Consolidated
Lead case: 3:16-md-02734

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:19-cv-05017
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Dec 23, 2019
Terminated:Jun 02, 2020
Last checked: Saturday Jun 20, 2020 6:38 AM EDT
Defendant
BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY
Represented By
THOMAS LARRY HILL
Moore Hill & Westmoreland Pa - Pensacola
contact info
Defendant
OTSUKA AMERICA PHARMACEUTICAL INC
Represented By
MATTHEW ALAN CAMPBELL
Winston & Strawn Llp - Washington Dc
contact info
Defendant
OTSUKA PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD
Represented By
MATTHEW ALAN CAMPBELL
Winston & Strawn Llp - Washington Dc
contact info
Plaintiff
CHRISTINE GAGNE
Represented By
JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Napoli Shkolnik Pllc - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
LOUISE R CARO
Napoli Shkolnik Pllc - Coconut Grove Fl
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Monday, June 01, 2020
8 8 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Mon 06/01 1:50 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by CHRISTINE GAGNE. (CARO, LOUISE)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 08, 2020
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 05/08 4:26 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by LOUISE R CARO on behalf of CHRISTINE GAGNE (CARO, LOUISE)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 20, 2020
6 6 service Summons Issued Thu 02/20 11:27 AM
Summons Issued as to OTSUKA PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD. (djb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 19, 2020
5 5 notice Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options Wed 02/19 7:22 PM
NOTICE of filing Summons to Issue (OPC) by CHRISTINE GAGNE (LIAKOS, JENNIFER)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2020
4 4 service Summons Issued Tue 02/11 4:02 PM
Summons Issued as to BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY, OTSUKA AMERICA PHARMACEUTICAL INC. (djb)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 10, 2020
3 3 notice Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options Mon 02/10 5:40 PM
NOTICE of Filing Summons to Issue by CHRISTINE GAGNE (LIAKOS, JENNIFER)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons
Tuesday, December 31, 2019
2 2 cmp Complaint Tue 12/31 9:46 PM
COMPLAINT against BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY, OTSUKA AMERICA PHARMACEUTICAL INC, OTSUKA PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD, filed by CHRISTINE GAGNE. (LIAKOS, JENNIFER)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet
Tuesday, December 17, 2019
1 1 7 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Mon 12/23 9:08 AM
ORDER - Short Form Complaint must be filed on or before 1/6/2020 . Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 12/17/2019. (erl)
Related: [-]