Consolidated
Lead case: 3:16-md-02734

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:19-cv-05048
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Dec 23, 2019
Last checked: Saturday Jun 20, 2020 6:24 AM EDT
Defendant
BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY
Represented By
THOMAS LARRY HILL
Moore Hill & Westmoreland Pa - Pensacola
contact info
Defendant
OTSUKA AMERICA PHARMACEUTICAL INC
Represented By
MATTHEW ALAN CAMPBELL
Winston & Strawn Llp - Washington Dc
contact info
Defendant
OTSUKA PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD
Represented By
MATTHEW ALAN CAMPBELL
Winston & Strawn Llp - Washington Dc
contact info
Defendant
ROBERT REARDON
Represented By
BEHRAM V PAREKH
Kirtland & Packard Llp - El Segundo Ca
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Friday, July 17, 2020
8 8 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Fri 07/17 1:05 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by OTSUKA AMERICA PHARMACEUTICAL INC, OTSUKA PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD. (CAMPBELL, MATTHEW)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 20, 2020
7 7 service Summons Reissued Thu 02/20 3:37 PM
Summons Reissued as to OTSUKA PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD. (djb)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options Thu 02/20 11:52 AM
NOTICE Notice of Filing Summons to Issue by ROBERT REARDON (PAREKH, BEHRAM)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 04, 2020
5 5 service Summons Reissued Tue 02/04 9:23 AM
Summons Reissued as to BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY, OTSUKA AMERICA PHARMACEUTICAL INC. (djb)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 31, 2020
4 4 notice Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options Fri 01/31 2:40 PM
NOTICE Notice of Filing Summons to Issue by ROBERT REARDON (PAREKH, BEHRAM)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons
Monday, January 06, 2020
3 3 service Summons Issued Mon 01/06 2:42 PM
Summons Issued as to BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY, OTSUKA AMERICA PHARMACEUTICAL INC, OTSUKA PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD. (djb)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 03, 2020
2 2 cmp Complaint Fri 01/03 3:11 PM
COMPLAINT against BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY, OTSUKA AMERICA PHARMACEUTICAL INC, OTSUKA PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD, filed by ROBERT REARDON. (PAREKH, BEHRAM)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons BMS,
Att: 3 Summons Ot Am,
Att: 4 Summons Ot Ph
Tuesday, December 17, 2019
1 1 7 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Mon 12/23 3:08 PM
ORDER - Short Form Complaint must be filed on or before 1/6/2020 . Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 12/17/2019. (erl)
Related: [-]