
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
GENAUDIO INC.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Apr 26 2022
[10908785] Affirmed; Terminated on the merits after oral hearing; Written, signed, published; Judges Holmes, authoring, Kelly and Carson. Mandate to issue. [19-1454, 19-1455] |
Docket last updated: 04/28/2022 2:21 AM MDT |
Wednesday, November 27, 2019 | ||
[10698412] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 11/27/2019. Docketing statement, transcript order form and entry of appearance due 12/11/2019 for GenAudio Inc.. Notice of appearance due on 12/11/2019 for Securities and Exchange Commission 19-1454 | ||
Att: 1 107 pgs Preliminary ROA | ||
Att: 2 2 pgs General Docket Letter - Counsel - Civil |