Securities & Exchange Commission v. Mahabub et al
Colorado District Court | |
Judge: | William J Martinez |
Referred: | S Kato Crews |
Case #: | 1:15-cv-02118 |
Nature of Suit | 850 Other Statutes - Securities/Commodities/Exchange |
Cause | 15:78 Securities Exchange Act |
Case Filed: | Sep 25, 2015 |
Terminated: | Sep 16, 2019 |
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 23, 2016 3:19 AM MDT |
Defendant
Astound Holdings Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
GenAudio Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Taj Jerry Mahabub
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Securities & Exchange Commission
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Tuesday, October 10, 2023 | ||
142 | 142
order
Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
Tue 10/10 5:33 PM
ORDER granting140 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Leslie J. Hughes is terminated as counsel of record. By Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 10/10/2023. Text Only Entry (skclc1) |