Member Case
Lead case is: 1:20-bk-10950

New York Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Philip Bentley
Case #: 1:20-bk-10970
Case Filed:Apr 13, 2020
Terminated:Dec 06, 2023

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors50-99
Est. Assets$10,000,001 to $50 million
Est. Liabilities $10,000,001 to $50 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
The Clark Group, Inc.
258 Prospect Plains Rd
Cranbury, NJ 08512-3605
Represented By
Andrew G. Dietderich
Sullivan & Cromwell LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee U.S. Federal Office Building 201 Varick Street, Room 1006
New York, NY 10014


Docket last updated: 36 minutes ago
Wednesday, December 06, 2023
8 8 order Order, Final Decree Wed 12/06 1:45 PM
Order for a Final Decree (I) Closing Chapter 11 Cases and (II) Terminating Appointment of Claims and Noticing Agent signed on 12/6/2023 (White, Greg)
Related: [-]
misc Close Bankruptcy Case Wed 12/06 1:58 PM
Case Closed. (White, Greg)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 14, 2022
7 7 misc Certificate of Mailing - Case Reassignment Notice Thu 09/15 12:14 AM
Certificate of Mailing Re: Notice of Case Reassignment Related [+] . Notice Date 09/14/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #6 )
Monday, September 12, 2022
6 6 misc Case Reassignment Notice (BNC) Mon 09/12 4:28 PM
Notice of Case Reassignment From Judge Sean H. Lane to Judge Philip Bentley. Judge Philip Bentley added to the case. (Gomez, Jessica)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 11, 2020
5 5 misc Statement of Financial Affairs Thu 06/11 7:57 PM
Statement of Financial Affairs - Non-Individual Filed by Sean T Greecher on behalf of The Clark Group, Inc.. (Greecher, Sean)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Schedules Thu 06/11 7:56 PM
Schedules filed: Schedule A/B - Non-Individual, Schedule D - Non-Individual, Schedule E/F - Non-Individual, Schedule G - Non-Individual, Schedule H - Non-Individual , Statement of Financial Affairs - Non-Individual Filed by Sean T Greecher on behalf of The Clark Group, Inc.. (Greecher, Sean)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 16, 2020
3 3 order Motion, Joint Administration Thu 04/16 2:13 PM
Order Signed On 4/15/2020, Granting Motion For Joint Administration Related [+] (Ebanks, Liza)
Related: [-] 2
misc Case Association - Joint Administration Thu 04/16 5:12 PM
Case Joint Administration. All further pleadings, docket entries and other papers shall be filed in the Lead Case No. 20-10950 (Rodriguez, Maria)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 13, 2020
2 2 motion Motion, Joint Administration Thu 04/16 2:00 PM
Motion for Joint Administration (Disregard- Entered For Administrative Purposes. Motion Filed In Lead Case No: 20-10950 ECF. Doc. # 2) filed by Brian D. Glueckstein on behalf of The Clark Group, Inc.. (Ebanks, Liza)
Related: [-]
1 1 30+ pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Mon 04/13 1:19 AM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individual. Order for Relief Entered. Chapter 11 Plan due by 8/11/2020, Disclosure Statement due by 8/11/2020, Initial Case Conference due by 5/13/2020, Filed by Andrew G. Dietderich of Sullivan & Cromwell LLP on behalf of The Clark Group, Inc.. (Dietderich, Andrew)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Auto - docket of credit card Mon 04/13 1:21 AM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 20-10970 ) [misc,824] (1717.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A13907362. Fee amount 1717.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc #1
misc Add Judge Mon 04/13 8:15 AM
Judge Sean H. Lane added to the case. (Porter, Minnie)
Related: [-]