Consolidated
Lead case: 3:16-md-02734

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:20-cv-05255
Nature of Suit367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Mar 30, 2020
Terminated:Oct 06, 2020
Case in other court:Minnesota, 0:20-cv-00354
Last checked: Saturday Sep 26, 2020 4:33 AM EDT
Defendant
BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY
Represented By
ANAND AGNESHWAR
Arnold & Porter Llp - New York Ny
contact info
THOMAS LARRY HILL
Moore Hill & Westmoreland Pa - Pensacola
contact info
PAIGE SHARPE
Arnold & Porter Llp - Washington Dc
contact info
MATTHEW A EISENSTEIN
Arnold & Porter Llp - Washington Dc
contact info
CHARLES FRANKLIN BEALL, JR.
Moore Hill & Westmoreland Pa - Pensacola Fl
contact info
MITCHELL RUSSELL STERN
Arnold & Porter Llp - New York Ny
contact info
Defendant
OTSUKA AMERICA PHARMACEUTICAL INC
Defendant
OTSUKA PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD
Plaintiff
ROBERT CHARLES ESTELLE
1983 STILLWATER AVE EAST
SAINT PAUL, MN 55119


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Tuesday, October 06, 2020
54 54 4 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Tue 10/06 12:55 PM
ORDER - This case is hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE for the plaintiffs' failure to comply with Court orders. The Clerk is directed to close the case in its entirety for all purposes. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 10/6/2020. (djb)
Related: [-]
utility Action Required by District Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases Tue 10/06 7:31 AM
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re:53 Notice Regarding Plaintiff's Noncompliance with Deadline for Expert Disclosures on Specific Causation (djb)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 05, 2020
53 53 notice Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options Mon 10/05 3:31 PM
NOTICE Regarding Plaintiff's Noncompliance with Deadline for Expert Disclosures on Specific Causation by OTSUKA AMERICA PHARMACEUTICAL INC, OTSUKA PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD (BROTHERS, RAND)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A